Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Paul S Diamond
Case #: 2:23-cv-04014
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2023
Terminated:Jul 31, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 14, 2024 6:02 AM EDT
Defendant
COYNE CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.
Represented By
ASHLEY L. TARAGNA
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
WILLIAM H. CATTO
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PELE WATKINS
Represented By
DAVID M. KOLLER
Koller Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 07/31 1:46 PM
ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL SUBMITTED A LETTER EXPLAINING HIS COMPLETE INABILITY TO GET IN TOUCH WITH HIS CLIENT.23 ACCORDINGLY, I ORDERED PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE NO LATER THAN JULY 29, 2024.24 NOTHING HAS BEEN FILED. (SEE DOCKET.) THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; AND THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/31/24. 7/31/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 07/15 4:42 PM
ORDER THAT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS CANCELLED. ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF PELE WATKINS SHALL SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE, NO LATER THAN JULY 29, 2024 AT 5:00 P.M. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/15/24. 7/15/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Letter Mon 07/15 4:39 PM
Letter to Chambers. Re: Watkins v. Coyne Chemical Co., Inc. dated 7/15/24 by PELE WATKINS (bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 06/05 1:08 PM
ORDER THAT A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SET FOR 7/16/2024 01:30 PM Via Video Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/5/24. 6/5/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 JOINT STATUS REPORT FORM
Monday, June 03, 2024
21 21 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 06/03 8:08 AM
ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint by COYNE CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC..(TARAGNA, ASHLEY)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
20 20 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 05/17 2:28 PM
ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION15 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 5/17/24.5/17/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/09 8:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PELE WATKINS.(KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 25, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/26 8:26 AM
ORDER OF 4/25/24 THAT PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO. 17) IS GRANTED. THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND IS EXTENDED TO MAY 9, 2024. SIGNED BY JUDGE: PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 4/25/24. 4/26/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 04/25 1:54 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Ds Partial MTD filed by PELE WATKINS.Certificate of Service.(SANTO, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN D. SANTO on behalf of PELE WATKINS with Certificate of Service(SANTO, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
15 15 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 04/11 4:12 PM
Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by COYNE CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service.(TARAGNA, ASHLEY)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/22 4:12 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against COYNE CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC., filed by PELE WATKINS.(KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
13 13 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 03/01 12:03 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: COUNTS I AND II ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS OF THIS ORDER. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO AMEND BY 5:00 P.M. ON MARCH 22, 2023, I WILL DISMISS THE COUNTS I AND II WITH PREJUDICE; AS IT IS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 3/1/24.3/1/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/12 5:00 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by PELE WATKINS.(KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge,
Att: 5 Exhibit B - Brown v. Tait Towers,
Att: 6 Exhibit C - Melincoff v E Norriton Phys Serv, Inc
Monday, January 08, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 01/08 10:20 AM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS10 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND IS EXTENDED TO JANUARY 12, 2024. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 1/8/24.1/8/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 01/05 4:14 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by PELE WATKINS.Certificate of Service.(KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 22, 2023
9 9 motion Dismiss Fri 12/22 8:40 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by COYNE CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC..Memorandum Certificate of Service.(TARAGNA, ASHLEY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
8 8 misc Status Report Wed 11/15 3:09 PM
STATUS REPORT by COYNE CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.. (TARAGNA, ASHLEY)
Related: [-]
7 7 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 11/15 3:03 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with 11/15/2023 by COYNE CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC..(TARAGNA, ASHLEY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
6 6 9 pgs order Order Wed 11/01 3:33 PM
STANDING ORDER: IN AN EFFORT TO COMPLY WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1S MANDATE TO SECURE THE JUST, SPEEDY, AND INEXPENSIVE DETERMINATION OF EVERY ACTION,; AS IT IS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 11/1/23. 11/1/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/30 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY L. TARAGNA on behalf of COYNE CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. with 10/30/2023(TARAGNA, ASHLEY)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/30 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM H. CATTO on behalf of COYNE CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. with 10/30/2023(CATTO, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/26 11:54 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PELE WATKINS. COYNE CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. waiver sent on 10/23/2023, answer due 12/22/2023. (KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 10/18 11:23 AM
Summons Issued as to COYNE CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/18/23 (bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 10/17 6:26 PM
COMPLAINT against COYNE CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-17014627.), filed by PELE WATKINS.(KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form