Washington Western District Court
Judge:Benjamin H Settle
Case #: 3:23-cv-05928
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2023
Terminated:Mar 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 1:52 AM PDT
Defendant
Regus Management Group LLC
Represented By
Jacque Elizabeth St Romain
Karr Tuttle Campbell
contact info
Joshua R.M. Rosenberg
Karr Tuttle Campbell
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher C Johnson
E-Filing/Service 5613 121ST ST CT E-1
PUYALLUP, WA 98373
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Tucker Albin and Associates Inc
Terminated: 11/22/2023


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 11, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 03/11 3:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: because the Defendant does not oppose Plaintiff's motion to dismiss, Dkt. 14, the case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs. Entered at the direction of Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MET)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
15 15 order Order to Re-Note Motion Wed 01/17 11:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), voluntary dismissal after a defendant has answered requires a stipulation signed by all parties. Johnson's motion for voluntary dismissal, Dkt.14 , shall be noted on the calendar for Friday January 26. If Defendant does not oppose the motion, or if the parties file a stipulated order of dismissal, the court will dismiss the case with prejudice and without costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. Authorized by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MW)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
14 14 motion Dismiss Party Fri 01/12 10:18 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Party Regus Management Group LLC , filed by Plaintiff Christopher C Johnson. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
13 13 order BHS - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Wed 12/06 9:06 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/20/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/27/2024, Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2024. (MET)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/05 12:33 PM
ANSWER to4 Complaint by Regus Management Group LLC.(Rosenberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/05 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joshua R.M. Rosenberg on behalf of Defendant Regus Management Group LLC. (Rosenberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 12/05 3:22 PM
Attorney Jacque Elizabeth St Romain added for Regus Management Group LLC; per11 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
10 10 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Case Wed 11/22 12:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER: pursuant to7 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Settlement filed by Christopher C Johnson, any/all pending deadlines/hearings terminated and this case is closed. Entered at the direction of Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MET)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Wed 11/22 1:32 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Regus Management Group LLC on 11/14/2023, filed by Plaintiff Christopher C Johnson. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Wed 11/22 1:29 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Tucker, Albin and Associates on 11/13/2023, filed by Plaintiff Christopher C Johnson. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Parties Wed 11/22 2:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER: this case was terminated in error. Case is reopened. Party Tucker Albin and Associates Inc terminated per7 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Settlement filed by Christopher C Johnson. (MET)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
7 7 motion Dismiss Tue 11/21 1:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Settlement , filed by Plaintiff Christopher C Johnson. Noting Date 11/21/2023, (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice re Pro Se Registration Tue 11/21 1:35 PM
NOTICE: Plaintiff Christopher C Johnson has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 11/08 9:37 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Regus Management Group LLC, Tucker Albin and Associates Inc. (MW) (hard copy mailed to Plaintiff)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Wed 11/08 9:32 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Regus Management Group LLC, Tucker Albin and Associates Inc with JURY DEMAND Related [+] filed by Christopher C Johnson.(MW)
Related: [-] ceipt # IFP Granted
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 11/08 9:27 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold.(MW) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
1 1 motion Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/17 4:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Grady J. Leupold filed by Christopher C Johnson.(ZMG) (ZMG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Complaint,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
Att: 4 (10/17/2023) Email Transmittal