Joint Admin
|
1:11-bk-10615 - Borders, Inc.
|
02/16/2011
|
Joint Admin
|
1:11-bk-10616 - Borders International Services, Inc.
|
02/16/2011
|
Joint Admin
|
1:11-bk-10617 - Borders Direct, LLC
|
02/16/2011
|
Joint Admin
|
1:11-bk-10618 - Borders Properties, Inc.
|
02/16/2011
|
Joint Admin
|
1:11-bk-10619 - Borders Online, Inc.
|
02/16/2011
|
Joint Admin
|
1:11-bk-10620 - Borders Online, LLC
|
02/16/2011
|
Joint Admin
|
1:11-bk-10621 - BGP (UK), Limited
|
02/16/2011
|
Adversary
|
1:11-ap-02586 - Pinsker on behalf of himself and all others simila v. Borders, Inc.
|
09/02/2011
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01001 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. A Broader View, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01002 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. A&E Home Video Corporation
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01003 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Acorn Media Publishing, Inc. n/k/a Acorn Media Gro
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01004 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Alex Panline USA, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01005 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. All Things Equal, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01006 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Aluratek, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01007 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Arthur Blank & Company, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01008 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. AW Faber-Castell, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01009 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. BCP Imports LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01010 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Boise Cascade Office Products n/k/a Office Max Con
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01011 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Book Thongs, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01012 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Bookspan
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01013 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Bookworks, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01014 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Bramhall & Hazel, Inc. n/k/a Swing Limited
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01015 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Briarpatch, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01016 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Buffalo Games, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01017 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Burts Bees, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01018 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. C.R. Gibson, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01019 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. C2F, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01020 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Charlesbridge Publishing, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01021 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Colorbook Paper Products, Inc. n/k/a Flying Colors
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01022 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Corporation for Public Broadcasting
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01023 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Creative Essentials, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01024 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Culturenik Publishing, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01025 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Dell Marketing, L.P.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01026 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Design International Group, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01027 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Distal, USA, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01028 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. EB Brands, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01029 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Ecolab Pest Elimination, a Division of Ecolab, Inc
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01030 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Endeca Technologies, Inc. n/k/a Oracle Corporation
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01031 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Entertainment One GP, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01032 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Entertainment Publications, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01033 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Experian Marketing Solutions, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01034 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Facility Solutions Group, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01035 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Ferrandino & Sons, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01036 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Franklin Electronic Publishers, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01037 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Garda CL West, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01038 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Gund, Inc. n/k/a Enesco LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01039 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Harbor Industries, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01040 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Heolis, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01041 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Human Kinetics Publishers, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01042 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Integral Texas Pallet Operations, L.P.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01043 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Ja Majors Company
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01044 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Kelly Services, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01045 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Kent H. Landsberg Co.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01046 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Keynote Systems, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01047 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Kidrobot, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01048 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Koss Corporation
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01049 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Kuecker Logistics Group, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01050 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Lightwedge, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01051 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Lippincott Williams & Wilkins, Inc. n/k/a Wolters
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01052 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Manhattan Group, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01053 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. MBI Publishing Company, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01054 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Milk Industry Management Corp.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01055 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Miramar Designs, Ltd.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01056 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Moseley Road, Inc. a/k/a Moseley Road Calendars, I
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01057 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Newell Rubbermaid, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01058 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. NMR Distribution (America) Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01059 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Orange Circle Studio Corporation
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01060 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Otterbase Technical Services, Inc. n/k/a Otterbase
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01061 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Parkstone Press U.S.A., Ltd.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01062 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Perficient, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01063 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Peters Imports, Inc. n/k/a Kehe Distributors, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01064 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Playmobile USA, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01065 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Publicaciones Puertorriquenas
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01066 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. RGIS Inventory Specialist, LLC n/k/a RGIS, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01067 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Rovi Data Solutions, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01068 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Sandt Products, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01069 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Santillana Publishing Co., Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01070 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. School Zone Publishing Company
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01071 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Scratch Tracks, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01072 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Select Resources, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01073 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Service Net Warranty, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01074 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Southwest Traders, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01075 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Space Journals, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01076 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Summera Group, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01077 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Swiss II, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01078 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Syncreon Technology, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01079 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Synq Solutions, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01080 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. TFI, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01081 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. The Boston Consulting Group, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01082 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. The Globe Pequot Press, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01083 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. The Navigators t/a NavPress
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01084 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. The Water System Group, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01085 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. TNT Media Group, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01086 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Toltec Products, LLC
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01087 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Totes Isotoner Corp.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01088 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Travel Tags, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01089 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01090 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. U.S.A.OPOLY, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01091 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Universal Music & Video Distribution, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01092 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Wonder Forge, Inc.
|
01/03/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01099 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. CIT Group, Inc.
|
01/04/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01112 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Advance Print & Graphics, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01113 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Alibris, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01114 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Ann Arbor Plastics, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01115 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Aquent, LLC
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01116 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Arcadia Publishing, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01117 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Bartlett Dairy, Inc. et al
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01118 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Book Sales, Inc. et al
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01119 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Brilliance Audio, Inc. n/k/a Brilliance Publishing
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01120 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Bunn-O-Matic Corporation
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01121 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Capital Cleaning Contractors, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01122 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. CCA & B, LLC
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01123 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. CFD Fire Protection, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01124 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Charles E. Tuttle Co., Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01125 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Charles Letts & Co., Ltd.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01126 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Checkpoint Systems, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01127 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Commission Junction, Inc. et al
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01128 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Compucom Systems, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01129 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Crosscom National, LLC
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01130 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. C&T Design & Equipment Co.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01131 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Cybersource Corporation
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01132 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Daedalus Books, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01133 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Diamond Comic Distributors, Inc. et al
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01134 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Discovery Bay Games, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01135 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Dover Publications, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01136 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Easibind Internatinal, Ltd.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01137 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Edizioni White Star SRL
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01138 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Freedom Ranch, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01139 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Gallery Leather Co., Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01140 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Global Art Materials, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01141 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Hinkler Books Pty, Ltd. et al
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01142 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. IBM Corporation
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01143 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Ideals Publications, Inc. a Guideposts Company
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01144 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Imagine! Print Solutions, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01145 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Insight Merchandising, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01146 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Jefferson Smurfit Corporation n/k/a Rock-Tenn Comp
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01147 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Jilson & Roberts
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01148 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Llewellyn Worldwide, Ltd.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01149 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Logicalis, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01150 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Lonely Planet Publications, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01151 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Loomis Armored, US LLC
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01152 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. L.P.G. Greetins, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01153 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Mattel, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01154 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Merriam-Webster, Incorporated
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01155 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Metaverse Corporation
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01156 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. New Harbinger Publications, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01157 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Overture Services, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01158 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Parragon Publishing, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01159 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Pierre Belvedere, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01160 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Powerreviews, Inc. n/k/a Bazzaarvoice, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01161 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Publisher Services, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01162 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Pyramid America, Limited Partnership et al
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01163 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Quercus Editions Limited
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01164 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Reed Exhibitions Limited
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01165 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Representaciones Borinquenas, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01166 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Rumbatime, LLC
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01167 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Sacchi Design, Ltd.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01168 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Samuel Weiser, Inc. n/k/a Red Wheel/Weiser, LLC
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01169 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. SEI, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01170 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Spin Master Toys, Ltd
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01171 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. The Book Company Publishing Pty Ltd.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01172 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. The Bridge Direct, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01173 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Top Trumps USA, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01174 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Topics Entertainment, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01175 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Tower Cleaning Systems, Inc. n/k/a USM, Inc.
|
01/31/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01195 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Baker Book House Company d/b/a Baker Publishing Gr
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01197 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Barbour Publishing
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01199 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Bump Creative Partners, Inc.
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01200 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Chicago Review Press Incorporated d/b/a Independe
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01201 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. C&T Design & Equipment Co.
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01203 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Coca-Cola Bottlers' Sales & Service Company L
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01204 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. DPI Specialty Foods, Inc. et al
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01205 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Dunbar Amored, Inc.
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01206 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Capital Records, LLC d/b/a EMI Music North America
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01209 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Gibbs M. Smith, Inc. d/b/a Gibbs Smith, Publisher
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01210 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. H. F. Ullmann publishin GmbH
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01211 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. K & Company, LLC, a division of Wilton Brands, Inc
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01212 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Littlehampton Book Services, Ltd.
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01213 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Gaiam Americas, Inc.
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01214 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Microsoft Corporation
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01215 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. More Direct, Inc.
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01216 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Publications International, Ltd.
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01217 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Penny Publications, LLC
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01218 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Readers Digest Childrens Publishing, Inc.
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01219 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Republic Services, Inc.
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01220 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Spice Box Development, Ltd.
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01221 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Trilateral, LLC
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01222 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Wild Republic, a division of K&M International Inc
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01229 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Triumph Books Corp.
|
02/12/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01231 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Scholastic Inc.
|
02/12/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01233 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Notions Marketing Corporation
|
02/13/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01234 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Source Interlink Companies, Inc. et al
|
02/13/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01235 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Quayside Publishing Group, a division of Quarto Gr
|
02/13/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01236 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Mud Puddle, Inc.
|
02/13/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01237 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Piccadilly Enterprises, Inc.
|
02/13/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01238 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Ex Point, Inc. et al
|
02/13/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01245 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. AEC One Stop Group, Inc.
|
02/13/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01246 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. A.G. Industries, Inc.
|
02/13/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01247 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Sourcebooks, Inc.
|
02/14/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01248 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Rand McNally and Company
|
02/14/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01249 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Image Entertainment, Inc.
|
02/14/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01251 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Baker & Taylor, Inc. et al
|
02/14/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01252 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. Interstate Freight Auditing et al
|
02/14/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01253 - Curtis R. Smith, as the Liquidating Trustee of the v. American Girl Publishing, Inc.
|
02/15/2013
|