Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Sheri Polster Chappell
Referred: Nicholas P Mizell
Case #: 2:23-cv-00911
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
CauseAmericans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2023
Terminated:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 4:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Arthrex, Inc.
Represented By
Robert D Pecchio
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Kelly H. Kolb
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Addis-Kappes
Represented By
Benjamin H. Yormak
Yormak Employment & Disability Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Friday, February 28, 2025
29 29 order Order Dismissing Case Fri 02/28 10:08 AM
ENDORSED ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice per the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (Doc. 28 ); Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/28/2025. (BB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/27 12:47 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Nicole Addis-Kappes. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
27 27 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 01/31 12:39 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AM)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order Dismissing Case Fri 01/31 9:46 AM
ENDORSED ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice per the Notice of Settlement (Doc. 24 ). If no party files another paper per Local Rule 3.09(b) on or before March 3, 2025, then this dismissal will be with prejudice. The Clerk is now DIRECTED to deny all pending motions as moot, terminate any deadlines, and close the case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/31/2025. (BB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Hearing - Cancel Thu 01/30 3:27 PM
NOTICE canceling Settlement Conference scheduled for 3/18/25. (CGW)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of settlement Thu 01/30 3:15 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Arthrex, Inc. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
23 23 4 pgs order Order Setting Hearing Mon 01/27 4:11 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 3/18/2025 at 09:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 4 E before Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. See Order for further requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 1/27/2025. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
utility Add Magistrate Judge (Settlement) Thu 01/23 12:57 PM
Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek added as settlement judge. (LMF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
22 22 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 01/21 1:55 PM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: See order for new court deadlines. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/21/2025. (AEH)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order Tue 01/21 12:46 PM
ENDORSED ORDER referring this case to United States Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek for a March settlement conference. On or before January 27, 2025, the parties must contact Judge Dudek's courtroom deputy, Courtney Ward, to coordinate availability for the conference. To accommodate the settlement conference, the Court will separately enter an Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/21/2025. (BB)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 01/06 11:58 AM
NOTICE OF ZOOM STATUS HEARING: A Status Conference is set for 1/13/2025 at 2:00PM before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and will be conducted via Zoom Video Conference. Participants shall receive instructions for joining hearing by separate email notice.(AEH)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
19 19 adr Mediation report Fri 12/13 3:01 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on 12/10/2024. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Wright, Denise)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Mon 10/28 12:04 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on December 10, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. before Ms. Denise Wheeler-Wright, Esq. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
17 17 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 01/18 11:03 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/27/2024 Dispositive motions due by 1/24/2025 Pretrial statement due by 7/11/2025 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 9/27/2024 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 10/28/2024 Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2025 at 09:30 AM before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell Jury Trial term 8/4/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell Conduct mediation hearing by 1/3/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/18/2024. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
16 16 1 pgs minutes Preliminary pretrial conference Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/16 10:36 AM
Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell: granting 15 JOINT ORAL Motion to conduct mediation by Videoconference. The parties are granted leave to mediate by videoconference, however, if any party wishes to mediate in-person, the mediation shall take place in-person. PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/16/2024. (digital) (WRW)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/16 10:34 AM
JOINT ORAL MOTION to conduct mediation by Videoconference. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
14 14 5 pgs misc Case Management Report Tue 12/26 10:29 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Pecchio, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/01 8:50 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Arthrex, Inc.. (Pecchio, Robert)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 12/01 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kelly H. Kolb on behalf of Arthrex, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Kelly H. Kolb. (Kolb, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of hearing Tue 11/28 9:34 AM
NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report by 1/2/2024. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 23911. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
10 10 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/27 11:55 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Arthrex, Inc. (Pecchio, Robert) Modified text on 11/27/2023 (MCB)
Related: [-]
9 9 9 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/27 11:38 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Arthrex, Inc.(Pecchio, Robert) Modified text on 11/27/2023 (MCB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
8 8 service Summons returned executed Tue 11/07 10:42 PM
RETURN of service executed on 11/6/2023 by Nicole Addis-Kappes as to Arthrex, Inc.. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
7 7 service Summons issued Fri 10/20 8:57 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Arthrex, Inc. (EAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
6 6 order Civil Action Order Thu 10/19 2:28 PM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/19/2023. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
5 5 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/18 4:12 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:23-cv-911-SPC-NPM. (RN)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 10/18 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Benjamin H. Yormak on behalf of Nicole Addis-Kappes. Lead Counsel: Benjamin H. Yormak. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/18 11:56 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Nicole Addis-Kappes. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 10/18 11:56 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Nicole Addis-Kappes. Related case(s): No (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/18 11:50 AM
COMPLAINT against Arthrex, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21366728) filed by Nicole Addis-Kappes.(Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons