South Carolina District Court
Judge:Timothy M Cain
Referred: Molly H Cherry
Case #: 6:23-cv-05197
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2023
Terminated:Jan 08, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Photobooth Supply Co.
Represented By
Lillian Marshall Coleman Newton
Bettis Law Group LLP
contact info
D L Dirk Aydlette, III
Bettis Law Group LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel J. Threlfall
Represented By
Jeremy R. Summerlin
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order Wed 01/08 2:30 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy M Cain on 1/8/25. (kmca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
20 20 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 08/27 4:14 PM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/2/2024, Discovery due by 12/2/2024, Motions due by 2/3/2025, Mediation Due by 1/3/2025. Motion GRANTED: 19 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 13 Scheduling Order, filed by Photobooth Supply Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 8/27/2024. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Amend/Correct Tue 08/27 9:35 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct13 Scheduling Order, by Photobooth Supply Co.. Response to Motion due by 9/10/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Molly H Cherry.(Aydlette, D L)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Mon 08/05 10:27 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 16 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Lillian Marshall Coleman Newton is relieved as counsel for Defendant. Fred A. Williams is hereby substituted as counsel for Defendant, and D.L. Dirk Aydlette III will remain as counsel of record for Defendant. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 8/5/2024. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
16 16 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 08/02 4:46 PM
Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Photobooth Supply Co.. Response to Motion due by 8/16/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Molly H Cherry.(Aydlette, D L)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/02 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Fred Adam Williams on behalf of Photobooth Supply Co. (Williams, Fred)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 04/30 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/1/2024 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry. Defense counsel shall initiate the call and have all parties on the line prior to contacting the Court at 843-579-2640. (egra, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/24 10:52 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/29/2024, Discovery due by 8/29/2024, Motions due by 10/30/2024, Mediation Due by 9/30/2024. Motion GRANTED: 12 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 7 Scheduling Order, by Photobooth Supply Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 4/24/2024. (agaz, ) Modified to edit docket text on 4/24/2024 (agaz, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
12 12 motion Amend/Correct Tue 04/23 10:47 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct7 Scheduling Order,, by Photobooth Supply Co.. Response to Motion due by 5/7/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Molly H Cherry.(Aydlette, D L)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
11 11 3 pgs discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 12/07 2:52 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Daniel J. Threlfall.(Summerlin, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 12/07 2:45 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Photobooth Supply Co..(Aydlette, D L)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs discov Rule 26 Discovery Plan Thu 12/07 2:44 PM
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Photobooth Supply Co..(Newton, Lillian Marshall)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs discov Rule 26(f) Report Thu 12/07 2:43 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Photobooth Supply Co..(Newton, Lillian Marshall)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
7 7 8 pgs order Scheduling Order Thu 11/02 11:34 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/27/2023, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 12/7/2023, Rule 26 Report due by 12/7/2023, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/28/2023, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/29/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/28/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/29/2024, Discovery due by 4/29/2024, Motions due by 6/28/2024, Mediation Due by 5/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 11/02/2023. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
6 6 2 pgs discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 10/25 3:20 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Daniel J. Threlfall.(Summerlin, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
5 5 5 pgs respoth Answer to Complaint Notice of Removal Wed 10/25 2:55 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Photobooth Supply Co.. (Newton, Lillian Marshall)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
2 2 3 pgs discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 10/18 1:51 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Photobooth Supply Co. (agaz)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 10/18 1:47 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2023CP2304676. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11379387), filed by Photobooth Supply Co.(agaz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs State Court Documents