Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Jonker
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:23-cv-01112
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2023
Terminated:Oct 29, 2024
Case in other court:Michigan 2nd District Court in Berrien County, 20-000005-CH-W
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 4:19 AM EDT
counter-claimant
United States of America
Represented By
Sarah Stoner
U.S. Department Of Justice (civil Tax Division)
contact info
Isabelle Dietz
U.S. Department Of Justice, Civil Tax (dc)
contact info
counter-defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By
Mark John Magyar
Dykema Gossett Pllc (lansing)
contact info
cross-claimant
United States of America
Represented By
Sarah Stoner
U.S. Department Of Justice (civil Tax Division)
contact info
Isabelle Dietz
U.S. Department Of Justice, Civil Tax (dc)
contact info
cross-defendant
John W. Higgins
50102 Alpine Blvd.
Grand Beach, MI 49117
Represented By
John M. Wojcik
Farina & Wojcik, P.C.
contact info
cross-defendant
Martha R. Higgins
50102 Alpine Blvd.
Grand Beach, MI 49117
Represented By
John M. Wojcik
Farina & Wojcik, P.C.
contact info
defendant
John W. Higgins
50102 Alpine Blvd.
Grand Beach, MI 49117
Represented By
John M. Wojcik
Farina & Wojcik, P.C.
contact info
defendant
Martha R. Higgins
50102 Alpine Blvd.
Grand Beach, MI 49117
Represented By
John M. Wojcik
Farina & Wojcik, P.C.
contact info
plaintiff
JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By
Mark John Magyar
Dykema Gossett Pllc (lansing)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
counter-defendant
Treasurer Berrien County, Michigan
Terminated: 02/05/2024
Represented By
Thaddeus Jeremiah Hackworth
Berrien County
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
100 100 12 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver Tue 04/01 2:24 PM
ORDER granting96 motion to appoint receiver; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Tue 04/01 3:24 PM
Copy of Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver100 sent via U.S. Mail to John W. Higgins, Martha R. Higgins (ns)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
99 99 respm Response to Motion Wed 03/26 12:49 PM
RESPONSE TO MOTION to appoint receiver 96 filed by John W. Higgins, Martha R. Higgins (ems)
Related: [-]