Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Michael P Mills
Referred: Roy Percy
Case #: 1:23-cv-00139
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2023
Terminated:Nov 01, 2023
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 3:41 AM CDT
Defendant
AI Oasis, Inc.
Represented By
Grafton Eric Bragg
Bragglaw, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
GlobalVision Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Grafton Eric Bragg
Bragglaw, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cadence Bank
Represented By
John Alexander Purvis
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings Llp - Jackson
contact info
Erin Diane Saltaformaggio
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings Llp - Jackson
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
utility Remark Tue 11/07 11:18 AM
Transferred case opened in Central District of California as 2:23cv9281 filed 11/2/2023. (jla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
utility Case Transferred Out - District Wed 11/01 12:03 PM
Case Transferred to Central District of California pursuant to Order17 . Transferred electronically via CM/ECF. CASE CLOSED. (jtm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
17 17 13 pgs order Order Tue 10/31 4:45 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 10/31/2023. (rmw)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 10/31 9:15 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AI Oasis, Inc. . (Bragg, Grafton)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 10/31 9:14 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GlobalVision Systems, Inc. . (Bragg, Grafton)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
notice Notice of Correction Mon 10/30 3:16 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE as to GlobalVision Systems, Inc. and AI Oasis, Inc. : F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(1) requires the filing of a corporate statement by any nongovernmental corporate party that (A) identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock; or (2) states that there is no such corporation. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required corporate statement. (jla)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
14 14 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 10/27 4:52 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Cadence Bank. (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1. Declaration of B.Stubbs
notice Notice of Correction Fri 10/27 11:54 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re13 Memorandum in Support; All related filings to motion must be linked back to the original motion instead of a responsive pleading. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
13 13 30+ pgs misc Memorandum in Support Thu 10/26 6:28 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re12 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by AI Oasis, Inc., GlobalVision Systems, Inc.. (Bragg, Grafton)
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/26 6:25 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (as renewed by Dkt. 11) filed by AI Oasis, Inc., GlobalVision Systems, Inc.. (Bragg, Grafton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Declaration of Catherine Lew with Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit - Declaration of Michael Chen with Exhibits,
Att: 3 Exhibit - Declaration of Oliver Song with Exhibits,
Att: 4 Exhibit - Declaration of Ronaldo Chen with Exhibits,
Att: 5 Exhibit - Declaration of Paul Chan with Exhibits
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
11 11 misc Response Wed 10/25 5:05 PM
Response to10 Order . (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1. Defs Special Appearance,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2. Defs 12b2 Mtn to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3. Rule 41 Dismissal,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4. CA GlobalVision Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5. 2023.10.18 email re dismissal,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6. 2023.10.19-20 email chain,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7. Declaration of B.Stubbs
Friday, October 20, 2023
10 10 4 pgs order Order Fri 10/20 9:14 AM
ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 10/20/2023. (rmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 10/19 11:09 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Michael P. Mills for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/19/23. (jla)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 10/19 8:41 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/19/23. (jla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 10/18 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Alexander Purvis on behalf of Cadence Bank (Purvis, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 10/18 4:47 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cadence Bank re Diversity . (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
Related: [-]
5 5 14 pgs misc Memorandum in Support Wed 10/18 4:42 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Cadence Bank. (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 10/18 4:41 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Cadence Bank. (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Software License Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. First Amendment to SLA,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. Second Amendment to SLA,
Att: 4 Exhibit D. AIO Articles of Incorporation,
Att: 5 Exhibit E. GVS Statement of Information,
Att: 6 Exhibit F. AIO Statement of Information,
Att: 7 Exhibit G. Communications from C.Lew,
Att: 8 Exhibit H. Copyright Reports,
Att: 9 Exhibit I. Invoice from GVS,
Att: 10 Exhibit J. Stubbs Declaration,
Att: 11 Exhibit K. Rule 65 Cert of Counsel
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 10/18 4:37 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cadence Bank . (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 10/18 4:23 PM
Summons Issued as to AI Oasis, Inc., GlobalVision Systems, Inc.. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (jla)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/18 4:23 PM
COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2309890, filed by Cadence Bank. (jla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Software License Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - First Amendment to SLA,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Second Amendment to SLA,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - AIO Articles of Incorporation,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - GVS Statement of Information,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - AIO Statement of Information,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Communications from C. Lew,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Copyright Reports,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Invoice from GVS,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Assignment Wed 10/18 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Correction Wed 10/18 4:24 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE : F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required disclosure statement. (jla)
Related: [-]