Nebraska District Court
Case #: 8:23-cr-00204
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Feb 11, 2024 10:08 PM CST
Defendant
Shelby English (2)
Represented By
Layf J. Carlson
Wagner, Meehan Law Firm
contact info
David R. Stickman
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Omaha
contact info
Defendant
Alondra Rebolledo (1)
Represented By
Glenn A. Shapiro
Schaefer, Shapiro Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Crystal C. Correa
Assistant United States Attorney - Omaha
contact info
Matt E. Lierman
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Omaha
contact info

GPO Sep 26 2023
ORDER of Detention pending trial as to defendant Alondra Rebolledo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
GPO Sep 26 2023
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - The Federal Public Defender for the District of Nebraska is appointed to represent the defendant in this matter as to defendant Shelby English. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
GPO Sep 26 2023
ORDER of Detention pending trial as to defendant Shelby English. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
GPO Oct 11 2023
ORDER granting 26 Motion to Continue Deadline for Filing Pretrial Motions to Alondra Rebolledo. Pretrial motions shall be filed by December 14, 2023. The time between October 12, 2023, and December 14, 2023, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MLF)
GPO Oct 13 2023
ORDER granting 28 the Defendant's UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend regarding Order for Progression of a Criminal Case 28 as to Shelby English (2). Pretrial Motion Deadline set for 12/14/2023. Any additional time arising as a result of the granting of this motion, that is, the time between todays date and December 14, 2023 Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MKR)
GPO Dec 12 2023
ORDER - On or before December 27, 2023, the government shall file its brief in opposition to the defendants motion. See NECrimR 12.3(c). On or before January 3, 2024, the parties shall meet and confer to resolve any issues not requiring an evidentiary hearing, agree upon any factual stipulations to be presented to the court, and discuss proposed exhibits and witnesses. On or before January 10, 2024, the parties shall deliver to the undersigned's chambers via email to nelson@ned.uscourts.gov or hand delivery their proposed witness list(s), exhibit list(s), and copies of all exhibits. Telephone Conference set for 1/17/2024 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson as to defendant Shelby English. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MKR)
GPO Dec 28 2023
ORDER - The Government's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Suppress (Filing No. 54) is granted as to defendant Shelby English. On or before January 17, 2024, the government shall file its brief in opposition to the defendant's motion. Telephone Status Conference is continued to 2/7/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. The parties will use Restricted Order 52 for conference connection instructions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
GPO Jan 17 2024
AMENDED ORDER - The telephone status conference to discuss prehearing matters and the scheduling of an evidentiary hearing set for February 7, 2024, is continued to March 8, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. before the undersigned magistrate judge. Counsel shall use the case conference instructions at Filing No. 52 to participate in the call as to Shelby English. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
GPO Mar 18 2024
ORDER granting UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Trial 72 as to Alondra Rebolledo (1). Jury Trial is continued to 6/4/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. The time between today's date and June 4, 2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TJM)
GPO May 23 2024
ORDER granting UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Trial 79 as to Alondra Rebolledo (1). Jury Trial is continued to 8/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. The time between today's date and August 20, 2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TJM)
GPO Jan 07 2025
ORDER granting the defendant's 116 Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis as to Alondra Rebolledo (1). Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (MKR)

Docket last updated: 02/11/2024 9:56 PM CST
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
Remark - Public: Case filed under seal on 09/19/2023 and unsealed on 9/25/2023 pursuant to memorandum as to defendants Alondra Rebolledo and Shelby English. (MKR)
Related: [-]
1 1 PART 1 OF 2 - INDICTMENT with foreperson's signature redacted pursuant to the E-Government Act as to defendants Alondra Rebolledo and Shelby English. (MKR)
Related: [-]
2 2 PART 2 OF 2 - FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE PAGE regarding Indictment1 as to defendants Alondra Rebolledo and Shelby English. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(e). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (MKR)
Related: [-]
3 3 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET as to defendants Alondra Rebolledo and Shelby English. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (MKR)
Related: [-]