New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:23-mj-08148
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Sep 20, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Oct 19, 2023 4:40 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
JASON SCOTT GOLDBERG
United States Attorney'S Office District Of New Jersey
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
SUSAN CARRANO (3)
Terminated: 09/20/2023
Represented By
STEVEN H. LEVIN
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL VERZALENO, JR. (1)
Terminated: 09/20/2023
Represented By
LEE DAVID VARTAN
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL VERZALENO, SR. (2)
Terminated: 09/20/2023
Represented By
ZACH INTRATER
Brafman & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/19/2023 5:54 AM EDT
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
Arrest (Rule 5) of SUSAN CARRANO. (jbb)
Related: [-]
WAIVER of Rule 5 Hearings by SUSAN CARRANO placed on the record. (jbb)
Related: [-]
1 1 INDICTMENT Received from the DISTRICT OF MARYLAND as to SUSAN CARRANO. (jbb)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Initial Appearance in Rule 5 Proceedings as to SUSAN CARRANO held on 9/19/2023. (Court Reporter/Recorder: ECR) (jbb)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to SUSAN CARRANO (1) $100,000 UNSECURED APPEARANCE BOND (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 9/19/23. (jbb)
Related: [-]
4 4 UNSECURED APPEARANCE BOND entered as to SUSAN CARRANO in the amount of $100,000. (jbb)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER advising of the United States' continuing obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 9/19/23. (jbb)
Related: [-]