New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jessica G L Clarke
Case #: 1:23-cv-09179
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2023
Terminated:Apr 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Lauren Gray
Represented By
Andrew Michael Lupin
New York City Housing Authority
contact info
Defendant
New York City Housing Authority
Represented By
Andrew Michael Lupin
New York City Housing Authority
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Sherrod
Represented By
Alyssa O'Gallagher
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
John and Jane Doe
Plaintiff
Ester Tomicic-Hines
Represented By
Samuel Okwudili Maduegbuna
Maduegbuna Cooper LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 16, 2024
27 27 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 05/16 3:57 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF FINAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff Ester Tomicic Hines and Defendants New York City Housing Authority, Daniel Sherrod, and Lauren Gray (collectively "Defendants"), by and through their undersigned counsel, that the above-captioned action be and is hereby dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, and with no award of attorneys' fees or costs by the Court to any party. Daniel Sherrod, Lauren Gray and New York City Housing Authority terminated. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 5/16/2024) (tro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
26 26 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Wed 05/15 2:50 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Lauren Gray, New York City Housing Authority..(Lupin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 04/24 2:31 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised that all claims asserted herein have been settled in principle, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby DISMISSED and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within 30 days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed by the aforementioned deadline; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. If the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court by the deadline to reopen to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Section 6(a) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are cancelled. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 4/24/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
23 23 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 03/28 5:33 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER granting22 Motion to Stay re:22 LETTER MOTION to Stay Written Discovery addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Alyssa B. O'Gallagher dated March 21, 2024. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). The case is to be tried to a jury. Expert discovery due by 9/9/2024. Expert Depositions due by 9/9/2024. Fact Discovery due by 7/26/2024. Motion due by 4/29/2024. The parties shall be ready for trial as of two weeks following the deadline for the proposed Joint Pretrial Order, even if trial is tentatively scheduled for a later date. The next case management conference is scheduled for August 8, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their best estimate of the length of trial is 5 days. The parties are directed to file a joint letter updating theCourt on the status of mediation by April 25, 2024, oneweek after mediation is to occur.Defendant Sherrod's motion to stay written discovery withrespect to Defendant Sherrod pending adjudication of hisanticipated motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk ofCourt is directed to terminate ECF No. 22. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 3/28/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 03/28 11:46 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke: Initial Pretrial Conference held via Microsoft Teams on 3/28/2024. Counsel Samuel O. Maduegbuna present for the plaintiff. Counsel Andrew M. Lupin and Alyssa O'Gallagher for the respective defendants. (stt)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings Thu 03/28 5:35 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Deposition due by 9/9/2024., Expert Discovery due by 9/9/2024., Fact Discovery due by 7/26/2024., Motions due by 4/29/2024.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2024 at 10:00 AM at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY before Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke.) (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
order Order Wed 03/27 10:04 AM
ORDER in re:12 Counsel for the parties shall appear for a remote video conference on March 28, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel will receive Microsoft Teams log-in credentials at the email addresses listed on the docket. The public listen-only line may be accessed by dialing: 646-453-4442 | Access Code: 749369237#. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke) (Text Only Order) (Clarke, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
22 22 motion Stay Thu 03/21 7:49 PM
LETTER MOTION to Stay Written Discovery addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Alyssa B. O'Gallagher dated March 21, 2024. Document filed by Daniel Sherrod..(O'Gallagher, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Letter Thu 03/21 5:55 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Samuel O. Maduegbuna dated March 21, 2024 re: in anticipation of the initial pre-trial conference scheduled for March 28, 2024 at 11:00 AM.. Document filed by Ester Tomicic-Hines..(Maduegbuna, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Case Management Plan
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
20 20 order Memo Endorsement Tue 03/19 3:47 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re:19 Letter filed by Daniel Sherrod. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Plaintiff Sherrod is removed from mediation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 3/19/2024) (ama)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
19 19 misc Letter Thu 03/14 6:33 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Alyssa B. O'Gallagher dated March 14, 2024 re: Requesting Removal of Mr. Sherrod from Mediation. Document filed by Daniel Sherrod..(O'Gallagher, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/14 6:21 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alyssa O'Gallagher on behalf of Daniel Sherrod..(O'Gallagher, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Wed 02/28 4:48 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 4/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sge)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Fri 02/09 11:16 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 3/11/2024.(sge)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
17 17 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Mon 02/05 4:35 PM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/20/2024. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/01 4:50 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Daniel Sherrod served on 12/28/2023, answer due 1/18/2024. Service was accepted by Courtney Minor, Regional Counsel. Document filed by Ester Tomicic-Hines..(Maduegbuna, Samuel)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/01 4:49 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Lauren Gray served on 12/12/2023, answer due 1/26/2024. Service was accepted by Charlotte Stokes, Clerical Associate. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Ester Tomicic-Hines..(Maduegbuna, Samuel)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/01 4:47 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. New York City Housing Authority served on 12/7/2023, answer due 1/26/2024. Service was accepted by Charlotte Stokes, Clerical Associate. Document filed by Ester Tomicic-Hines..(Maduegbuna, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/26 4:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Lauren Gray, New York City Housing Authority..(Lupin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 12/22 4:46 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. The time for NYCHA and Gray to respond to the Complaint is extended to January 26, 2024. The initial pretrial conference in this matter, previously scheduled for January 25, 2024 at 10:00 a.m., is RESCHEDULED for March 28, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. The joint letter and proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, as described in ECF No. 9. shall be filed by March 21, 2024. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 12/22/2023) (ks)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings Fri 12/22 4:48 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Lauren Gray answer due 1/26/2024; New York City Housing Authority answer due 1/26/2024., Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 3/28/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke.) (ks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
11 11 motion Extension of Time Thu 12/21 5:25 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Andrew M. Lupin dated December 21, 2023. Document filed by Lauren Gray, New York City Housing Authority..(Lupin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/21 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Michael Lupin on behalf of Lauren Gray, New York City Housing Authority..(Lupin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
9 9 order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 10/20 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The conference will be held remotely by Microsoft Teams All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jessica-g-l-clarke. All parties are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/25/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 10/20/2023) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 10/19 10:46 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Housing Authority..(jgo)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 10/19 10:44 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lauren Gray..(jgo)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 10/19 10:32 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daniel Sherrod..(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 10/19 10:29 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 10/19 10:31 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 10/19 10:31 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 10/18 7:44 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lauren Gray, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Ester Tomicic-Hines..(Maduegbuna, Samuel)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 10/18 7:08 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Daniel Sherrod, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Ester Tomicic-Hines..(Maduegbuna, Samuel)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 10/18 7:08 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Housing Authority, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Ester Tomicic-Hines..(Maduegbuna, Samuel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 10/18 7:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Maduegbuna, Samuel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/18 7:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Lauren Gray, John and Jane Doe, New York City Housing Authority, Daniel Sherrod. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28445972)Document filed by Ester Tomicic-Hines..(Maduegbuna, Samuel)
Related: [-]