Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Jon Phipps Mccalla
Referred: Tu M Pham
Case #: 2:23-cv-02660
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2023
Terminated:Feb 13, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 3:31 AM CDT
Defendant
COLLIERVILLE CHRYSLER JEEP
% REGISTERED AGENT DARRYL STONE 393 S BYHALIA ROAD
COLLIERVILLE, TN 38017
Represented By
John R Adams
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jonathan O. Harris
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
KEVIN OBRIEN
393 S Byhalia Rd,
Collierville,, TN 38017
Represented By
John R Adams
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jonathan O. Harris
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
DOUG WILSON
Represented By
John R Adams
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jonathan O. Harris
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
TYRONE GAMBLE
Represented By
Luther Oneal Sutter
Sutter & Gillham P.L.L.C.
contact info

GPO Jan 24 2024
Order GRANTING 15 Motion to Extend Deadline for Service of Kevin O'Brien. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 01/24/2024. (eoc)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
31 31 order Judgment Tue 02/13 10:51 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 02/13/2024. (eoc)
Related: [-]
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 02/13 10:48 AM
Order GRANTING29 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 02/13/2024. (eoc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
29 29 motion Dismiss Mon 02/12 5:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss per Rule 41 by TYRONE GAMBLE. (Sutter, Luther)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
28 28 notice Setting Letter Thu 02/08 12:21 PM
SETTING LETTER: A TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is SET for WEDNESDAY, FEBRUARY 28, 2024 at 9:30 A.M. (CT) before United States District Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs) (Main Document 28 replaced on 2/8/2024) (jrs). Modified on 2/8/2024 (jrs)
Related: [-]
27 27 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 02/08 12:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: TelephonicScheduling Conference held on 2/8/2024. Luther Sutter appeared for the plaintiff. Jonathan Harris and John Adams appeared for the plaintiff. The Court reviewed case information and set an abbreviated preliminary schedule. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference will resume on Wednesday, February 28, 2024 at 9:30 AM (CT). (Court Reporter: Tina Gibson) (jrs)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/08 9:22 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by TYRONE GAMBLE as to KEVIN OBRIEN. (Sutter, Luther)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/06 2:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against TYRONE GAMBLE, filed by TYRONE GAMBLE. (Sutter, Luther)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 02/05 5:15 PM
Order GRANTING Leave to Amend Complaint and FINDING AS MOOT9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 02/05/2024. (eoc)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/05 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John R Adams on behalf of KEVIN OBRIEN (Adams, John)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/05 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan O. Harris on behalf of KEVIN OBRIEN (Harris, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
21 21 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Deadline Wed 01/24 4:30 PM
Order GRANTING15 Motion to Extend Deadline for Service of Kevin O'Brien. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 01/24/2024. (eoc)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Setting Letter Wed 01/24 10:19 AM
SETTING LETTER: A TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is SET for THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 8, 2024 at 10:45 A.M. (CT) before United States District Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 01/19 10:38 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Amend Complaint filed by COLLIERVILLE CHRYSLER JEEP, DOUG WILSON. (Adams, John)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 01/19 10:32 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Dismiss filed by COLLIERVILLE CHRYSLER JEEP, DOUG WILSON. (Adams, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
17 17 misc Proposed Pretrial Order Wed 01/17 8:21 AM
Proposed Pretrial Order extending time to serve Defendant Obrien by TYRONE GAMBLE. (Sutter, Luther)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
16 16 notice Courtesy Notice Tue 01/16 6:33 AM
COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document15 MOTION to Extend Deadline to Serve Defendant, Kevin O'Brien, only filed by TYRONE GAMBLE has been filed. For future reference, please note : Filer failed to indicate in docket text "Proposed Order Submitted" as required by local rules. If no order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
15 15 motion Extend Deadline Fri 01/12 3:43 PM
MOTION to Extend Deadline to Serve Defendant, Kevin O'Brien, only by TYRONE GAMBLE. (Sutter, Luther)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
14 14 5 pgs misc Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 01/05 7:05 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Related [+] filed by TYRONE GAMBLE. (Sutter, Luther)
Related: [-] places docket entry # 11 filed under wrong attorney login
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/05 7:03 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Related [+] and MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed by TYRONE GAMBLE.(Sutter, Luther)
Related: [-] places docket entry # 11 filed under wrong attorney login
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Proposed Amended Complaint
Friday, December 22, 2023
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 12/22 12:13 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Related [+] by COLLIERVILLE CHRYSLER JEEP, DOUG WILSON.(Harris, Jonathan)
Related: [-] places docket entry # 11 filed under wrong attorney login
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum iso Motion to Dismiss
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 12/22 11:17 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by COLLIERVILLE CHRYSLER JEEP, DOUG WILSON.(Adams, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum iso Motion to Dismiss
Friday, December 08, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/08 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John R Adams on behalf of COLLIERVILLE CHRYSLER JEEP, DOUG WILSON (Adams, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/04 1:34 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by COLLIERVILLE CHRYSLER JEEP, DOUG WILSON.(Harris, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 11.30.2023 email to opposing counsel
Thursday, November 30, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/30 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan O. Harris on behalf of COLLIERVILLE CHRYSLER JEEP, DOUG WILSON (Harris, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 10/19 10:31 AM
Summons Issued as to COLLIERVILLE CHRYSLER JEEP, KEVIN OBRIEN, DOUG WILSON. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service.(agj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Doug Wilson,
Att: 2 Kevin O'Brien
6 6 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Thu 10/19 10:16 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice LR 16.2 Thu 10/19 10:16 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice ADR Compliance Thu 10/19 10:15 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Courtesy Notice Thu 10/19 10:15 AM
COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document1 Complaint filed by TYRONE GAMBLE has been filed. For future reference, please note the complaint and civil cover sheet have hand written signatures and not the required electronic signatures. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . Filer is not required to resubmit document. (agj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
2 2 utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 10/19 9:56 AM
Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (agj)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/18 5:25 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-4260129), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Sutter, Luther)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons