Rehn v. City of Seattle et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Richard A Jones |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01609 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 19, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 1:46 AM PDT |
Defendant
City of Seattle
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Duus
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Younghun Kim
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Seth Wagner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Riley Caulfield
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jason Drummond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elisabeth Rehn
|
Represented By
|
1. | Seattle police officers break down wrong door, then woman sues (seattletimes.com) |
Submitted Tue 11/14/2023 | |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
RAJ Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates (FORM)
Fri 12/15 11:04 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 7-10 days. JURY TRIAL is set for 3/3/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 9/4/2024, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/4/2024, Discovery completed by 11/4/2024, Dispositive motions and motions challenging expert witness testimony due by 12/3/2024, Motions in Limine due by 2/3/2025, Pretrial Order due by 2/18/2025, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 2/24/2025. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Joint Status Report
Thu 12/14 5:07 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7-10. (Krulewitch, Jay) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
RAJ Joint Status Report Order (FORM)
Thu 11/16 12:31 PM
ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/30/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/7/2023, Joint Status Report due by 12/14/2023, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service
Wed 11/15 3:27 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jason Drummond mailed on 11/2/2023 (Krulewitch, Jay) |
|
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service
Wed 11/15 3:25 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant John Duus mailed on 11/2/2023 (Krulewitch, Jay) |
|
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service
Wed 11/15 3:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Seth Wagner mailed on 11/2/2023 (Krulewitch, Jay) |
|
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service
Wed 11/15 3:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Younghun Kim mailed on 11/2/2023 (Krulewitch, Jay) |
|
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service
Wed 11/15 3:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Riley Caulfield mailed on 11/2/2023 (Krulewitch, Jay) |
|
7 | 7
8
pgs
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 11/15 1:05 PM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint by Riley Caulfield, City of Seattle, Jason Drummond, John Duus, Younghun Kim, Seth Wagner.(Riedo, Catherine) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/30 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Catherine E Riedo on behalf of Defendant City of Seattle. (Riedo, Catherine) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/30 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alexandra Nica on behalf of Defendant City of Seattle. (Nica, Alexandra) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
7
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 10/26 4:24 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT of Plaintiff Elisabeth Rehn against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND filed by Elisabeth Rehn.(Krulewitch, Jay) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
misc
RAJ Standing Order (FORM)
Tue 10/24 11:50 AM
STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 10/24 11:20 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Riley Caufield, City of Seattle, Jason G Drummond, John Duus, Younghun Kim, Seth Wagner. (RE) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 10/24 10:36 AM
Judge Richard A. Jones added. (RE) |
||
Thursday, October 19, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 10/19 4:45 PM
COMPLAINT of Plaintiff Elisabeth Rehn against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Attorney Jay H Krulewitch added to party Elisabeth Rehn(pty:pla) filed by Elisabeth Rehn.(Krulewitch, Jay) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet Plaintiff's Civil Case Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Summons Summons for City of Seattle, | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Summons Summons for Riley Caufield, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Summons for Younghun Kim, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Summons for Seth Wagner, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Summons for John Duus, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Summons for Jason Drummond |