Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Richard W Story
Case #: 2:23-cv-00224
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Innerscope Hearing Technologies, Inc.
Defendant
Mark Moore
Defendant
Matthew Moore
Plaintiff
Tyler Blatchford
Represented By
Tyler Brand Kaspers
The Kaspers Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gabriel Gilbert
Represented By
Tyler Brand Kaspers
The Kaspers Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Ledbetter
Represented By
Tyler Brand Kaspers
The Kaspers Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristen Moffitt
Represented By
Tyler Brand Kaspers
The Kaspers Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rick Unruh
Represented By
Tyler Brand Kaspers
The Kaspers Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Yvonne Walsh
Represented By
Tyler Brand Kaspers
The Kaspers Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
36 36 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 05/08 2:21 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, with Jury Demand, filed by Amy Ledbetter, Tyler Blatchford, Kristen Moffitt, Yvonne Walsh, Rick Unruh, Gabriel Gilbert, Renee Waugh, Kathy Colapinto, Amber Atkinson, Chelsea Watkins, and Leah Beltz. (Kaspers, Tyler) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 5/8/2025 to edit filers (ddm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
35 35 17 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Amend Thu 05/01 2:34 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend their Complaint25 . Plaintiffs are to file an amended complaint within 7 days from the date of the filing of this Order. Once filed, the amended complaint will serve as the operative complaint in this case. The Clerk's entry of default against Defendant Innerscope is set aside, and the default judgment against Defendant Innerscope is vacated. Defendants Matthew Moore and Mark Moore's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 22] is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/01/2025. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
34 34 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/19 4:43 PM
ORDER advising that Plaintiffs have adequately addressed the Court's concerns regarding inactivity in the case and accordingly, the Show Cause Order is satisfied. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 02/19/2025. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
33 33 16 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 02/11 10:54 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re25 MOTION to Amend Complaint - Moore Defendants filed by Amy Ledbetter, Tyler Blatchford, Kristen Moffitt, Yvonne Walsh, Rick Unruh, and Gabriel Gilbert. (Kaspers, Tyler) Modified on 2/11/2025 to edit filers (ddm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 11/7/24 email,
Att: 2 Exhibit 11/7/24 damages table- redacted,
Att: 3 Exhibit 11/19/24 email,
Att: 4 Exhibit 12/2/24 email,
Att: 5 Exhibit 11/18/24 email
32 32 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 02/11 10:48 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re25 MOTION to Amend Complaint - Innerscope filed by Amy Ledbetter, Tyler Blatchford, Kristen Moffitt, Yvonne Walsh, Rick Unruh, and Gabriel Gilbert. (Kaspers, Tyler) Modified on 2/11/2025 to edit filers (ddm)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 02/11 11:10 AM
Submission of25 MOTION to Amend Complaint , to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
31 31 15 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/29 1:10 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 MOTION to Amend Complaint ,27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Amend Complaint filed by Innerscope Hearing Technologies, Inc..(Hatcher, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Matthew Moore
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/29 1:09 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 MOTION to Amend Complaint ,27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Amend Complaint filed by Matthew Moore, Mark Moore.(Hatcher, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Matthew Moore,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Mark Moore
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 01/22 9:40 AM
Submission of22 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION , to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
29 29 3 pgs misc Leave of Absence Tue 01/14 5:56 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): January 30-31, March 21, April 7-11, May 9-12, June 12-13, July 23-August 1, December 29-January 2, 2026, by R. Brent Hatcher.(Hatcher, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Original LOA,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, January 10, 2025
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 01/10 11:17 AM
ORDER granting27 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Innerscope Hearing Technologies, Inc., Matthew Moore and Mark Moore shall have up to and including January 29, 2025 to file a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint [Doc. 25]. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/10/2025. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
27 27 4 pgs motion Extension of Time Wed 01/08 5:33 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Amend Complaint by Innerscope Hearing Technologies, Inc., Matthew Moore, Mark Moore.(Hatcher, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Amend Complaint
Friday, January 03, 2025
26 26 4 pgs respm Response to Motion Fri 01/03 5:48 PM
RESPONSE re22 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by Amy Ledbetter. (Kaspers, Tyler)
Related: [-]
25 25 10 pgs motion Amend Fri 01/03 5:47 PM
MOTION to Amend Complaint by Amy Ledbetter.(Kaspers, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 15 pgs Exhibit Amended Complaint
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 12/18 2:10 PM
ORDER granting23 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall have through January 3, 2025 to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/18/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
23 23 4 pgs motion Extension of Time Mon 12/09 12:10 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Matthew Moore and Mark Moore's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction re:22 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Gabriel Gilbert, Amy Ledbetter, Tyler Blatchford, Kristen Moffitt, Yvonne Walsh, Rick Unruh.(Kaspers, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 06, 2024
22 22 4 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 12/06 4:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION with Brief In Support by Matthew Moore, Mark Moore.(Hatcher, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 22 pgs Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Matthew Moore,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Matthew Moore Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Matthew Moore Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit C to Matthew Moore Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit D to Matthew Moore Declaration,
Att: 7 Exhibit E to Matthew Moore Declaration,
Att: 8 Exhibit F to Matthew Moore Declaration,
Att: 9 Exhibit G to Matthew Moore Declaration,
Att: 10 Exhibit 2 Mark Moore Declaration
Monday, November 18, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/18 3:31 PM
ORDER granting the parties'20 Consent Motion to Extend Time For Defendants Matthew Moore and Mark Moore to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants Matthew Moore and Mark Moore shall have up to and including December 6, 2024 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/18/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Mon 11/18 3:06 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Matthew Moore, Mark Moore.(Hatcher, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, October 31, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 10/31 3:29 PM
ORDER GRANTING the parties'18 Consent Motion to Extend Time For Defendants Matthew Moore and Mark Moore to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants Matthew Moore and Mark Moore shall have up to and including November 22, 2024 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/31/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
18 18 4 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Thu 10/31 2:41 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Mark Moore, Matthew Moore.(Hatcher, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
17 17 40 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion to Set Aside Default Wed 10/23 8:03 AM
ORDER GRANTING in part AND DENYING in part Defendants' Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default12 . It is GRANTED as to Defendants Mark Moore and Matthew Moore, but it is DENIED as to Defendant Innerscope Hearing Technologies, Inc. Further, Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment11 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs' claims for breach of contract (Count II) and attorney's fees (Count VII), but it is DENIED as to Plaintiffs' claims under the FLSA (Count I), unpaid commissions (Count III), fraudulent inducement, promissory estoppel, and detrimental reliance (Count IV), unjust enrichment (Count V), and breach of duty of good faith and fair dealing (Count VI). A hearing must be set to determine the proper amount of damages and fees to be awarded. It is ORDERED that Defendants Mark Moore and Matthew Moore shall file a response by Answer or motion to Plaintiffs' Complaint within 14 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/22/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 08/15 10:30 AM
Submission of12 MOTION to Set Aside Default , to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
16 16 17 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 08/14 6:01 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Innerscope Hearing Technologies, Inc., Mark Moore, Matthew Moore. (Hatcher, R.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 08/08 3:09 PM
Submission of11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Innerscope Hearing Technologies, Inc., Matthew Moore, and Mark Moore , to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
15 15 18 pgs respm Response to Motion Wed 07/31 3:19 PM
RESPONSE re12 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Tyler Blatchford, Gabriel Gilbert, Amy Ledbetter, Kristen Moffitt, Rick Unruh, Yvonne Walsh. (Kaspers, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
14 14 11 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 07/24 4:38 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Innerscope Hearing Technologies, Inc., Matthew Moore, and Mark Moore filed by Innerscope Hearing Technologies, Inc., Mark Moore, Matthew Moore. (Smith, Matthew)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 07/24 10:28 AM
Submission of13 Response to Order to Show Cause, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
13 13 10 pgs respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 07/19 4:20 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re:10 Order to Show Cause, filed by Tyler Blatchford, Gabriel Gilbert, Amy Ledbetter, Kristen Moffitt, Rick Unruh, Yvonne Walsh. (Kaspers, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
12 12 4 pgs motion Set Aside Default Thu 07/18 5:54 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Default with Brief In Support by Innerscope Hearing Technologies, Inc., Mark Moore, Matthew Moore.(Smith, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 23 pgs Brief Defendants' Memorandum of Law In Support,
Att: 2 6 pgs Exhibit 1 Declaration of Matthew Moore,
Att: 3 61 pgs Exhibit A to Matthew Moore Declaration,
Att: 4 25 pgs Exhibit B to Declaration of Matthew Moore,
Att: 5 5 pgs Exhibit C to Matthew Moore Declaration,
Att: 6 3 pgs Exhibit D to Matthew Moore Declaration,
Att: 7 4 pgs Exhibit E to Matthew Moore Declaration,
Att: 8 4 pgs Exhibit F to Matthew Moore Declaration,
Att: 9 3 pgs Exhibit G to Matthew Moore Declaration,
Att: 10 4 pgs Exhibit 2 Mark Moore Declaration
11 11 13 pgs motion Default Judgment Thu 07/18 12:13 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Innerscope Hearing Technologies, Inc., Matthew Moore, and Mark Moore with Brief In Support by Tyler Blatchford, Gabriel Gilbert, Amy Ledbetter, Kristen Moffitt, Rick Unruh, Yvonne Walsh.(Kaspers, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 27 pgs Exhibit Ledbetter Declaration,
Att: 2 8 pgs Exhibit Blatchford Declaration,
Att: 3 8 pgs Exhibit Moffitt Declaration,
Att: 4 6 pgs Exhibit Walsh Declaration,
Att: 5 6 pgs Exhibit Unruh Declaration,
Att: 6 8 pgs Exhibit Gilbert Declaration,
Att: 7 4 pgs Exhibit 092523 Prelitigation Notice,
Att: 8 3 pgs Exhibit 092923 Prelitigation Notice,
Att: 9 2 pgs Exhibit Moore email,
Att: 10 10 pgs Exhibit Kaspers Declaration
Monday, July 08, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 07/08 12:28 PM
SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing Plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE, if any they can, within 14 days of the date of the entry of this order as to why the Court should not dismiss this action for failure to prosecute pursuant to LR 41.3(A)(3). Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 07/08/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
9 9 5 pgs motion Clerks Entry of Default Tue 05/07 1:18 PM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against Defendants Matthew Moore and Mark Moore by Amy Ledbetter.(Kaspers, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit Email from Matthew Moore
utility Clerks Entry of Default Tue 05/07 1:34 PM
Clerks Entry of Default as to Mark Moore, Matthew Moore. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
utility Docket Correction Wed 03/13 11:19 AM
Notification of Docket Correction re7 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Motion incorrectly dockets as a Motion for Default Judgment. Docket event type as been changed and docket text changed to reflect Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. (sk)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Entry of Default Wed 03/13 11:24 AM
Clerks Entry of Default entered as to Innerscope Hearing Technologies, Inc. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
8 8 7 pgs service Service by Publication Mon 02/26 3:59 PM
SERVICE by Publication. Last publication date 02/21/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
7 7 4 pgs motion Default Judgment Fri 02/23 12:42 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Innerscope Hearing Technologies, Inc. by Amy Ledbetter.(Kaspers, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of Service of Summons,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of damages
Friday, January 19, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Filing Fri 01/19 11:39 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION as to defendants Matthew Moore and Mark Moore re5 Order on Motion for Service by Publication, forwarded to Forsyth County News via envelope provided by Attorney Tyler B. Kaspers.(dgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Signed Notice,
Att: 2 Redacted Check,
Att: 3 Cover Letter,
Att: 4 Self Addressed Stamped Envelope
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/19 11:47 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (pursuant to O.C.G.A. § 9114(f)(1)(C)) as to Mark Moore, Matthew Moore at 2151 Professional Drive, 2nd Floor Roseville, CA 956616 Notice for Service by Publication,5 Order on Motion for Service by Publication, and1 Complaint. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Service by Publication Tue 01/02 1:53 PM
ORDER granting4 Plaintiff's Motion for Service by Publication and Second Motion to Serve the Defendants. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 01/02/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
4 4 5 pgs motion Service by Publication Tue 01/02 11:17 AM
MOTION for Service by Publication as to Matthew Moore, Mark Moore with Brief In Support by Amy Ledbetter.(Kaspers, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit Kaspers Declaration,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit Pre-litigation Demand and Litigation Hold Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit Waivers of Service cover letters,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit Emails from Defendant Matthew Moore,
Att: 5 Exhibit Affidavits of Non-service,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order
utility Remark Tue 01/02 2:03 PM
Instructions sent to counsel for Service of Publication5 Order. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
3 3 23 pgs notice Notice of Filing Mon 10/23 11:37 AM
COURT NOTICE OF FILING: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
2 2 2 pgs service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 10/19 1:30 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Innerscope Hearing Technologies, Inc., Mark Moore, Matthew Moore.(ddm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Summons,
Att: 2 2 pgs Summons
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/19 1:29 PM
COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Gabriel Gilbert, Tyler Blatchford, Yvonne Walsh, Rick Unruh, Amy Ledbetter, Kristen Moffitt. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12969566)(ddm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet