Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:23-mj-00760
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 20, 2023 2:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Jorge Cantu (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Corpus Christi
contact info
Rachel Elizabeth Braver
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Alexandria Marie Casey (2)
Represented By
Micah Wayne Hatley
Walker Keeling LLP
contact info
Material Witness
Jose Rafael Jimenez-Cazares
Represented By
Deborah R. Garcia
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Henry Geovani Maldonado
Represented By
Deborah R. Garcia
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Corpus Christi MagDuty
contact info
Yasmine Kathrina Tucker
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/20/2023 3:20 AM CDT
Monday, October 16, 2023
Arrest of Jorge Cantu. (AnnSalazar, 2)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Alexandria Marie Casey. (AnnSalazar, 2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jorge Cantu (1), Alexandria Marie Casey (2), filed. (Brooks) Initial Appearance set for 10/19/2023 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton (AnnSalazar, 2)
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Jose Rafael Jimenez-Cazares, Henry Geovani Maldonado as to Jorge Cantu, Alexandria Marie Casey. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 10/19/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton, filed. (AnnSalazar, 2)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Jose Rafael Jimenez-Cazares, Henry Geovani Maldonado. Deborah R. Garcia appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton) Parties notified. (MichelleHolliday, 2)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton) Parties notified. (MichelleHolliday, 2)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Alexandria Marie Casey. Micah Wayne Hatley appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton) Parties notified. (MichelleHolliday, 2)
Related: [-]