California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:23-cv-08702
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2023
Terminated:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 1:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Daniel J. Kinney
Represented By
Tomas A Guterres
Collins And Collins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Annette H. Vanos
Defendant
Judge Sergio C. Tapia, II
Represented By
Lindsay N. Frazier-Krane
Cummings Mcclorey Davis And Acho
contact info
Lindsay N Frazier-Krane
Cummings Mcclorey Davis And Acho
contact info
Defendant
Judge Scott A. Steiner
Represented By
Lindsay N. Frazier-Krane
Cummings Mcclorey Davis And Acho
contact info
Lindsay N Frazier-Krane
Cummings Mcclorey Davis And Acho
contact info
Defendant
Judge Cherry T. Pham
Represented By
Lindsay N. Frazier-Krane
Cummings Mcclorey Davis And Acho
contact info
Lindsay N Frazier-Krane
Cummings Mcclorey Davis And Acho
contact info
Defendant
Consuelo Olmos
Defendant
Matthew Morgan
Defendant
Kel Mitchell
Represented By
Ira M Steinberg
Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman And Machtinger LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fabiola Mancillas
Defendant
Joseph Land
1900 Avenue of the Stars Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Defendant
Judge Richard M. King
Represented By
Lindsay N. Frazier-Krane
Cummings Mcclorey Davis And Acho
contact info
Lindsay N Frazier-Krane
Cummings Mcclorey Davis And Acho
contact info
Defendant
Steven E. Kenilvort
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Nina Shayan Depatie
1925 Century Park E Suite 1700
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Defendant
Commissioner Mary L. Byrne
Represented By
Lindsay N. Frazier-Krane
Cummings Mcclorey Davis And Acho
contact info
Lindsay N Frazier-Krane
Cummings Mcclorey Davis And Acho
contact info
Defendant
Adam L. Birozy
Defendant
Judge Kerry R. Bensinger
Represented By
Lindsay N. Frazier-Krane
Cummings Mcclorey Davis And Acho
contact info
Lindsay N Frazier-Krane
Cummings Mcclorey Davis And Acho
contact info
Defendant
Michelle B. Bagneris
Defendant
All Persons Unknown
Plaintiff
Tyisha Mitchell
20500 Belshaw Avenue, Suite T1 - 2050
Carson, CA 90746


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 28, 2025
40 40 misc Mail Returned Thu 04/03 4:38 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Tyisha Mitchell re Judgment35 (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
41 41 misc Mail Returned Thu 04/03 4:41 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Tyisha Mitchell re Notice of Clerical Error (G-11)31 (hr)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Mail Returned Wed 03/26 12:59 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Tyisha Mitchell re R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations34 . (hr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
38 38 misc Mail Returned Thu 03/20 5:57 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Tyisha Mitchell re Notice of Report and Recommendation33 (LATE DOCKETING DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR) (jji)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Mail Returned Fri 01/24 10:44 AM
Mail Returned addressed to Tyisha Mitchell re Report and Recommendation32 (hr)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Mail Returned Fri 01/24 10:43 AM
Mail Returned addressed to Tyisha Mitchell re Order to Show Cause29 (hr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
35 35 judgmentCV Judgment Thu 12/19 1:07 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Related to: R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations34 . IT IS ADJUDGED that the action is dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (et)
Related: [-]
34 34 order R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations Thu 12/19 12:57 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal for Report and Recommendation (Issued)32 . IT THEREFORE IS ORDERED that Judgment be entered dismissing this action with prejudice. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
33 33 reportrecommend Notice of Report and Recommendation Mon 11/04 2:11 PM
NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. Objections to R&R due by 11/18/2024. (san)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report and Recommendation
32 32 reportrecommend Report and Recommendation (Issued) Mon 11/04 2:09 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow1 . IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED that the District Court issue an Order: (1) Accepting this Report and Recommendation; and (2) directing that Judgment be entered dismissing this action with prejudice. [See document for details.] (san)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
31 31 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Fri 09/27 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Order to Show Cause30 . Due to clerical error, the Order to Show Cause at docket entry 30 is a duplicate of the Order to Show Cause at docket entry 29. Therefore, please disregard docket entry 30. (hr)
Related: [-]
30 30 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 09/27 3:34 PM
[SEE NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR31 ] (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. Plaintiff's response is due no later than October 18, 2024. (see document for further details) (hr) Modified on 9/27/2024 (hr)
Related: [-]
29 29 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 09/27 3:32 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution and failing to comply with the Court's order. Plaintiff may alternatively file a First Amended Complaint to discharge this Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff's response is due no later than October 18, 2024. Plaintiff is hereby cautioned that failing to comply with this Order to Show Cause will result in the recommendation that this action be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the Court's orders. IT IS SO ORDERED. [See Order for details.] (san)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
28 28 order Dismiss Case as Frivolous Fri 09/06 1:37 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DEEM PLAINTIFF A VEXATIOUS LITIGANT by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow: denying9 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous. The Court does not findthat Plaintiff's actions are frivolous or harassing for purposes of declaring her a vexatious litigant. Therefore, the Motion is DENIED. (see document for further details). (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
27 27 order R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations Wed 08/21 1:48 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Jesus G. Bernal for MOTION to Dismiss13 , MOTION to Dismiss10 , MOTION to Dismiss5 , MOTION to Dismiss8 , MOTION to Dismiss11 . Plaintiff is hereby ordered, if she still desires to pursue this action, to file a First Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order accepting the Report and Recommendation remedying the deficiencies discussed in the Report and Recommendation. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
26 26 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 07/31 2:05 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE THAT MOTION TO DEEM PLAINTIFF A VEXATIOUS LITIGANT (DOCKET NO. 9) IS UNDER SUBMISSION by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow, re: MOTION9 . As of today's date, the Court has not received Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motion, and Plaintiff has not requested an extension of time to file her Opposition. Therefore, the matter is now under submission. (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
25 25 reportrecommend Notice of Report and Recommendation Tue 07/09 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow and Lodging of Proposed Judgment and Order. Objections to R&R due by 7/23/2024 (dc)
Related: [-]
24 24 reportrecommend Report and Recommendation (Issued) Tue 07/09 12:39 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE issued by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (dc)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 07/09 12:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEEM PLAINTIFF A VEXATIOUS LITIGANT (DOCKET NO.9 ) by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an Opposition to the Motion by no later than Wednesday, July 24, 2024. Any Reply to the Opposition shall be filed within ten (10) days of receipt of the Opposition. Under Central District Local Rule 7-12, the failure to file a required document, or the failure to file it within the deadline, may be deemed consent to the granting of the Motion. (dc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
22 22 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Mon 02/26 1:04 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS 1st AMENDEDCOMPLAINT [DKT. #21 ] by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow: the Court hereby STRIKES the FAC from the docket. The Court will also exercise its discretion to provide plaintiff an opportunity to oppose the pending motions to dismiss. Any oppositions must be filed on or before March 22, 2024. The Court will thereafter take this matter under submission on the date any oppositions are filed or become due. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
21 21 othcmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/23 9:20 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Persons Unknown, Michelle B. Bagneris, Kerry R. Bensinger, Adam L. Birozy, Mary L. Byrne, Nina Shayan Depatie, Does, Steven E. Kenilvort, Richard M. King, Daniel J. Kinney, Joseph Land, Fabiola Mancillas, Kel Mitchell, Matthew Morgan, Consuelo Olmos, Cherry T. Pham, Scott A. Steiner, Sergio C. Tapia, II, Annette H. Vanos, amending Complaint1 , filed by Plaintiff Tyisha Mitchell(hr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 2
Friday, January 12, 2024
20 20 respm Motion Related Document Fri 01/12 1:34 PM
NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO JUDICIAL DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 5 filed by Defendants Kerry R. Bensinger, Mary L. Byrne, Richard M. King, Cherry T. Pham, Scott A. Steiner, Sergio C. Tapia, II. (Frazier-Krane, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
19 19 respm Non-Opposition to Motion Fri 01/12 10:09 AM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS, re: MOTION to Dismiss10 , JOINT MOTION to Dismiss11 , filed by Defendants Nina Shayan Depatie, Joseph Land. (hr)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Non-Opposition to Motion Wed 01/10 4:56 PM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 8 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous 9 filed by Defendant Kel Mitchell. (Steinberg, Ira)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/10 2:20 PM
Notice of Non-Receipt of Opposition to Defendant Kinney's Motion to Dismiss filed by defendant Daniel J. Kinney. (Guterres, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
16 16 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Hearings Fri 12/01 12:54 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER: (1) SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; AND (2) TAKING HEARINGS OFF CALENDAR by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow, re: MOTION to Dismiss8 , MOTION to Dismiss9 , MOTION to Dismiss10 , MOTION to Dismiss11 , Joinder12 , MOTION to Dismiss13 , Proof of Service15 . The Court finds that the matters raised by the Motions are capable of resolution without a hearing and hereby takes the December 18, 2023 and January 22, 2024 hearings OFF CALENDAR. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on the Motions: Monday, January 1, 2024: Deadline for Plaintiff to file an Opposition or a Statement of Non-Opposition; Wednesday, January 10, 2024: Deadline for the Judicial Defendants to file an optional Reply, if necessary. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
15 15 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 11/27 4:52 PM
SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) filed by defendant Daniel J. Kinney, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction, and Damages 13 served on 11/27/2023. (Guterres, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
14 14 cs_rasgn Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Case (non-consent) Wed 11/22 3:37 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - OCMJ# 23-142 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the Creation of Calendar of Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow, this case is transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo to the calendar of Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow for all further proceedings authorized by statute, local rules and general orders. All documents subsequently filed shall bear this new case designation 2:23-cv-08702 JGB(DTB) absent further order of the Court. (rn)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Wed 11/22 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction, and Damages filed by Defendant Daniel J. Kinney. Motion set for hearing on 1/22/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attorney Tomas A Guterres added to party Daniel J. Kinney(pty:dft)) (Guterres, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
12 12 respm Joinder (Motion Related) Thu 11/16 5:20 PM
JOINDER to Defendant Kel Mitchell's Motion to Deem Plaintiff Vexatious Litigant, re: MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous9 , filed by Defendants Nina Shayan Depatie, Joseph Land. (hr)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Thu 11/16 5:15 PM
JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Civil Rights Complaint filed by Defendants Nina Shayan Depatie, Joseph Land. Motion set for hearing on 12/18/2023 at at 9:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (hr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Lodged Proposed Order
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Thu 11/16 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Civil Rights Complaint filed by Defendants Nina Shayan Depatie, Joseph Land. (hr)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss Case as Frivolous Wed 11/15 5:57 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Defendant Kel Mitchell. Motion set for hearing on 12/18/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Steinberg, Ira)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendant Kel Mitchell's Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Deem Plaintiff Vexatious Litigant,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J,
Att: 12 Exhibit K,
Att: 13 Exhibit L,
Att: 14 Exhibit M,
Att: 15 Exhibit N,
Att: 16 Exhibit O,
Att: 17 Exhibit P,
Att: 18 Proposed Order
8 8 motion Dismiss Case Wed 11/15 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Kel Mitchell. Motion set for hearing on 12/18/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attorney Ira M Steinberg added to party Kel Mitchell(pty:dft)) (Steinberg, Ira)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendant Kel Mitchell's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
7 7 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 11/07 6:00 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER: (1) SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON JUDICIAL DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; AND (2) TAKING HEARING OFF CALENDAR by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo, re: MOTION to Dismiss5 . The Court finds that the matters raised by the MTD are capable of resolution without a hearing and hereby takes the December 12, 2023 hearing OFF CALENDAR. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on the MTD: Tuesday, November 28, 2023: deadline for Plaintiff to file an Opposition or a Statement of Non-Opposition; Friday, December 8, 2023: deadline for the Judicial Defendants to file an optional Reply, if necessary. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
6 6 misc For Judicial Notice Mon 11/06 3:18 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 5 filed by Defendants Kerry R. Bensinger, Mary L. Byrne, Richard M. King, Cherry T. Pham, Scott A. Steiner, Sergio C. Tapia, II. (Frazier-Krane, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss Case Mon 11/06 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants Kerry R. Bensinger, Mary L. Byrne, Richard M. King, Cherry T. Pham, Scott A. Steiner, Sergio C. Tapia, II. Motion set for hearing on 12/12/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (Attorney Lindsay N Frazier-Krane added to party Kerry R. Bensinger(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay N Frazier-Krane added to party Mary L. Byrne(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay N Frazier-Krane added to party Richard M. King(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay N Frazier-Krane added to party Cherry T. Pham(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay N Frazier-Krane added to party Scott A. Steiner(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay N Frazier-Krane added to party Sergio C. Tapia, II(pty:dft)) (Frazier-Krane, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Wed 10/18 5:20 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 10/18 5:18 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tyisha Mitchell. (et)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 10/18 5:17 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - Related [+]1 as to Defendants Michelle B. Bagneris, Kerry R. Bensinger, Adam L. Birozy, Mary L. Byrne, Nina Shayan Depatie, Steven E. Kenilvort, Richard M. King, Daniel J. Kinney, Joseph Land, Fabiola Mancillas, Kel Mitchell, Matthew Morgan, Consuelo Olmos, Cherry T. Pham, Scott A. Steiner, Sergio C. Tapia, II, Annette H. Vanos. (et)
Related: [-] ferred
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Referred) Wed 10/18 5:13 PM
CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT FOR PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND DAMAGES filed against Defendants All Persons Unknown, Michelle B. Bagneris, Kerry R. Bensinger, Adam L. Birozy, Mary L. Byrne, Nina Shayan Depatie, Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Steven E. Kenilvort, Richard M. King, Daniel J. Kinney, Joseph Land, Fabiola Mancillas, Kel Mitchell, Matthew Morgan, Consuelo Olmos, Cherry T. Pham, Scott A. Steiner, Sergio C. Tapia, II, Annette H. Vanos. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (Filing fee$402 PAID.), filed by Plaintiff Tyisha Mitchell. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet