Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam R Cummings
Case #: 1:23-cv-00206
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2023
Re-opened:Dec 31, 2024
Terminated:Dec 31, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 10:43 AM CDT
Defendant
Tokai Varbon CB, Ltd
Represented By
Karen Coomer Denney
Haynes & Boone LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brenden Stanislaus
Represented By
Austin Patrick Campbell
Rob Wiley PC
contact info
Rob J Wiley
Law Office Of Rob Wiley PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Tue 12/31 9:18 AM
ORDER. The Court notes that the Parties have filed a Stipulation of Dismissal in the above-styled and -numbered civil action. As such, all claims in the above-styled and -numbered civil action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and with each Party to bear its own costs and fees. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 12/31/2024) (amg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
17 17 misc Stipulation Mon 12/30 11:14 AM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Brenden Stanislaus. (Campbell, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 09, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Mon 12/09 11:24 AM
ORDER. The Court notes that the Parties have filed a Notice of Mediation Settlement as to all claims asserted in the above-styled and -numbered civil action. As such. the above-styled and -numbered civil action is ADMINISTRATMLY CLOSED. The Parties shall file dismissal documents within 30 days from the date of this Order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 12/9/2024) (amg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
15 15 adr ADR Summary Fri 12/06 12:44 PM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by Tokai Varbon CB, Ltd. Attorneys in Attendance: Austin Campbell and Karen Denney. Outcome of ADR: Settled as a result of ADR. (Denney, Karen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 10/29 9:52 AM
ORDER. On this date, the Court considered the Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines, filed October 28, 2024, and finds that good cause exists for said Motion to be GRANTED. More specifically, the deadline for the Parties to file motions for summary judgment and to complete mediation is hereby extended to on or before 3:00 p.m. on December 13, 2024. The mediator must file a report to the Court within seven (7) days from the completion of mediation. All other dates, deadlines, and orders in the November 13, 2023 Scheduling Order, ECF No.8 , remain the same as previously ordered. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 10/29/2024) (amg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time Mon 10/28 1:26 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time of time for mediation and filing of motion for summary judgment filed by Tokai Varbon CB, Ltd (Denney, Karen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/08 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas filed by Tokai Varbon CB, Ltd (Denney, Karen)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
11 11 order Protective Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 01/29 11:18 AM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The Court enters the following Agreed Protective Order ('Order") pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(c)(1). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/29/2024) (amg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
10 10 motion Protective Order Tue 01/23 3:33 PM
Agreed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Tokai Varbon CB, Ltd (Denney, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/08 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena filed by Tokai Varbon CB, Ltd (Denney, Karen)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
8 8 3 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Mon 11/13 11:20 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to Rule 16(b), Fed. R. Civ. P., the Court establishes the following schedule for this case: (a) Motions to join other parties and amend the pleadings must be filed by 3:00 p.m. on March 15, 2024. (b) Motions for summary judgment must be filed by 3:00 p.m. on November 15, 2024. (c) The parties must take this case to mediation which must be completed by 3:00 p.m. on November 15, 2024. The mediator must file a report to the Court within seven (7) days from the completion of mediation. (d) Motions in limine must be filed and discovery must be completed by 3:00 p.m. on April 14, 2025. If a pretrial conference is deemed necessary, counsel shall notify the Court at the time of filing the proposed pretrial order, or sooner, and the Court will, at the Court's discretion, schedule such a conference. Jury Trial set for 5/5/2025 at 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2000, 341 Pine St., Abilene, TX 79601-5928 before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. The trial setting will continue for the following weeks during the same month. This case has been scheduled for trial with other cases. You are responsible for staying in contact with the Judge's chambers to determine where your case stands on the Court's docket. There will be no docket call. See Order for additional instructions and deadlines. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 11/13/2023) (amg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
7 7 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 11/10 4:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tokai Varbon CB, Ltd. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Denney, Karen)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/10 4:41 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Tokai Varbon CB, Ltd. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Denney, Karen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Tue 10/31 4:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tokai Varbon CB, Ltd ; served on 10/20/2023. (Campbell, Austin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
4 4 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 10/20 2:28 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brenden Stanislaus. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Campbell, Austin)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 10/20 11:26 AM
Summons Issued as to Tokai Carbon CB, Ltd. (amg)
Related: [-]
2 2 qcref Cummings (West Texas) Fri 10/20 11:09 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (amg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/20 10:42 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Tokai Carbon CB, Ltd. filed by Brenden Stanislaus. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-14117328) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Campbell, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned (Public Entry) Fri 10/20 10:54 AM
Case assigned to Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. Related [+]
Related: [-] kc