Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Scott J Frankel
Case #: 3:23-cv-00924
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2023
Terminated:Oct 17, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 7:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Forest River, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas J Bemenderfer
Taft Stettinius & Hollister Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Thomas Jackson Bemenderfer
Taft Stettinius & Hollister Llp - Ind/in
contact info
John D Papageorge
Taft Stettinius & Hollister Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Mediator
Peter Schroeder
Norris Choplin and Schroeder 101 W Ohio Street Suite 900
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Plaintiff
Robert Speckman
Represented By
Richard C Dalton
Richard C Dalton LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Taylor Speckman
Represented By
Richard C Dalton
Richard C Dalton LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, October 17, 2024
20 20 order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Terminate Civil Case Thu 10/17 9:02 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to19 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice. Parties to bear their own fees and costs. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/17/24. (dnj)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
19 19 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Mon 09/16 6:29 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice by Defendant Forest River, Inc.. (Papageorge, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
18 18 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 08/13 10:20 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-22 and the retirement of Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr., this case is now reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. (ksc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
17 17 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 07/25 7:11 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 7/25/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr. Pltf. Robert Speckman appeared with Atty. Rick Dalton. Def. Jennifer Mitchell (Forest River rep.) appeared with Atty. Tom Bemenderfer. Parties appeared for JSC, negotiated in good faith, and reach a comprehensive settlement agreement. Parties to file dismissal paperwork NLT 9/16/2024. (slm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
16 16 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 05/23 3:03 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 5/23/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr. Pla Robert Speckman with Atty Dalton. Dft Jennifer Mitchell Related [+] with Atty Bemenderfer. Parties appeared for JSC and negotiated in good faith but did not reach settlement. JSC recessed and rescheduled for July 25, 2024, at 3:00 P.M. EDT (Zoom). in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr. (slm)
Related: [-] p
Thursday, May 02, 2024
15 15 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 05/02 5:18 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 5/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr. Pla. Robert Speckman; Atty. Rick DaltonDft. FR: Jennifer Mitchell Related [+]; Atty. Tom BemenderferParties appeared for JSC and negotiated in good faith but did not reach settlement. JSC recessed and rescheduled Settlement Conference for 5/23/2024 01:00 PM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr. (slm)
Related: [-] p.
Thursday, March 14, 2024
14 14 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 03/14 2:34 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/14/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr. Pla appeared by atty Dalton. Dft appeared by atty Bemenderfer. Confidential ettlement Report due by 4/22/2024. Settlement Conference set for 5/2/2024 01:00 PM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr. (slm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Mon 03/11 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference, to select a date to conduct a judicial settlement conference, set for 3/14/2024 12:00 PM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr. To connect to the conference, parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID number 160 4237 7854#, push # to skip entry of a participant ID and enter passcode 356255# at least five minutes before the conference start time.(slm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 02/01 2:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties filed their proposed report presenting an agreed discovery plan, which the Court ADOPTS by reference. The Court now enters the instant Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order regarding the conduct of discovery and deadlines as follows. Any motion challenging Plaintiff's jurisdictional allegations shall be filed on or before 3/25/2024, if deemed necessary. The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 3/7/2024. The last date for the parties to amend the pleadings without leave of court is 3/25/2024. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff(s) by 7/25/2024; and from defendant(s) by 9/25/2024. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) is due every six weeks until trial. The last date for the completion of ALL DISCOVERY is 1/27/2025. The deadline to file any discovery-related nondispositive motion is 12/30/2024. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 2/27/2025. The parties have agreed to Peter Schroeder as mediator. The parties may also seek a settlement conference with the Honorable Michael G. Gotsch, Sr. The parties are authorized to mediate until 2/12/2025. The Court hereby VACATES the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for February 13, 2024, at 10:45 a.m. EST. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 2/1/24. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Tue 01/30 4:13 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bemenderfer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 01/29 3:59 PM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS the parties to file their proposed discovery plan INSTANTER, but no later than 2/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/29/2024. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
9 9 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Fri 01/05 10:44 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/05 10:44 AM
ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 1/25/2024. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2024 10:45 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/5/24. (slm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/28 6:10 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Forest River, Inc..(Bemenderfer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 11/20 4:45 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Forest River, Inc.. All Defendants. (Bemenderfer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/20 4:38 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Forest River, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc for Forest River, Inc... (Bemenderfer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/20 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Jackson Bemenderfer on behalf of All Defendants (Bemenderfer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/20 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John D Papageorge on behalf of All Defendants (Papageorge, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 10/23 8:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Forest River, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 10/23 8:15 PM
Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE.(nal)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/20 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Forest River, Inc.( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5390133.), filed by Robert Speckman, Taylor Speckman.(Dalton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons