New York Southern District Court
Judge:Colleen Mcmahon
Case #: 1:23-cv-09287
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 21, 2024 5:39 AM EDT
Defendant
Credit Suisse Group AG
Represented By
Tammy Lynn Roy
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Nicholas Noyes Matuschak
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Herbert Scott Washer
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Jason Michael Hall
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Edward Nathaniel Moss
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Gottstein
Defendant
Dixit Joshi
Represented By
Tammy Lynn Roy
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Nicholas Noyes Matuschak
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Herbert Scott Washer
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Jason Michael Hall
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Edward Nathaniel Moss
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ulrich Korner
Represented By
Tammy Lynn Roy
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Nicholas Noyes Matuschak
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Herbert Scott Washer
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Jason Michael Hall
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Edward Nathaniel Moss
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Defendant
Axel P. Lehmann
Represented By
Tammy Lynn Roy
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Nicholas Noyes Matuschak
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Herbert Scott Washer
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Jason Michael Hall
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Edward Nathaniel Moss
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Defendant
David R. Mathers
Defendant
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG
Defendant
Antonio Horta-Osorio
Represented By
Tammy Lynn Roy
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Nicholas Noyes Matuschak
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Herbert Scott Washer
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Jason Michael Hall
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Edward Nathaniel Moss
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Core Capital Partners, Ltd.
Represented By
Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Thomas Henry Przybylowski
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
James Michael LoPiano
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, December 20, 2024
33 33 misc Letter Fri 12/20 1:10 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Herbert S. Washer dated December 20, 2024 re: Response to Plaintiff's December 17, 2024 Letter (ECF No. 32). Document filed by Credit Suisse Group AG, Axel P. Lehmann, Ulrich Korner, Dixit Joshi, Antonio Horta-Osorio..(Washer, Herbert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
32 32 misc Letter Tue 12/17 6:50 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Brian Calandra dated December 17, 2024 re: Defendants pending motion to dismiss and motion for class certification in related case No. 1:23-cv-5874-CM. Document filed by Core Capital Partners, Ltd...(Calandra, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
31 31 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 11/15 5:11 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:27 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Credit Suisse Group AG, Axel P. Lehmann, Ulrich Korner, Dixit Joshi, Antonio Horta-Osorio..(Washer, Herbert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
30 30 27 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Thu 11/07 4:51 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:27 MOTION to Dismiss .,25 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Class Action Complaint . . Document filed by Core Capital Partners, Ltd...(Calandra, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
29 29 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 10/17 6:09 PM
DECLARATION of Nicholas N. Matuschak in Support re:27 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Credit Suisse Group AG, Antonio Horta-Osorio, Dixit Joshi, Ulrich Korner, Axel P. Lehmann..(Washer, Herbert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Information Memorandum by CS For Certain AT1 Notes,
Att: 2 Exhibit Information Memorandum by CS For Certain AT1 Notes,
Att: 3 Exhibit Information Memorandum by CS For Certain AT1 Notes
28 28 23 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 10/17 6:04 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:27 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Credit Suisse Group AG, Antonio Horta-Osorio, Dixit Joshi, Ulrich Korner, Axel P. Lehmann..(Washer, Herbert)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Dismiss Thu 10/17 6:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Credit Suisse Group AG, Antonio Horta-Osorio, Dixit Joshi, Ulrich Korner, Axel P. Lehmann. Responses due by 11/7/2024.(Washer, Herbert)
Related: [-]
26 26 19 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 10/17 5:47 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:25 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Class Action Complaint . . Document filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers AG..(Bongiorno, Michael)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Dismiss Thu 10/17 5:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss 1 Class Action Complaint . Document filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers AG..(Bongiorno, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/15 8:48 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Colleen McMahon for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 10/11 1:50 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) PricewaterhouseCoopers AG. Document filed by Core Capital Partners, Ltd.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Calandra, Brian)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/11 1:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Peter Calandra on behalf of Core Capital Partners, Ltd...(Calandra, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/04 5:51 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brad Eric Konstandt on behalf of PricewaterhouseCoopers AG..(Konstandt, Brad)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/04 5:50 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Rhys Davies on behalf of PricewaterhouseCoopers AG..(Davies, Andrew)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/04 5:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael G. Bongiorno on behalf of PricewaterhouseCoopers AG..(Bongiorno, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
19 19 3 pgs order Scheduling Order Wed 09/25 4:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendants have 14 business days, or until October 17, 2024, to file any motions directed to the existing pleading in this action. To keep the briefs short, references to the court's decision in Diabat are acceptable in place of lengthy arguments for why particular claims and/or particular defendants should be dismissed from this action - that is the fair implication of the stipulation that induced the court to stay this action. Plaintiff has 14 business days, or until November 7, 2024, to file opposition papers. Defendants have five business days, or until November 15, 2024 to reply. These dates will not be extended for any reason. (Motions due by 10/17/2024. Responses due by 11/7/2024 Replies due by 11/15/2024.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/25/24) BY ECF TO ALL COUNSEL. (yv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
18 18 order Stipulation and Order Thu 01/18 5:43 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, AGREED, AND ORDERED: 1. Undersigned counsel is authorized to waive, and hereby does waive as of the date hereof, service of the Complaint on behalf of the Stipulating Defendants. The waiver of such service is made expressly without waiver of any of the defenses, objections, or arguments of the Stipulating Defendants in this action (other than as to the sufficiency of service of process) including, but not limited to, defenses that this Court lacks personal jurisdiction over one of more of the Stipulating Defendants and defenses to the recognition and enforcement in Switzerland or in any other foreign jurisdiction of any judgment against one or more of the Stipulating Defendants that may be rendered in this case. 2. The Stipulating Defendants shall not be required to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Complaint at this time. The Stipulating Defendants will answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond on a schedule to be set by the Court after (i) a determination has been made as to whether this action will be consolidated with the Diabat action and (ii) if this action is not consolidated, after a lead plaintiff has been appointed and this Court has set a schedule for the filing of a consolidated amended complaint. 3. For the avoidance of doubt, the Stipulating Defendants reserve their right to seek and/or argue in favor of consolidation of this action with the Diabat action and/or any other related cases.Plaintiff reserves its right to oppose such consolidation. SO ORDERED this 18 day of 2024. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/18/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Thu 01/18 4:01 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Credit Suisse Group AG, Antonio Horta-Osorio, Dixit Joshi, Ulrich Korner, Axel P. Lehmann..(Hall, Jason)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/18 3:55 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UBS Group AG for Credit Suisse Group AG. Document filed by Credit Suisse Group AG..(Washer, Herbert)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/18 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Noyes Matuschak on behalf of Credit Suisse Group AG, Antonio Horta-Osorio, Dixit Joshi, Ulrich Korner, Axel P. Lehmann..(Matuschak, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/18 3:32 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Nathaniel Moss on behalf of Credit Suisse Group AG, Antonio Horta-Osorio, Dixit Joshi, Ulrich Korner, Axel P. Lehmann..(Moss, Edward)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/18 3:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tammy Lynn Roy on behalf of Credit Suisse Group AG, Antonio Horta-Osorio, Dixit Joshi, Ulrich Korner, Axel P. Lehmann..(Roy, Tammy)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/18 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Michael Hall on behalf of Credit Suisse Group AG, Antonio Horta-Osorio, Dixit Joshi, Ulrich Korner, Axel P. Lehmann..(Hall, Jason)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/18 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Herbert Scott Washer on behalf of Credit Suisse Group AG, Antonio Horta-Osorio, Dixit Joshi, Ulrich Korner, Axel P. Lehmann..(Washer, Herbert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
10 10 service Amended Summons Issued Wed 01/03 2:21 PM
ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to PricewaterhouseCoopers AG..(pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
9 9 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Tue 01/02 3:38 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to PricewaterhouseCoopers AG, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Core Capital Partners, Ltd...(Lieberman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
utility Case Accepted as Related Wed 12/06 1:04 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:23-cv-05874-CM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 12/06 1:06 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 12/06 1:07 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (tro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
8 8 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/26 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Michael LoPiano on behalf of Core Capital Partners, Ltd...(LoPiano, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/26 1:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Henry Przybylowski on behalf of Core Capital Partners, Ltd...(Przybylowski, Thomas)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/26 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Core Capital Partners, Ltd...(Hood, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Tue 10/24 3:38 PM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 1:23-cv-5874 (CM). (gp)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 10/23 3:56 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Credit Suisse Group AG, Thomas Gottstein, Antonio Horta-Osorio, Dixit Joshi, Ulrich Korner, Axel P. Lehmann, David R. Mathers, PricewaterhouseCoopers AG..(gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 10/23 3:54 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 10/23 3:54 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
4 4 misc Statement of Relatedness Fri 10/20 6:36 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 23-cv-05874. Document filed by Core Capital Partners, Ltd...(Lieberman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 10/20 6:32 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Credit Suisse Group AG, Thomas Gottstein, Antonio Horta-Osorio, Dixit Joshi, Ulrich Korner, Axel P. Lehmann, David R. Mathers, PricewaterhouseCoopers AG, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Core Capital Partners, Ltd...(Lieberman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 10/20 6:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lieberman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
1 1 54 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/20 6:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Credit Suisse Group AG, Thomas Gottstein, Antonio Horta-Osorio, Dixit Joshi, Ulrich Korner, Axel P. Lehmann, David R. Mathers, PricewaterhouseCoopers AG. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28458200)Document filed by Core Capital Partners, Ltd...(Lieberman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]