Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:23-mj-00761
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2023 2:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Juan Ricardo Medina (1)
Represented By
Rachel Elizabeth Braver
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Corpus Christi
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Corpus Christi MagDuty
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/21/2023 3:48 AM CDT
Thursday, October 19, 2023
Arrest of Juan Ricardo Medina. (AnnSalazar, 2)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs COMPLAINT as to Juan Ricardo Medina (1), filed. (Nueces) Initial Appearance set for 10/20/2023 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton (AnnSalazar, 2)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton) Parties notified. (MichelleHolliday, 2)
Related: [-]