New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Taryn A Merkl
Case #: 1:23-cv-07874
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2023
Terminated:Feb 21, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 6:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Director John M. Allen
Represented By
Philip R. DePaul
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Director Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Philip R. DePaul
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Philip R. DePaul
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Represented By
Philip R. DePaul
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
B Wen
Represented By
Aleksander B Milch
The Kasen Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 02/21 9:21 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (RC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/08 12:33 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by John M. Allen, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) (DePaul, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 01/16 4:42 PM
ORDER: The motion for extension of time to file answer10 is granted, on consent. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 3/18/2024 . The parties are respectfully reminded that any motion practice must be initiated in accordance with the Individual Rules of the assigned District Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl on 1/16/2024. (ES)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 01/12 11:41 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by John M. Allen, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS). (DePaul, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued Tue 11/28 3:54 PM
Summons Issued as to John M. Allen, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS). (MB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Immigration/Social Security Cases Wed 11/22 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip R. DePaul on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (DePaul, Philip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
7 7 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 11/16 7:31 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by B Wen (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
order Order on Motion to Expedite Thu 11/09 4:38 PM
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the first motion to expedite issuance of summons5 . The motion is granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to promptly issue summons. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i), however, to serve the United States, a party must serve the agency and the United States Attorney's Office. Accordingly, Counsel is respectfully directed to submit summons for the United States Attorney's Office, E.D.N.Y., by 11/16/2023 , and to serve the U.S. Attorney's Office as soon as practicable thereafter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl on 11/9/2023. (ES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
order Order Reassigning Case Wed 11/08 11:01 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl for all further proceedings. Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 11/8/2023. (CV)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 11/06 12:45 PM
Summons Issued as to John M. Allen, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (MLR)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 05, 2023
5 5 motion Expedite Sun 11/05 3:58 PM
First MOTION to Expedite Issuance of Summons by B Wen. (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons
Sunday, October 29, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation Sun 10/29 5:00 PM
Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 10/24 11:38 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by B Wen (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 10/23 1:54 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/23 1:53 PM
Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Mon 10/23 1:54 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: No summons provided, please submit summons. The event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 22, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 10/22 4:50 PM
COMPLAINT against John M. Allen, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17206876 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by B Wen. (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A--Order Granting Asylum to Plaintiff,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B--USCIS Receipt,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C--Pre-Litigation Letter Sent to USCIS,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet