Member Case
Lead case is: 4:23-bk-90827

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 4:23-bk-90842
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2023
Terminated:Mar 05, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
AFFILIATED PET SYSTEMS, L.L.C.
1400 Forest Glen Rd Ste 430
Silver Spring, MD 20910-1464
Represented By
Kristhy M Peguero
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Sunday, March 10, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/11 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Final Decree
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
4 4 order Final Decree (No Form) Fri 03/08 2:10 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases Signed on 3/5/2024. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/25 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/25/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Joint Administration
Monday, October 23, 2023
2 2 order Joint Administration Mon 10/23 12:20 PM
Order for Joint Administration under 23-90827 Signed on 10/23/2023 (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Mon 10/23 12:21 PM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 23-90827 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 22, 2023
1 1 51 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Sun 10/22 4:02 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by AFFILIATED PET SYSTEMS, L.L.C.. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 11/21/2023 (Peguero, Kristhy)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Sun 10/22 6:33 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-90842 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A24812302. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]