Delaware District Court
Judge:Maryellen Noreika
Case #: 1:23-cv-01200
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 9:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By
Melissa A. Reinckens
contact info
Gabrielle Velkes
contact info
Brian A. Biggs
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Stephanie E. O'Byrne
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
J. Kevin Fee
contact info
Jane W. Wise
contact info
Jenna N. Rowan
contact info
Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By
Melissa A. Reinckens
contact info
Gabrielle Velkes
contact info
Brian A. Biggs
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Stephanie E. O'Byrne
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
J. Kevin Fee
contact info
Jane W. Wise
contact info
Jenna N. Rowan
contact info
Plaintiff
GOLO, LLC
Represented By
Julie C. Giardina
contact info
Vanessa C. Hew
contact info
Patrick J. Rodgers
contact info
Barry J. Herman
contact info
Steven K. Eisenberg
contact info
Dana Kathryn Severance
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Douglas A. Rettew
contact info
Stephen F. Shaw
contact info

GPO Mar 24 2025
MEMORANDUM ORDER- re 163 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute and 183 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Disputes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the discovery dispute teleconference set for March 25, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/24/2025.This order has been emailed to local counsel. (lih)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
237 237 discov Notice of Service Mon 05/12 4:41 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) GOLO, LLC's Fourth Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff GOLO, LLC (No. 3) and (2) GOLO, LLC's Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services LLC's Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff GOLO, LLC (Nos. 14 and 16) filed by GOLO, LLC.(Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
236 236 discov Notice of Service Wed 05/07 4:37 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services LLCs Second Amended Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition to Plaintiff GOLO, LLC filed by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc..(Rappaport, Nancy)
Related: [-]
235 235 discov Notice of Service Wed 05/07 12:35 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services LLCs Fourth Supplemental Responses and Objections to Golo, LLCs First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 9 and 11) and Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services LLCs Supplemental Responses and Objections to Golo, LLCs Third Set of Interrogatories (No. 24) filed by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc..(Rappaport, Nancy)
Related: [-]
234 234 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment Wed 05/07 9:16 AM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Oscar M. Orozco-Botello. ( re233 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Oscar M. Orozco-Botello )( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4680472).(Rappaport, Nancy)
Related: [-]
233 233 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/07 9:13 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Oscar M. Orozco-Botello - filed by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Rappaport, Nancy)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Wed 05/07 9:18 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brittany T. Knutson for GOLO, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Wed 05/07 9:28 AM
SO ORDERED re233 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Oscar M. Orozco-Botello filed by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/7/2025. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
232 232 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment Tue 05/06 12:40 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Brittany T. Knutson. ( re231 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brittany T. Knutson )( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4679789).(Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
231 231 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/06 12:38 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brittany T. Knutson - filed by GOLO, LLC. (Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Tue 05/06 1:08 PM
SO ORDERED re231 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brittany T. Knutson filed by GOLO, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/6/2025. (dlw)
Related: [-]