Consolidated
Lead case: 1:23-md-03083

Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Allison D Burroughs
Case #: 1:23-cv-12477
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2023
Case in other court:California Central, 5:23-cv-01617
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 7:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Pension Benefit Information, LLC
Represented By
Jordan S. O'Donnell
Mullen Coughlin, LLC
contact info
James Francis Monagle
Mullen Coughlin LLC
contact info
James F. Monagle
Mullen Coughlin LLC
contact info
Defendant
The Berwyn Group, Inc.
Represented By
Jordan S. O'Donnell
Mullen Coughlin, LLC
contact info
James Francis Monagle
Mullen Coughlin LLC
contact info
James F. Monagle
Mullen Coughlin LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy Sides
Represented By
Laura Ellen Goolsby
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Tarek H. Zohdy
Capstone Law, Apc
contact info
Cody R Padgett
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Valerie Taylor
Represented By
Laura Ellen Goolsby
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Tarek H. Zohdy
Capstone Law, Apc
contact info
Cody R Padgett
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Progress Software Corporation
15 Wayside Rd. #400
Burlington, MA 01803
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Pension Benefit Information, LLC
Represented By
Jordan S. O'Donnell
Mullen Coughlin, LLC
contact info
James Francis Monagle
Mullen Coughlin LLC
contact info
James F. Monagle
Mullen Coughlin LLC
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
The Berwyn Group, Inc.
Represented By
Jordan S. O'Donnell
Mullen Coughlin, LLC
contact info
James Francis Monagle
Mullen Coughlin LLC
contact info
James F. Monagle
Mullen Coughlin LLC
contact info

GPO Dec 12 2024
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 19 (Order on Defendants Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Article III Standing)Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03083-ADB et al.(McManus, Caetlin)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, December 12, 2024
32 32 38 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 12/12 10:52 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 19 (Order on Defendants Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Article III Standing) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03083-ADB et al.(McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/10 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Tsai on behalf of Progress Software Corporation, Ipswitch, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03083-ADB et al.(McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order Wed 11/06 6:19 PM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 18 (CAC and Rule 12 Scheduling and Structure Proposals) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03083-ADB et al.(McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
29 29 notice Notice - Other Thu 11/30 9:50 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE: Remote access to today’s hearing will be made available to the media and public for viewing purposes only . In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address:[LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact [LINK:media@mad.uscourts.gov] . Status Conference set for 11/30/2023 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17 (In person only with remote viewing available) before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03083-ADB et al.(McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
28 28 order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 10/30 4:19 PM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 26 Joint Motion to Extend Stay (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
27 27 3 pgs order Order Mon 10/30 3:53 PM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 1 (General Provisions) Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03083-ADB et al. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Stay Mon 10/30 2:49 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay re20 Notice of Case Assignment,, Set/Clear Flags, Joint Motion to Extend Stay by Pension Benefit Information, LLC, The Berwyn Group, Inc..(O'Donnell, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/30 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan S. O'Donnell on behalf of Pension Benefit Information, LLC, The Berwyn Group, Inc. (O'Donnell, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
24 24 notice Notice re: MDL Case Transferred Mon 10/23 4:45 PM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number 1 entered in MDL No. 3083, Central District of California case number 5:23-cv-01617-FLA-SHK has been transferred to the District of Massachusetts and assigned civil action number: 1:23-cv-12477-ADB. In Re: MOVEit Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL 3083 (Belpedio, Lisa)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Case Assignment Mon 10/23 4:44 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. (Belpedio, Lisa)
Related: [-]
22 22 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 10/23 4:42 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:23-cv-01617.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
21 21 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - CTO-1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3083, transferring case to USDC Massachusetts and assigned to Honorable Allison D. Burroughs. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) Case electronically sent to USDC Massachusetts on 10/17/2023. (lc) Modified on 10/17/2023 (lc).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
20 20 ORDER ON STIPULATION GRANTING STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING JPML RULING19 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: All proceedings and deadlines in this matter are hereby STAYED until 30 days after a ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on the Motion for Transfer and Centralization of Related Actions that is currently before the JPML, captioned IN RE: MOVEit Customer Data Security Breach Litig., No. 3083, and in which this matterhas been tagged. (lc)
Related: [-]
19 19 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending JPML Ruling filed by Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff Pension Benefit Information, LLC, The Berwyn Group, Inc..(Monagle, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Staying Proceedings Pending JPML Ruling,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Monday, October 02, 2023
18 18 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Stipulation to Stay Case16 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The document is stricken. (lc)
Related: [-]
17 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation to Stay Case16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. the Proposed order not submitted as a separate attachment but filed within the stipulation. Local Rule 5-4.3.4(a)(2)(i) Attestation of signatories Missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
16 16 (STRICKEN PER 10/2/20203 COURT'S G112B RESPONSE DOCKET NO. 18). Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending JPML Ruling filed by Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff Pension Benefit Information, LLC, The Berwyn Group, Inc..(Monagle, James) Modified on 10/2/2023 (lc).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
15 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons Returned Executed filed by Third Party Plaintiffs The Berwyn Group, Inc., Pension Benefit Information, LLC. upon Progress Software Corporation waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/25/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Jeffrey E. Tsai. (Monagle, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
14 14 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Defendant Progress Software Corporation ; JURY DEMAND, filed by Defendants The Berwyn Group, Inc., Pension Benefit Information, LLC.(Monagle, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
13 13 3 pgs STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants The Berwyn Group, Inc., Pension Benefit Information, LLC.(Monagle, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
12 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Valerie Taylor, Timothy Sides, upon Defendant The Berwyn Group, Inc. served on 8/16/2023, answer due 9/6/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss - Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Zohdy, Tarek)
Related: [-]
11 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Valerie Taylor, Timothy Sides, upon Defendant Pension Benefit Information, LLC served on 8/16/2023, answer due 9/6/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss - Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Zohdy, Tarek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
10 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James F Monagle on behalf of Defendants Pension Benefit Information, LLC, The Berwyn Group, Inc. (Attorney James F Monagle added to party Pension Benefit Information, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James F Monagle added to party The Berwyn Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Monagle, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
9 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
8 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Pension Benefit Information, LLC, The Berwyn Group, Inc.. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (sh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
4 4 Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Timothy Sides, Valerie Taylor, (Zohdy, Tarek)
Related: [-]
3 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Timothy Sides, Valerie Taylor. (Zohdy, Tarek)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Timothy Sides, Valerie Taylor. (Zohdy, Tarek)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35836174 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Valerie Taylor, Timothy Sides. (Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy added to party Timothy Sides(pty:pla), Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy added to party Valerie Taylor(pty:pla))(Zohdy, Tarek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Demand for Corrective Action Pursuant to Californias Consumer Privacy Act, Cal. Civ. Code §1798.150