Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Lee P Rudofsky
Case #: 4:23-cv-01015
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 5:29 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Windstream KDL LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Georgia Windstream LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Valor Telecommunications of Texas LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Windstream Arkansas LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Windstream Communications Kerrville LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Windstream Concord Telephone LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Windstream Florida LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Windstream Georgia Communications LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Windstream Georgia LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Windstream Iowa Communications LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Windstream Kentucky East LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Windstream Nebraska Inc
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Windstream New York Inc
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Windstream North Carolina LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Windstream Ohio LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Windstream South Carolina LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Windstream Standard LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Windstream Sugar Land LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Claimant
Windstream Western Reserve LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Counter Defendant
Cellco Partnership
Represented By
Scott Harris Angstreich
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick PLLC
contact info
Meredith M. Causey
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Steven W. Quattlebaum
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Alex P. Treiger
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
MCI Communications Services LLC
Represented By
Scott Harris Angstreich
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick PLLC
contact info
Meredith M. Causey
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Steven W. Quattlebaum
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Alex P. Treiger
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Windstream Western Reserve LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Defendant
Georgia Windstream LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Valor Telecommunications of Texas LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Defendant
Windstream Arkansas LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Defendant
Windstream Communications Kerrville LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Defendant
Windstream Concord Telephone LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Defendant
Windstream Florida LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Defendant
Windstream Georgia Communications LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Defendant
Windstream Georgia LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Defendant
Windstream Iowa Communications LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Defendant
Windstream KDL LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Defendant
Windstream Kentucky East LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Defendant
Windstream Nebraska Inc
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Defendant
Windstream New York Inc
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Defendant
Windstream North Carolina LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Defendant
Windstream Ohio LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Defendant
Windstream South Carolina LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Defendant
Windstream Standard LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Defendant
Windstream Sugar Land LLC
Represented By
Jared P. Marx
Hwg LLP
contact info
Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Julienne Gitlin Pasichow
Hwg LLP
contact info
Regina Ann Young
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings
contact info
Plaintiff
MCI Communications Services LLC
Represented By
Scott Harris Angstreich
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick PLLC
contact info
Meredith M. Causey
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Steven W. Quattlebaum
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Alex P. Treiger
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cellco Partnership
Represented By
Scott Harris Angstreich
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick PLLC
contact info
Meredith M. Causey
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Steven W. Quattlebaum
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Alex P. Treiger
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick PLLC
contact info
Scott H. Angstreich
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel And Frederick P.L.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 04/14 3:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Cellco Partnership, MCI Communications Services LLC. (Angstreich, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
32 32 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 01/17 11:18 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: In light of31 Notice of Settlement, the Court stays all pending motions and deadlines until April 15, 2025. If the case is not formally disposed of on or before that date, the Court will lift the stay and discuss new deadlines with the parties. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/17/2025. (hml)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 01/17 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Settlement Agreement (Tentative) by Windstream Iowa Communications LLC, Windstream Nebraska Inc, Windstream Arkansas LLC, Windstream KDL LLC, Windstream Western Reserve LLC, Windstream North Carolina LLC, Windstream Florida LLC, Windstream Ohio LLC, Valor Telecommunications of Texas LLC, Cellco Partnership, Windstream Standard LLC, Windstream Concord Telephone LLC, Windstream New York Inc, Georgia Windstream LLC, Windstream Sugar Land LLC, MCI Communications Services LLC, Windstream Georgia LLC, Windstream Communications Kerrville LLC, Windstream South Carolina LLC, Windstream Kentucky East LLC, Windstream Georgia Communications LLC (Angstreich, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
30 30 order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 07/15 8:24 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Defendants'10 Motion to Stay and for Primary Jurisdiction Referral to the FCC. Neither the ultimate dispute between the parties here, nor the subsidiary issues underlying that dispute, strike the Court as the type of complicated issue that might counsel giving the FCC the first crack at this. Accordingly, the Eighth Circuit's caselaw's general reticence of using the primary jurisdiction doctrine is reason enough to deny Defendants' request. The juice would not be worth the squeeze. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 7/15/1014. (mec)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
29 29 misc Brief (non-appeal) Fri 07/12 11:15 AM
BRIEF filed by Cellco Partnership, MCI Communications Services LLC re 27 Order,, (Angstreich, Scott)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Brief (non-appeal) Fri 07/12 8:24 AM
BRIEF filed by Georgia Windstream LLC, Valor Telecommunications of Texas LLC, Windstream Arkansas LLC, Windstream Communications Kerrville LLC, Windstream Concord Telephone LLC, Windstream Florida LLC, Windstream Georgia Communications LLC, Windstream Georgia LLC, Windstream Iowa Communications LLC, Windstream KDL LLC, Windstream Kentucky East LLC, Windstream Nebraska Inc, Windstream New York Inc, Windstream North Carolina LLC, Windstream Ohio LLC, Windstream South Carolina LLC, Windstream Standard LLC, Windstream Sugar Land LLC, Windstream Western Reserve LLC (Pasichow, Julienne)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
27 27 order Order Mon 07/01 10:05 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER. The Court directs each party to file a supplemental brief of no more than four (4) pages explaining whether and why (or why not) the Supreme Court's recent decision in Loper Bright Enter. et al. v. Raimondo, Sec'y of Com., et al. , (e.g., the overturning of the Chevron doctrine) should have any effect on this Court's discretionary call concerning the requested invocation of the primary jurisdiction doctrine. Briefs are due by 11:59 p.m. on July 14, 2024. No extensions absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 7/1/2024. (mec)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/30 1:05 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION to Dismiss Windstream's Counterclaims and to Strike Windstream's Second, Third, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Affirmative Defenses filed by Cellco Partnership, MCI Communications Services LLC. (Angstreich, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
25 25 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 04/29 3:06 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting24 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 4/29/2024. (hml)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
24 24 motion Leave to File Document Fri 04/26 2:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Windstream's Counterclaims and to Strike Windstream's Affirmative Defenses by Cellco Partnership, MCI Communications Services LLC(Angstreich, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and to Strike
Friday, April 19, 2024
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/19 12:06 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Dismiss Windstream's Counterclaims and to Strike Windstream's Second, Third, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Affirmative Defenses filed by All Defendants.(Pasichow, Julienne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Excerpt from Windstream ILEC Interstate BDS Guidebook
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
22 22 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 04/10 1:18 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting21 Motion for Leave to File Reply to10 Motion for Primary Jurisdiction Referral to the FCC. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 4/10/2024. (hml)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Leave to File Document Wed 04/10 12:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Primary Jurisdiction Referral by All Defendants (Pasichow, Julienne)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Docket Correction Wed 04/10 12:12 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re docket entries1 ,2 ,4 ,5 ,16 ,18 ,19 , and20 . CORRECTION: The docket texts were modified to correct the party filers as Cellco Partnership and MCI Communications Services LLC as marked on the documents.(jak)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
20 20 brief Brief in Support Fri 04/05 2:32 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re19 Motion to Dismiss Windstream's Counterclaims and to Strike Windstream's Second, Third, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Affirmative Defenses filed by Cellco Partnership. (Angstreich, Scott)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss Fri 04/05 2:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Windstream's Counterclaims and to Strike Windstream's Second, Third, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Affirmative Defenses by Cellco Partnership (Angstreich, Scott)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/05 2:21 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Stay and for Primary Jurisdiction Referral to the FCC filed by Cellco Partnership. (Angstreich, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/19 3:16 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to10 Motion to Stay and for Primary Jurisdiction Referral to the FCC. Response due by 4/5/2024. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/19/2024. (hml)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/19 9:13 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 MOTION to Stay and for Primary Jurisdiction Referral to the FCC by Cellco Partnership (Angstreich, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/18 3:43 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting13 Julienne Pasichow's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/18/2024. (hml)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/18 3:41 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting12 Jared Paul Marx's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/18/2024. (hml)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/15 2:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Julienne Pasichow. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4712609. Filed by All Defendants (Marts, Gary)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/15 2:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jared Paul Marx. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4712604. Filed by All Defendants (Marts, Gary)
Related: [-]
11 11 brief Brief in Support Fri 03/15 2:55 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re10 Motion to Stay and for Primary Jurisdiction Referral to the FCC filed by All Defendants.(Marts, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (excerpt from BDS Guidebook),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (excerpt from FCC Tariff)
10 10 motion Stay Fri 03/15 2:52 PM
MOTION to Stay and for Primary Jurisdiction Referral to the FCC by All Defendants (Marts, Gary)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 03/15 2:45 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Windstream Nebraska Inc, Windstream Concord Telephone LLC, Windstream Communications Kerrville LLC, Windstream Ohio LLC, Windstream New York Inc, Valor Telecommunications of Texas LLC, Windstream KDL LLC, Georgia Windstream LLC, Windstream Florida LLC, Windstream Georgia LLC, Windstream South Carolina LLC, Windstream Georgia Communications LLC, Windstream Arkansas LLC, Windstream Western Reserve LLC, Windstream Standard LLC, Windstream North Carolina LLC, Windstream Kentucky East LLC, Windstream Sugar Land LLC, Windstream Iowa Communications LLC.(Marts, Gary)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/15 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gary D. Marts, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Marts, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/23 8:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Regina Ann Young on behalf of Valor Telecommunications of Texas LLC, Windstream Arkansas LLC, Windstream Communications Kerrville LLC, Windstream Concord Telephone LLC, Windstream Florida LLC, Windstream Georgia Communications LLC, Windstream Georgia LLC, Windstream Iowa Communications LLC, Windstream KDL LLC, Windstream Kentucky East LLC, Windstream Nebraska Inc, Windstream New York Inc, Windstream North Carolina LLC, Windstream Ohio LLC, Windstream South Carolina LLC, Windstream Standard LLC, Windstream Sugar Land LLC, Windstream Western Reserve LLC (Young, Regina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
6 6 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/18 4:19 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alex P. Treiger. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/18/2024. (hml)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/18 2:36 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants by Cellco Partnership. (Quattlebaum, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/28 10:29 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Alex P. Treiger. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4646179. Filed by Cellco Partnership (Quattlebaum, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Mon 10/23 3:52 PM
ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/21/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Mon 10/23 2:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Cellco Partnership. (ldb)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/23 2:42 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Cellco Partnership against All Defendants (Fee $ 402, Receipt Number LIT4008.) No summons issued. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet