Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Scott L Palk
Case #: 5:23-cv-00966
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2023
Terminated:Oct 16, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 5:55 AM CDT
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By
Jonathan G Rector
Littler Mendelson-Dallas
contact info
Defendant
Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By
Jonathan G Rector
Littler Mendelson-Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
Antonio Macias
Represented By
Ge'Andra D Johnson
Johnson Legal, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Cynthia Rowe D'Antonio
Green Johnson Mumina & D'Antonio
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
24 24 order Administrative Closing Order Wed 10/16 1:14 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER : The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively close this matter, without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen the case, after completion of the arbitration proceeding, for the entry of any stipulation or order, or for any other purpose required to obtain a final determination of the litigation. If within thirty days after completion of the arbitration proceeding neither party has moved to reopen this case for the purpose of obtaining such final determination, this action will be deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 10/16/2024. (llg)
Related: [-]
23 23 11 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Wed 10/16 1:11 PM
ORDER .20 Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against CVS shall proceed to arbitration. This matter is STAYED pending completion of the arbitration proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively terminate this matter until further order of the Court. The termination is without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen the case after completion of the arbitration proceeding for the entry of any stipulation or order, or for any other purpose required to obtain a final determination of the litigation. The parties shall notify the Court upon completion of the arbitration proceeding by filing a written notice. If, within 30 days after completion of the arbitration proceeding, neither party has moved to reopen the case for the purpose of obtaining a final determination of the litigation, this action will be deemed to be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 10/16/2024. (llg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 04/10 7:58 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings, and Brief in Support filed by All Defendants. Related [+]
Related: [-] ctor, Jonathan
Thursday, April 04, 2024
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/04 11:43 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings, and Brief in Support filed by Antonio Macias.(D'Antonio, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Antonio Macias
Thursday, March 14, 2024
20 20 motion Compel Thu 03/14 12:14 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings, and Brief in Support by All Defendants. Related [+]
Related: [-] ctor, Jonathan
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Robert Bailey
19 19 misc Disclosure Statement - LLC Thu 03/14 12:11 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC Identifying Constituents of LLC or Partnership . Related [+]
Related: [-] ctor, Jonathan
18 18 misc Disclosure Statement - LLC Thu 03/14 12:09 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC . Related [+]
Related: [-] ctor, Jonathan
17 17 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Thu 03/14 12:07 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by CVS Pharmacy Inc . Related [+]
Related: [-] ctor, Jonathan
Friday, March 08, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 03/08 2:12 PM
IT ORDERED that the Clerk's Entry of Default [Doc. No. 7] against Defendants Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC and CVS Pharmacy, Inc. is set aside. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Hearing on Damages [Doc. No. 9] is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 3/8/2024. (ac)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Fri 03/08 2:08 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Relief from Local Counsel Requirement and Supporting Brief. See order as more fully set out. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 3/8/2024. (ac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 03/05 2:54 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, and CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (and Hearing on Damages) filed by All Defendants. Related [+]
Related: [-] ctor, Jonathan
13 13 4 pgs motion Order Tue 03/05 2:40 PM
MOTION for Order for Relief of Local Counsel Requirement by All Defendants. Related [+]
Related: [-] ctor, Jonathan
12 12 motion Set Aside Default Tue 03/05 11:55 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Set Aside Default (Entry) and Brief in Support by All Defendants. Related [+]
Related: [-] ctor, Jonathan
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Kristen E. Rourke
notice Notice from the Court Tue 03/05 9:50 AM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Set Aside Judgment (Default) is STRICKEN due to Counsel's failure to comply with LCvR 7.1(c). (mjs)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
11 11 motion Set Aside Judgment Mon 03/04 4:49 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Set Aside Judgment (Default) by All Defendants. Related [+]
Related: [-] ctor, Jonathan
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 -Declaration of Kristen Rourke
Friday, March 01, 2024
10 10 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 03/01 9:30 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan G Rector on behalf of All Defendants Related [+]
Related: [-] ctor, Jonathan
Thursday, February 29, 2024
9 9 motion Default Judgment Thu 02/29 3:42 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, and CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by Antonio Macias.(D'Antonio, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit USPS Return Receipt-CVS Pharm. Inc.,
Att: 2 Exhibit USPS Return Receipt-OK CVS Pharm LLC
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
8 8 respm Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 02/21 4:55 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Antonio Macias. (D'Antonio, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
7 7 order Clerks Entry of Default Order on Motion for Entry of Default Thu 02/15 2:43 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC; granting6 Motion for Entry of Default (cps)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
6 6 motion Entry of Default Wed 02/14 7:00 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by Antonio Macias.(D'Antonio, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit -Cynthia Rowe D'Antonio
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 02/14 1:33 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 2/21/2024. Plaintiff is directed to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 2/14/24. (mjs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/16 2:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antonio Macias. Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC served on 1/11/2024. (D'Antonio, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/16 2:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antonio Macias. CVS Pharmacy Inc served on 1/11/2024. (D'Antonio, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 01/09 5:02 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC. (dtb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/23 5:27 PM
COMPLAINT against CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC filed by Antonio Macias.(dtb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Payment for a Civil Case Mon 10/23 5:48 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4278524. (D'Antonio, Cynthia)
Related: [-]