California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:23-cv-05388
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2023
Terminated:Dec 15, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 3:41 AM PDT
Appellant
Simone Renee Braxton
187 Catalina Dr.
Hercules, CA 94547
Represented By
George S Wynns
contact info
Appellee
U.S. Bank N.A.,
Represented By
Dane Wyatt Exnowski
Mccalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, Llp.
contact info
Trustee
Martha G. Bronitsky
P.O. Box 5004
Hayward, CA 94540
Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #050153
San Francisco, CA 94102


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, December 15, 2023
5 5 order Judgment Fri 12/15 1:55 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on December 15, 2023. (vclc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/15 1:43 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on December 15, 2023. (vclc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/07 9:26 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/14/2023. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on December 7, 2023. (vclc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
2 2 appeal Receipt Of Bankruptcy Record On Appeal Fri 10/27 10:03 AM
RECEIPT OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL in PDF Format: Record on Appeal Received and Attached at the Request of the Court re appeal1 Bankruptcy Appeal,, :(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 dkt sheet,
Att: 2 cert of record
Friday, October 20, 2023
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Mon 10/23 10:34 AM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 23-40326 File received. Filed bySimone Renee Braxton.(hdj, COURT STAFF) (hdj, COURT STAFF). (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 transmittal,
Att: 2 notice of transfer
Att: 3 (10/23/2023) BAP dkt sheet
Att: 4 (10/23/2023) BAP Corporate Statement,
Att: 5 (10/23/2023) BAP Briefing Order.pdf,
Att: 6 (10/23/2023) BAP Motion for time,
Att: 7 (10/23/2023) BAP Record Request Form,
Att: 8 (10/23/2023) BAP Scheduling Order.pdf,
Att: 9 (10/23/2023) BAP - Amended Statement of Election