OUTMemphis et al v. Lee et al
Tennessee Western District Court | |
Judge: | Sheryl H Lipman |
Referred: | Charmiane G Claxton |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02670 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 24, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 21, 2024 4:57 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bill Lee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Rausch
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jonathan Skrmetti
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Frank Strada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 1
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 2
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 3
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 4
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
OUTMemphis
|
Represented By
|
1. | Tennessee faces federal lawsuit over decades-old penalties targeting HIV-positive people (nbcnews.com) |
Submitted Tue 10/31/2023 | |
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
93 | 93
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 6:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Bobrow on behalf of United States of America Associated Cases: 2:24-cv-02101-SHL-tmp, 2:23-cv-02670-SHL-cgc(Bobrow, Anna) |
|
92 | 92
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Fri 04/19 2:49 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER TERMINATING90 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response and For Leave to File Excess Pages filed by United States of America. The motion was GRANTED at ECF No. 32 in associated case 2:24-cv-02101-SHL-tmp. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 4/19/2024. (shl) |
|
91 | 91
misc
Transcript
Fri 04/19 2:33 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4-3-24 before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Court Reporter Candace S. Covey, Telephone number 901-495-1216. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in this matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript, and twenty-one (21) calendar days to file a Request for Redaction. Redaction is the responsibility of the attorneys and pro se litigants who attended the hearing to which the transcription applies. Each party is responsible for reviewing and requesting redaction of testimony of witnesses that were called for the party and for that party's own statements. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal.. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/24/2024. Redaction Request due 5/10/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2024. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02670-SHL-cgc, 2:24-cv-02101-SHL-tmp(Covey, Candace) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
90 | 90
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply File Excess Pages
Thu 04/18 11:03 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (28 in 2:24-cv-02101-SHL-tmp) MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Proposed order submitted by United States of America. Associated Cases: 2:24-cv-02101-SHL-tmp, 2:23-cv-02670-SHL-cgc(Berger, Stephanie) |