Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Tilman E Self, III
Case #: 5:23-cv-00423
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2023
Terminated:Dec 05, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 21, 2024 5:17 AM EDT
Defendant
DR TIFFANY CROCKETT
Defendant
TREMAYNE HALL
Defendant
ASHLEY LAMAR
Defendant
GRACE ANNE RODDENBERRY
Defendant
MEIA WARREN
Defendant
WILKINSON COUNTY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION
Plaintiff
ROMAN BEY
Pre-Historic Prince of Wales 727 E BOLTON STREET
SAVANNAH, GA 31401

GPO Dec 05 2023
JUDGMENT (sst)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
6 6 order Judgment Tue 12/05 7:26 AM
JUDGMENT (sst)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 12/04 2:51 PM
ORDER denying2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint1 without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 12/4/2023 (vs)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
4 4 4 pgs order Order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 10/27 1:28 PM
ORDER for Plaintiff to file an amended Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by November 17, 2023 re2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ROMAN BEY and denying3 MOTION to appear telephonically or via video conference filed by ROMAN BEY. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 10/27/2023. (vs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/24 3:34 PM
MOTION to appear telephonically or via video conference Filed by ROMAN BEY.(sst)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/24 3:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by ROMAN BEY.(sst)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/24 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants,filed by ROMAN BEY.(sst)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 additional complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/24 3:33 PM
Case REASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III. US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL no longer assigned to the case. (sst)
Related: [-]