Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Cecilia M Altonaga
Referred: Lisette M Reid
Case #: 1:23-cv-24073
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 21, 2024 5:33 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Unique Travel Corporation
Represented By
Michael K. Johnson
Norvell Ip LLC
contact info
Blake M. Carey
Norvell Ip
contact info
Alejandro Brito
Brito, PLLC
contact info
Ian M. Betts
Norvell Ip
contact info
Joseph V. Norvell
Norvell Ip
contact info
Counter Claimant
Unique Vacations, Inc.
Represented By
Michael K. Johnson
Norvell Ip LLC
contact info
Blake M. Carey
Norvell Ip
contact info
Alejandro Brito
Brito, PLLC
contact info
Ian M. Betts
Norvell Ip
contact info
Joseph V. Norvell
Norvell Ip
contact info
Counter Defendant
HH Advertising, Inc.
Represented By
Michael T. Landen
Kluger, Kaplan, Silverman, Katzen & Levine, P.L.
contact info
Alan Jay Kluger
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levine, Pl
contact info
Terri Ellen Tuchman Meyers
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levine, P.L.
contact info
Defendant
Sandals Resorts International, Ltd.
5505 Waterford District Drive
MIAMI, FL 33126
Represented By
Jessica Lynn Saba
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Peter Prieto
Podhurst Orseck, P.A.
contact info
Dayron Silverio
Podhurst Orseck, P.A.
contact info
Matthew W. Walch
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Matthew Weinshall
Podhurst Orseck
contact info
Defendant
Unique Travel Corporation
5505 Waterford District Drive
MIAMI, FL 33126
Represented By
Michael K. Johnson
Norvell Ip LLC
contact info
Blake M. Carey
Norvell Ip
contact info
Cecilia Sofia Miranda
Brito, PLLC
contact info
Alejandro Brito
Brito, PLLC
contact info
Ian M. Betts
Norvell Ip
contact info
Joseph V. Norvell
Norvell Ip
contact info
Defendant
Unique Vacations, Inc.
4950 SW 72 AVENUE
2ND FLOOR, FL 33155
Represented By
Michael K. Johnson
Norvell Ip LLC
contact info
Blake M. Carey
Norvell Ip
contact info
Cecilia Sofia Miranda
Brito, PLLC
contact info
Alejandro Brito
Brito, PLLC
contact info
Ian M. Betts
Norvell Ip
contact info
Joseph V. Norvell
Norvell Ip
contact info
Plaintiff
HH Advertising, Inc.
201 S Biscayne Blvd. 27th Floor
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Danella C Williams
Kluger Kaplan
contact info
Michael T. Landen
Kluger, Kaplan, Silverman, Katzen & Levine, P.L.
contact info
Madison Dara Hauser
Kluger, Kaplan, Silverman, Katzen & Levine, P.L.
contact info
Alan Jay Kluger
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levine, Pl
contact info
Terri Ellen Tuchman Meyers
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levine, P.L.
contact info


Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
496 496 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Fri 05/02 2:40 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the email information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney Evan Simon Dubow (pt)
Related: [-]
495 495 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Fri 05/02 1:50 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney Evan Simon Dubow re (55 in 1:24-cv-24110-RKA) Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name (pt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
494 494 notice Notice of CHANGE OF ADDRESS, Email or Law Firm Name Thu 05/01 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information; Change of Email; Change of Law Firm Name; by Evan Simon Dubow (Dubow, Evan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
493 493 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/29 4:09 PM
ORDER granting492 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ian M. Betts representing Unique Vacations, Inc. (Defendant) and Unique Travel Corporation (Defendant) and Unique Travel Corporation (Counter Claimant); and Unique Vacations, Inc. (Counter Claimant); withdrawn from case. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Ian Betts. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/29/2025. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
492 492 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/29 3:13 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ian M. Betts, Esq. for / by Unique Vacations, Inc., Unique Travel Corporation. Responses due by 5/13/2025.(Brito, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order