Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Victoria M Calvert
Case #: 1:23-cv-04858
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2023
Terminated:Mar 14, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 9:53 AM EDT
Defendant
Brooks Express Elite LLC
Represented By
Sheetal M. Brahmbhatt
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Matthew Peter Stone
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Ane Onika Wanliss
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Shawn N. Kalfus
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Defendant
Indemnity Insurance Company Of North America
Represented By
Sheetal M. Brahmbhatt
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Matthew Peter Stone
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Ane Onika Wanliss
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Shawn N. Kalfus
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Mohave Transportation Insurance Company
Represented By
Sheetal M. Brahmbhatt
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Matthew Peter Stone
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Ane Onika Wanliss
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Shawn N. Kalfus
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nakita Moreland
Represented By
Brian C. Ross
The Ross Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 14, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 03/14 3:57 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING21 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (pdt)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 03/14 3:59 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 03/12 5:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Nakita Moreland. (Ross, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
20 20 discov Certificate of Service Fri 12/29 8:46 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Responses by Nakita Moreland.(Ross, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/27 5:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ane Onika Wanliss on behalf of Brooks Express Elite LLC, Indemnity Insurance Company Of North America, Mohave Transportation Insurance Company (Wanliss, Ane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
18 18 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 12/19 4:25 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The Parties request for a six (6) month discovery track is granted. Discovery shall end in this case on June 19, 2024. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 12/19/2023. (dnb)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Tue 12/19 4:22 PM
ORDER denying4 Motion to Remand to State Court. Nothing in this Order shall be construed to prevent Plaintiff from seeking to amend her Complaint after she has properly identified the John Doe Defendant. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 12/19/2023. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
16 16 misc Leave of Absence Mon 12/18 6:06 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): January 1, 2024-January 5, 2024, February 5, 2024-February 26, 2024, March 22,2024-March 26, 2024, April 1, 2024-April 9, 2024, July 1, 2024-July 9, 2024, July 29, 2024-August 7, 2024, October 21, 2024-October 28, 2024, November 26, 2024-December 4, 2024, December 24, 2024-January 7, 2025, by Matthew Peter Stone. (Stone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
15 15 discov Certificate of Service Wed 12/13 1:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Discovery Materials by Brooks Express Elite LLC, Indemnity Insurance Company Of North America, Mohave Transportation Insurance Company.(Brahmbhatt, Sheetal)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
14 14 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/08 7:57 AM
First Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mohave Transportation Insurance Company. (Kalfus, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
13 13 discov Certificate of Service Tue 12/05 11:54 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Nakita Moreland.(Ross, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
12 12 respm Response to Motion Mon 12/04 6:19 PM
RESPONSE re4 First MOTION to Remand to State Court GA filed by Brooks Express Elite LLC, Indemnity Insurance Company Of North America, Mohave Transportation Insurance Company. (Brahmbhatt, Sheetal)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/04 1:50 PM
Amended Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nakita Moreland. (Ross, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
10 10 discov Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 3:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Discovery Materials by Brooks Express Elite LLC, Indemnity Insurance Company Of North America, Mohave Transportation Insurance Company.(Brahmbhatt, Sheetal)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
9 9 discov Initial Disclosures Mon 11/27 3:49 PM
Initial Disclosures by Brooks Express Elite LLC, Indemnity Insurance Company Of North America, Mohave Transportation Insurance Company.(Brahmbhatt, Sheetal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
8 8 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 11/22 8:47 AM
First JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Nakita Moreland. (Ross, Brian)
Related: [-]
7 7 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 11/22 8:46 AM
First Initial Disclosures by Nakita Moreland.(Ross, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/20 4:07 PM
First Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nakita Moreland. (Ross, Brian)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Mon 11/20 4:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint And Discovery Request , as to Mohave Transportation Insurance Company. (Ross, Brian)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Remand to State Court Mon 11/20 3:59 PM
First MOTION to Remand to State Court GA with Brief In Support by Nakita Moreland.(Ross, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief In support of Motion to Remand
Thursday, October 26, 2023
3 3 misc Leave of Absence Thu 10/26 5:49 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): November 21, 2023-December 1, 2023; December 25, 2023-January 5, 2024, by Matthew Peter Stone. (Stone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Wed 10/25 9:47 AM
STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE VICTORIA M. CALVERT. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 10/25/23. (vs)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 10/24 9:39 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Indemnity Insurance Company Of North America, Mohave Transportation Insurance Company, Brooks Express Elite LLC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12981081)(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet