Texas Western District Court
Judge:David Counts
Referred: Derek T Gilliland
Case #: 6:23-cv-00727
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2023
Terminated:Nov 12, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 10:33 AM CDT
Defendant
Canva Pty Ltd.
Represented By
Jennifer Seraphine
Turner Boyd Seraphine LLP
contact info
Alexander Samuel Krois
Turner Boyd Seraphine LLP
contact info
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam And Smith, LLP
contact info
Marc David Peters
Turner Boyd Seraphine LLP
contact info
Jacob S. Zweig
Turner Boyd LLP
contact info
Zhuanjia Gu
Turner Boyd Seraphine LLP
contact info
Karen I. Boyd
Turner Boyd Seraphine LLP
contact info
Defendant
Canva US, Inc.
Represented By
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam And Smith, LLP
contact info
Jacob S. Zweig
Turner Boyd LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Accessify, LLC
Represented By
Robert Daniel Garza
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Jonathan R. Miller
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Jonathan L. Hardt
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Travis E. Lynch
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
James F. McDonough
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Canva, Inc.
Terminated: 03/29/2024
Represented By
Jennifer Seraphine
Turner Boyd Seraphine LLP
contact info
Alexander Samuel Krois
Turner Boyd Seraphine LLP
contact info
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam And Smith, LLP
contact info
Marc David Peters
Turner Boyd Seraphine LLP
contact info
Jacob S. Zweig
Turner Boyd LLP
contact info
Zhuanjia Gu
Turner Boyd Seraphine LLP
contact info
Karen I. Boyd
Turner Boyd Seraphine LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 63 minutes ago
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
55 55 misc Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120) Tue 11/12 4:02 PM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (r013)
Related: [-]
54 54 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 11/12 3:46 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge David Counts. (lad)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
53 53 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 11/08 12:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Accessify, LLC. (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]