New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:23-mj-01080
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 25, 2023 3:50 AM EDT
Defendant
ROBERT MICHAEL PEARSON (1)
Represented By
GAURAV DAVE
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
JASON SCOTT GOLDBERG
United States Attorney'S Office District Of New Jersey
contact info

GPO Jul 27 2023
ORDER REGARDING USE OF VIDEO CONFERENCING/TELECONFERENCING as to ROBERT MICHAEL PEARSON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/27/23. (ad, )
GPO Jul 27 2023
BRADY ORDER as to ROBERT MICHAEL PEARSON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/27/23. (ad, )
GPO Aug 31 2023
ORDER REGARDING USE OF VIDEO CONFERENCING/TELECONFERENCING as to ROBERT MICHAEL PEARSON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/31/23. (ad, )
GPO Aug 31 2023
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/31/23. (ad, )
GPO Aug 31 2023
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ROBERT MICHAEL PEARSON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/31/23. (ad, )
GPO Oct 26 2023
DEFERRAL OF PROSECUTION allowed as to ROBERT MICHAEL PEARSON (1) Counts closed: Count 1.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/26/23. (ad, )

Docket last updated: 10/25/2023 6:10 AM EDT
Thursday, July 27, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor:Initial Appearance as to ROBERT MICHAEL PEARSON held on 7/27/2023 (Court Reporter/Recorder ZOOM.) (ad, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to ROBERT MICHAEL PEARSON (1). (ad, )
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER REGARDING USE OF VIDEO CONFERENCING/TELECONFERENCING as to ROBERT MICHAEL PEARSON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/27/23. (ad, )
Related: [-]
3 3 BRADY ORDER as to ROBERT MICHAEL PEARSON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/27/23. (ad, )
Related: [-]
4 4 CONSENT TO TRIAL BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by ROBERT MICHAEL PEARSON (ad, )
Related: [-]