Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Clay D Land
Case #: 4:23-cv-00182
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2023
Terminated:Feb 22, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 4:17 AM EDT
Defendant
VALLEY HOSPITALITY SERVICES LLC
Plaintiff
GLENDINA HAMMOND MARTIN
2522 NORRIS RD APT 1
COLUMBUS, GA 31907

GPO Jan 24 2024
ORDER for Proof of Service re 1 Complaint filed by GLENDINA HAMMOND MARTIN. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 1/24/2024. (esl)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Wed 04/10 3:08 PM
ORDER denying12 Motion to Reopen Case Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 04/10/2024 (CCL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
12 12 motion Reopen Case Fri 03/15 3:48 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case Filed by GLENDINA HAMMOND MARTIN.(esl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Emails,
Att: 2 Exhibit First Arbitration,
Att: 3 Exhibit Second Arbitration poor copy quality
Thursday, February 22, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 02/22 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GLENDINA HAMMOND MARTIN(tlf)
Related: [-]
utility REMARK Thu 02/22 3:39 PM
REMARK : In light of11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, this case has been closed (tlf)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/12 4:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GLENDINA HAMMOND MARTIN as to VALLEY HOSPITALITY SERVICES LLC. (esl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Thu 02/08 3:09 PM
Summons Issued as to VALLEY HOSPITALITY SERVICES LLC. (esl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/24 3:41 PM
ORDER for Proof of Service re1 Complaint filed by GLENDINA HAMMOND MARTIN. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 1/24/2024. (esl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
misc Filing Fee Paid Thu 11/30 4:16 PM
Filing fee of $402 Paid after IFP Denied (Manual Receipt 43236). (esl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
7 7 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 11/14 9:34 AM
ORDER denying6 Second Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-14-23. (jdl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 11/07 3:39 PM
SECOND MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by GLENDINA HAMMOND MARTIN.(esl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter and receipt from Katonga Wright
Friday, November 03, 2023
5 5 order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Fri 11/03 4:14 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying4 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court notes Plaintiff did not submit a recast IFP motion. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-3-23. (jdl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
4 4 motion Reconsideration Thu 11/02 3:33 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by GLENDINA HAMMOND MARTIN.(esl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit receipts for fees and medical expenses
Thursday, October 26, 2023
3 3 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 10/26 9:21 AM
ORDER denying2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-26-23. (jdl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/25 3:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by GLENDINA HAMMOND MARTIN.(esl)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/25 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT against VALLEY HOSPITALITY SERVICES LLC,filed by GLENDINA HAMMOND MARTIN.(esl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EEOC Notice of Right to Sue letter
utility Motion(s) Referred Wed 10/25 3:47 PM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to US Magistrate Judge.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(esl)
Related: [-]