Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Jane M Beckering
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:23-cv-01129
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause20:1681 Title IX Educational Amendments 1992 - Sex Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2023
Terminated:Sep 13, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 4:19 AM EDT
defendant
Hillsdale College
Represented By
Peter W. Herzog, III
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell Llp (mo)
contact info
Sarah Louise Nirenberg
Butzel Long Pc (troy)
contact info
Ryan J. Walsh
Eimer Stahl Llp (wi)
contact info
Carey A. DeWitt
Butzel Long Pc (troy)
contact info
plaintiff
Grace Chen
Represented By
Caitlin M. Nelson
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein Llp (ca)
contact info
Channing Elizabeth Robinson-Holmes
Pitt Mcgehee Palmer Bonanni & Rivers PC
contact info
Annika K. Martin
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein Llp (ny)
contact info
Michelle Alyse Lamy
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein Llp (ca)
contact info
Megan Anne Bonanni
Pitt Mcgehee Palmer Bonanni & Rivers PC
contact info
Beth M. Rivers
Pitt Mcgehee Palmer Bonanni & Rivers PC
contact info
plaintiff
Danielle Villarreal
Represented By
Caitlin M. Nelson
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein Llp (ca)
contact info
Channing Elizabeth Robinson-Holmes
Pitt Mcgehee Palmer Bonanni & Rivers PC
contact info
Annika K. Martin
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein Llp (ny)
contact info
Michelle Alyse Lamy
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein Llp (ca)
contact info
Megan Anne Bonanni
Pitt Mcgehee Palmer Bonanni & Rivers PC
contact info
Beth M. Rivers
Pitt Mcgehee Palmer Bonanni & Rivers PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
60 60 appeal Certificate Regarding No Transcript on Appeal Wed 10/02 6:19 PM
CERTIFICATE by plaintiffs Grace Chen, Danielle Villarreal that no transcript exists for purposes of appeal57 (Martin, Annika)
Related: [-]