Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-40819

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:James J Robinson
Case #: 1:23-ap-40022
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2023
Terminated:Mar 13, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kyra A Harris
PO Box 2441
Gadsden, AL 35903
Represented By
Kyra A Harris
contact info
Defendant
James Harris
PO Box 2441
Gadsden, AL 35903
Represented By
James Harris
contact info
Plaintiff
America's Car-Mart, Inc.
203 Kenimer Avenue, Suite 100
Trussville, AL 35173
Represented By
David Anthony Butler
Ingram, Kalupa & Butler, P.C.
contact info
Trustee
Rocco J Leo
Rocco Leo, Trustee 700 Century Park South Suite 222
Birmingham, AL 35226


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/13 7:59 AM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-40022 Closed (scg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 02/29 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 02/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
13 13 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Tue 02/27 1:36 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Signed on 2/27/2024. (scg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
12 12 misc Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement Mon 10/30 3:54 PM
Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement Filed by Plaintiff America's Car-Mart, Inc.. (Butler, David)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 28, 2023
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 10/28 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 10/28/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic)
Friday, October 27, 2023
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 10/27 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 10/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Scheduling Conference Order
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 10/27 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 10/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Notice and Order
Thursday, October 26, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order (Generic-no hearing) Thu 10/26 10:09 AM
Order Requiring Parties' Conference and Submission of Parties' Report Pursuant to Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 7016 and 7026) Signed on 10/26/2023. (scg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 10/25 4:27 PM
Summons Service Executed on Kyra A Harris 10/25/2023 (Butler, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 10/25 4:27 PM
Summons Service Executed on James Harris 10/25/2023 (Butler, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Notice and Order Wed 10/25 8:25 AM
Notice and Order Setting Status Conference as to why the Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement for America's CAr-Mart, Inc has not been filed Signed on 10/25/2023. Hearing scheduled 11/16/2023 at 09:45 AM at 1100 Gurnee Avenue Rm 307 (JJR) Anniston. (scg)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Scheduling Conference Order (Adversary) Wed 10/25 8:06 AM
Scheduling Conference Order Signed on 10/25/2023. (scg)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Wed 10/25 8:04 AM
Summons Issued Kyra A Harris Date Issued 10/25/2023, Answer Due 11/27/2023 (scg)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Wed 10/25 8:02 AM
Summons Issued James Harris Date Issued 10/25/2023, Answer Due 11/27/2023 (scg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/24 4:25 PM
Adversary case 23-40022 91 (Declaratory judgment)) Complaint by America's Car-Mart against Kyra A Harris, James Harris. Fee Amount $350 (Butler, David)
Related: [-]