Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Darrin P Gayles
Referred: Edwin G Torres
Case #: 1:23-cv-24085
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2023
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 4:28 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
All Goods Xpress, LLC
Represented By
Eric Castillo, Jr.
Pimentel, Ifill & Castillo, PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Nepa Wholesales, Inc
Represented By
Brett A. Feinstein
contact info
Defendant
All Goods Xpress, LLC
Represented By
Eric Castillo, Jr.
Pimentel, Ifill & Castillo, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nepa Wholesales, Inc
Represented By
Brett A. Feinstein
contact info


Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
43 43 adr Mediation Report Fri 05/02 9:08 AM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT held before Mediator Cary Lubetsky, Esq.. Prepared by: Cary Lubetsky, Esq.. Filed by Nepa Wholesales, Inc. Disposition: Case did not settle. Mediation held/partially held via video-conference. (Feinstein, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
42 42 adr Mediation Report Tue 04/29 10:59 AM
MEDIATION REPORT held before Mediator Cary Lubetsky, Esq.. Prepared by: Cary Lubetsky, Esq.. Filed by Nepa Wholesales, Inc. Disposition: Adjourned. Mediation held/partially held via video-conference. (Feinstein, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
41 41 minutes Status Conference Wed 04/16 10:08 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Darrin P. Gayles: Status Conference held on 4/16/2025. Total time in court: 5 minutes. All parties present. Court Reporter: Patricia Diaz, 305-523-5178 / Patricia_Diaz@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mp02)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
40 40 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 04/14 4:50 PM
Counsel shall enter their appearances telephonically using the following dial-in information: Dial-in Number 305-990-2559; Conference ID 374 050 271# . Please dial in at least ten minutes before the Telephonic Status Conference begins and wait until your case is called. (mp02)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
39 39 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/10 10:31 AM
Amended Certificate of Other Affiliates by Nepa Wholesales, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Cary A. Lubetsky for Nepa Wholesales, Inc (Feinstein, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
38 38 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Thu 04/10 8:40 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re37 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Parties/Mediator Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties/mediator. (ebz)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/09 4:58 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates by Nepa Wholesales, Inc identifying Other Affiliate Cary A. Lubetsky for Nepa Wholesales, Inc (Feinstein, Brett)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Wed 04/09 2:59 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re35 Notice (Other). Mediator Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the mediator. (scn)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/09 1:33 PM
NOTICE Mediation by Nepa Wholesales, Inc (Feinstein, Brett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
34 34 respm Response/Reply (Other) Thu 03/13 4:04 PM
RESPONSE to Defendant's First Request for Production by Nepa Wholesales, Inc. (Feinstein, Brett)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Response/Reply (Other) Thu 03/13 4:03 PM
RESPONSE to Defendant's Interrogatories by Nepa Wholesales, Inc. (Feinstein, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
32 32 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Mediate Tue 02/18 12:55 PM
CORRECTED PAPERLESS ORDER granting30 Joint Motion to Extend Mediation and Other Deadlines. The parties Mediation and Other deadlines shall be extended by sixty (60) days. Previously scheduled Telephonic Status Conference is cancelled and reset for 4/16/2025. Calendar Call set for 7/9/2025. Jury Trial set for 7/14/2025. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/18/2025. (mp02)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
31 31 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Mediate Thu 01/30 6:03 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting the parties'30 Joint Motion to Extend Mediation and Other Deadlines. The parties Mediation and Other deadlines shall be extended by sixty (60) days. Previously scheduled Telephonic Status Conference is cancelled and reset for 4/16/2025 10:00 AM. Calendar Call set for 6/30/2025. Jury Trial set for 7/14/2025. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/30/2025. (mp02)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
30 30 motion Extension of Time to Mediate Wed 01/29 3:26 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Mediate by Nepa Wholesales, Inc, All Goods Xpress, LLC. Attorney Brett A. Feinstein added to party All Goods Xpress, LLC (pty:dft), Attorney Brett A. Feinstein added to party All Goods Xpress, LLC (pty:cc). (Feinstein, Brett)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
29 29 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 11/04 12:42 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting the parties'28 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Propound Discovery Requests. Defendant shall propound Discovery Requests to Plaintiff and/or Non-Parties on or before November 29, 2024. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 11/4/2024. (bs00)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
28 28 misc Stipulation Fri 11/01 9:21 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Propound Discovery Requests by All Goods Xpress, LLC (Castillo, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
27 27 trial Witness List Wed 10/02 10:42 AM
Witness List by Nepa Wholesales, Inc.. (Feinstein, Brett)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
26 26 trial Witness List Mon 09/30 3:47 PM
Witness List by All Goods Xpress, LLC.. (Castillo, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
25 25 misc Stipulation Tue 07/30 4:43 PM
JOINT STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Parties to File Witness Lists by All Goods Xpress, LLC (Castillo, Eric) Modified Text on 7/30/2024 (wce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
24 24 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Tue 03/05 11:55 PM
NOTICE of Filing Discovery: Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production to Defendant by All Goods Xpress, LLC.(Castillo, Eric)
Related: [-]
23 23 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Tue 03/05 11:53 PM
NOTICE of Filing Discovery: Notice of Serving Verified Anwers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant by All Goods Xpress, LLC.(Castillo, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
22 22 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 02/27 4:24 PM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 2/27/2024. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/12 9:51 PM
Defendant's NOTICE of Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests by All Goods Xpress, LLC (Castillo, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 02/05 11:06 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER striking19 motion for extension of time. The Court maintains a standing discovery order, which is accessible on the undersigned's page of the Southern District of Florida website, and this standing discovery order requires litigants to use the discovery calendar procedures defined therein instead of traditional motion practice. Should Defendant wish to obtain the relief sought in its discovery motion, it must first familiarize itself with Section 3 of the standing discovery order and then follow the Court's instructions regarding setting a discovery hearing. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 2/5/2024. (elk)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 04, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time Sun 02/04 5:55 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests by All Goods Xpress, LLC. Responses due by 2/20/2024. (Castillo, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 01/16 1:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/19/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Telephonic Calendar Call set for 4/30/2025 9:30 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Jury Trial set for 5/5/2025 before Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Mediation Deadline 1/31/2025. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/11 11:35 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Joitn Scheduling Report and Proposed Scheduling Order by All Goods Xpress, LLC (Castillo, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
16 16 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 01/08 2:38 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim by Nepa Wholesales, Inc. (Feinstein, Brett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/21 3:44 PM
NOTICE by All Goods Xpress, LLC of Unavailability (Castillo, Eric)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Response/Reply (Other) Thu 12/21 2:33 PM
REPLY to12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Nepa Wholesales, Inc. (Feinstein, Brett)
Related: [-]
13 13 5 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Thu 12/21 12:26 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before January 11, 2024 , the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements. The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates. Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 12/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (bs00)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 12/20 9:25 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , Defendant's COUNTERCLAIM against Nepa Wholesales, Inc by All Goods Xpress, LLC. (Castillo, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
11 11 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/28 4:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nepa Wholesales, Inc (Feinstein, Brett)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/28 4:46 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates by Nepa Wholesales, Inc (Feinstein, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 11/21 5:46 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file its response on or before December 20, 2023. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 11/21/2023. (bs00)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 11/20 10:47 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by All Goods Xpress, LLC.(Castillo, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 11/20 10:42 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Castillo, Jr on behalf of All Goods Xpress, LLC. Attorney Eric Castillo, Jr added to party All Goods Xpress, LLC (pty:dft). (Castillo, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
6 6 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Thu 10/26 11:05 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/26/2023. (bs00)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Thu 10/26 8:46 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party names in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (wce)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 10/26 8:44 AM
Summons Issued as to All Goods Xpress, LLC. (wce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
4 4 1 pgs misc Form AO 120/121 Thu 10/26 8:44 AM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK. (wce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint with Pictures
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 10/26 8:40 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce)
Related: [-]
1 1 180 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/25 4:57 PM
COMPLAINT JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against ALL GOODS XPRESS, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17023349, filed by NEPA WHOLESALE, INC., a Florida Corporation.(Feinstein, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet