Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robin L Rosenberg
Referred: Bruce E Reinhart
Case #: 9:23-cv-81419
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2023
Terminated:May 13, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 4:22 AM EDT
Defendant
American Zurich Insurance Company
Represented By
Jason Michael Chodos
Zelle LLP
contact info
Giorgia Rivasi
Zelle LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brightway Insurance, Inc. n/k/a Brightway Insurance, LLC
3733 West University Boulevard suite 100
Jacksonville, FL 32217
Defendant
Alexander Cull
9858 Clint Moore Road C103
Boca Raton, FL 33437
Defendant
Rachel Holden
3005 W. Lake Mary Boulevard Suite 111
Lake Mary, FL 32746
Defendant
Eric Rand
10055 Yamato Road
Boca Raton, FL 33498
Defendant
Rand Insurance Group Inc.
17722 Middlebrook Way
Boca Raton, FL 33496
Mediator
Ira S. Bergman
Plaintiff
Robert Settle
Represented By
Christopher Joseph Keller
Keller Melchiorre & Walsh, PLLC
contact info
Christopher Wade Kellam
Keller Melchiorre & Walsh
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, August 05, 2024
38 38 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 08/05 7:12 AM
ORDER CLOSING CASE (With Prejudice) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
37 37 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Fri 08/02 11:13 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by American Zurich Insurance Company (Chodos, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
36 36 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 07/12 3:37 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting35 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the parties to file the requisite documents of dismissal is August 2, 2024. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (mfr)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Extension of Time Fri 07/12 2:39 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal re 34 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by American Zurich Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/26/2024.(Chodos, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
34 34 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 06/12 2:10 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting33 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (mfr)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Extension of Time Wed 06/12 12:31 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal re32 Order Dismissing/Closing Case, Order Staying Case by American Zurich Insurance Company. Responses due by 6/26/2024.(Chodos, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, May 13, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Order Staying Case Mon 05/13 7:31 AM
ORDER STAYING CASE AND DIRECTING THE CLERK OF THE COURT TO CLOSE THIS CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
31 31 motion Stay Fri 05/03 1:47 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Action and Administratively Close Case by American Zurich Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/17/2024.(Chodos, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, May 02, 2024
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 05/02 3:56 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting29 Motion for Extension of Time. In light of the Parties' representations that they have reached a settlement in this matter, the Zoom Discovery Status Conference previously set for 5/6/2024, see ECF No.14 , is hereby CANCELLED . The Parties are no longer required to file a Joint Discovery Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/2/2024. (dc00)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Extension of Time Thu 05/02 3:21 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Status Report re 28 Order, by American Zurich Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/16/2024.(Chodos, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
28 28 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 05/01 1:15 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. Pursuant to this Court's Order at ECF No.14 , the Parties were required to file a Joint Discovery Status Report no later than 4/29/2024. No report has yet been filed. The Parties are hereby ORDERED to file their Joint Discovery Status Report no later than 5/2/2024 at 5:00 PM EST . Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/1/2024. (dc00)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/01 1:55 PM
Reset Deadlines Per DE#28 JOINT DISCOVERY Status Report due by 5/2/2024. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
27 27 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Mon 04/29 11:58 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address information as submitted through attorney's PACER account for attorney Christopher Wade Kellam re26 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name (pt)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name Mon 04/29 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Christopher Wade Kellam (Kellam, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
25 25 adr Mediation Report Mon 04/15 3:21 PM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Mediator Ira S. Bergman. Disposition: Settled in part. Mediation held/partially held via video-conference. Filed by Ira S. Bergman.(Luckman, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/21 10:37 PM
NOTICE by Robert Settle (Kellam, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Tue 02/06 10:03 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice20 Motion to Amend/Correct and Remand to State Court, as the Motion does not comply with the conferral requirement of Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (mfr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
22 22 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Fri 02/02 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Ira S. Bergman as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 4/18/2024 at 1:30 p.m.. (Rivasi, Giorgia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
21 21 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Tue 01/30 7:32 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re20 First MOTION to Amend/Correct19 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal MOTION to Remand to State Court. Two or More Document Events Filed as One ; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
20 20 motion Amend/Correct Remand to State Court Tue 01/30 12:10 AM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct19 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Robert Settle. Responses due by 2/12/2024.(Keller, Christopher). Added MOTION to Remand to State Court on 1/30/2024 (cqs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-HOLDEN summary,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Brightway email response,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-CULL summary,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-NPNP to Brightway,
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Proposed First Amended Complaint
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Mon 01/29 11:54 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Settle.(Keller, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum to Amend Complaint and Remand
Friday, January 26, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation Fri 01/26 4:10 PM
STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SCHEDULE MEDIATION by Robert Settle (Kellam, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
17 17 misc Stipulation Thu 01/18 4:37 PM
STIPULATION Extending Deadline to Select Mediator and Schedule Mediation by Robert Settle (Kellam, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 01/02 11:01 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice15 Motion for Extension of Time for the parties to utilize the Court's procedure at docket entry 13, section 3. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (mfr)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 23, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time Sat 12/23 7:43 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to designate mediator, mediation date and time re13 Scheduling Order,,,, Order of Requirements,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, by Robert Settle. Attorney Christopher Joseph Keller added to party Robert Settle(pty:pla). Responses due by 1/8/2024(Keller, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order Setting Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 11/29 10:21 AM
ORDER SETTING ZOOM DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE:( Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 5/6/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart.), ( Joint Discovery Status Report due by 4/29/2024.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 11/29/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
13 13 order Scheduling Order Order of Requirements Order Referring Case to Mediation Tue 11/28 4:10 PM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION: (Fact Discovery due by 6/7/2024., Expert Discovery due by 6/7/2024., Dispositive Motions due by 7/8/2024., Jury Trial set for 10/7/2024 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 10/2/2024 10:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 9/4/2024 10:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/28/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
12 12 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Tue 11/21 8:21 AM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by American Zurich Insurance Company(Chodos, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Joint Proposed Case Management Schedule
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
11 11 answer ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Wed 11/15 3:55 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by American Zurich Insurance Company. (Chodos, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 11/09 7:18 AM
Reset Deadlines Per DE#10. Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/20/2023 (cqs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 11/08 3:33 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' new deadline to file their joint scheduling report is November 20, 2023. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (mfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
9 9 misc Status Report Mon 11/06 11:15 PM
STATUS REPORT - Removal Status Report by American Zurich Insurance Company(Chodos, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Record
8 8 motion Extension of Time Mon 11/06 9:49 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report re6 Order by American Zurich Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/20/2023(Chodos, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
7 7 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 10/31 9:11 AM
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/31/2023. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Tue 10/31 7:09 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/30/2023. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
6 6 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 10/31 7:11 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/30/2023. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 10/30 9:07 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting3 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the Defendant to file a responsive pleading or motion to the Plaintiff's Complaint is November 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Mon 10/30 3:41 PM
Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline per DE#4: American Zurich Insurance Company response/answer due 11/15/2023. (scn)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
3 3 motion Extension of Time Fri 10/27 3:19 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by American Zurich Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/13/2023(Rivasi, Giorgia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 10/26 9:13 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Wed 10/25 10:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17023806, filed by American Zurich Insurance Company.(Chodos, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit "A" - State Court Action,
Att: 3 Exhibit "B" - Illinois DOI Website,
Att: 4 Exhibit "C" - Florida OIR Website,
Att: 5 Exhibit "D" - Palm Beach County Property Appraiser Website,
Att: 6 Exhibit "E" - RGS Estimate,
Att: 7 Exhibit "F" - NCC Estimate,
Att: 8 Exhibit "G" - Position Letter