Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert E Wier
Referred: Hanly A Ingram
Case #: 6:23-cv-00184
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2023
Terminated:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Oct 26, 2023 10:09 PM EDT
Plaintiff
Destil Eugene Troxell
096831 KENTUCKY STATE PENITENTIARY 266 Water Street Inmate Mail/Parcels
EDDYVILLE, KY 42038
Respondent
Warden Scott Jordan


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
24 24 misc Letter Tue 04/29 3:22 PM
Miscellaneous Correspondence from Destil Troxell, pro se. (JCP) Modified filed pursuant to Order23 on 4/29/2025 (JCP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope Post Mark Not Present
utility File Submitted Tue 04/29 3:23 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Wier for review:24 Letter (JCP)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 11/18 4:41 PM
ORDER: The Court STRIKES this matter from its active docket. 1. In this case, the Clerk of the Court SHALL docket any new document received from Troxell, however styled (whether as a motion, notice, letter, or otherwise), as miscellaneous correspondence. As necessary, the Court will review the filing to determine if it is frivolous, vexatious, or otherwise submitted for an improper purpose. 2. In any future case (including any future motions for authorization), if Troxell wishes to file a new action in this Courtin any division, chambers, or office of this Court, and however the initiating pleading is styled (whether as a complaint, petition, writ, notice, notice of removal, or any other name)he SHALL first: a. Pay the fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis on the proper form; and b. Tender the pleading he wishes to file (on completed court-approved form) to the Clerk of the Court, along with a copy of this Order. 3. Upon receipt of any document(s) tendered in the future by Troxell for filing as a new case, the Clerk of the Court SHALL open a miscellaneous case and file said documents (however styled) in the miscellaneous case as correspondence. The Clerk SHALL further advise the Court of such filing for further review to determine if the filing is frivolous, vexatious, or otherwise submitted for an improper purpose. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/18/2024.(KJA)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
22 22 appeal Letter Fri 11/15 5:15 PM
JUDGMENT from the 6CCA as to Destil Eugene Troxell: THIS MATTER came before the court upon the motion by Destil Eugene Troxell to authorize the district court to consider a second or successive 28 U.S.C. § 2254 petition for a writ of habeas corpus. UPON FULL REVIEW of the record and any submissions by the parties, IT IS ORDERED that the motion for authorization is DENIED. (KJA)
Related: [-]
21 21 appeal Letter Fri 11/15 5:13 PM
ORDER filed from the 6CCA as to Destil Eugene Troxell: We therefore DENY the motion for authorization to file a second or successive § 2254 petition1 6 . Because Troxell continues to file frivolous and vexatious motions for authorization, without any attempt to meet the requirements of § 2244(b), he must seek leave of court for any future filings. The clerk is directed to forward any future motions for authorization filed by Troxell to a single judge for a ruling on whether leave to file should be granted. No mandate to issue.(KJA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 U.S. Mail Notice of Docket Activity
Friday, November 08, 2024
20 20 misc Letter Fri 11/08 1:48 PM
Letter from Destil Troxell, pro se, inquiring about status of appeal. (KJA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 11/6/2024
Friday, October 04, 2024
19 19 misc Letter Fri 10/04 11:24 AM
Letter from Destil Eugene Troxell, pro se, requesting update. (JCP)(Mailed copy of docket on 10/04/2024)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope Post Marked 10.02.2024
Thursday, July 18, 2024
18 18 notice Other Notice Fri 07/19 9:33 AM
NOTICE Copy of District Court Order filed July 12, 2024, to transfer proceedings to Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals re17 Order on Report and Recommendations (MM)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
17 17 6 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 07/12 3:38 PM
ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES7 , ADOPTS DE4 , and OVERRULES DE6 . The Court TRANSFERS Troxell's petition to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals under 28 U.S.C. § 1631. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 7/12/2024. (MM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Thu 07/11 3:22 PM
Letter from Destil Eugene Troxell, pro se, re: Status of case (MM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope postmarked 7/9/2024
Friday, May 10, 2024
15 15 notice Other Notice Fri 05/10 2:54 PM
NOTICE re: Case Status by Destil Eugene Troxell, pro se. Clerk's Note: Docket Sheet mailed to filer this day.(MM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope postmarked 5.8.2024
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
utility File Submitted Tue 02/27 9:45 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Ingram for review:14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (JCP)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
14 14 3 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 02/27 9:44 AM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of filed by Destil Eugene Troxell, pro se.(JCP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope Post Marked 02.21.2024
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Wed 02/21 10:22 AM
Letter from Destil Troxell, pro se, requesting update on case. (JCP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope Post Marked 2.14.2024
Friday, January 26, 2024
12 12 2 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Fri 01/26 3:45 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT of1 Habeas Corpus filed by Destil Eugene Troxell, pro se.(MM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope postmark illegible
Friday, January 19, 2024
11 11 misc Letter Fri 01/19 2:31 PM
Letter from Destil Troxell, pro se. (JCP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope Post Marked 01.16.2024
utility File Submitted Fri 01/19 2:33 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Ingram for review:11 Letter,7 MOTION for Extension of Time by Destil Eugene Troxell (JCP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
10 10 misc Letter Thu 12/28 11:59 AM
Letter from Destil Troxell, pro se. Re: Status of case Clerk's Note: Clerk mailed current docket sheet to filer this day.(MM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope postmarked 12/20/2023
Monday, December 11, 2023
9 9 notice Other Notice Mon 12/11 3:30 PM
NOTICE to Take Judicial Notic by Destil Eugene Troxell, pro se.(MM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of Notice,
Att: 2 Envelope postmarked 12/7/2023
Friday, November 17, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Filing Mon 11/20 1:11 PM
NOTICE OF FILING regarding Wayne Circuit Court Documents by Destil Eugene Troxell, pro se. (APR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 11/15/2023
7 7 motion Extension of Time Mon 11/20 12:57 PM
MOTION for Enlargement of Time by Destil Eugene Troxell, pro se. Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram.(APR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 11/14/2023
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/20 12:50 PM
MOTION to Not Apply Anti-Terrorism Act (styled "Objections to Anti Terrorism Act Being to Petitioner") by Destil Eugene Troxell, pro se. Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram.(APR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 11/14/2023
Monday, November 06, 2023
5 5 misc Letter Mon 11/06 12:53 PM
Letter from Destil Troxell, pro se, requesting status update. (KJA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 10/30/2023
misc Clerk's Virtual Notice - PSO Mon 11/06 12:54 PM
CLERK'S VIRTUAL NOTICE TO Destil Troxell re5 Letter : In response to your inquiry regarding receipt of your fee payment, the Clerk has received your fee payment. A courtesy copy of the docket sheet is enclosed showing the receipt of the fee payment. cc: Destil Troxell by US Mail (KJA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
4 4 motion Report and Recommendations Wed 11/01 3:12 PM
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Destil Eugene Troxell: The Court RECOMMENDS TRANSFERING it to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals. The Court directs the parties to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1) for appeal rights and mechanics concerning this Recommended Disposition, issued under subsection (B) of the statute. See also Rules Governing Section 2254 Proceedings, Rule 8(b). Within fourteen days after being served with a copy of this decision, any party may serve and file specific written objections to any or all findings or recommendations for determination, de novo, by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 11/1/2023.(MM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
utility File Submitted Wed 10/25 3:46 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hanly A. Ingram for review:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (MM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
2 2 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court.[LINK:Click here for more information on the rules.] It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail(MM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sample Caption Page
1 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 600000865.), filed by Destil Eugene Troxell, pro se.(MM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Petition,
Att: 2 State Court Appeals Documents,
Att: 3 Copies,
Att: 4 Receipt,
Att: 5 Envelope postmarked 10/14/2023
Conflict Check run. (MM)
Related: [-]