Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:23-bk-03246

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Roberta A Colton
Case #: 8:23-ap-00190
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2023
Terminated:Nov 05, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Conn Appliances, Inc., a Texas corporation
P O Box 2358
Beaumont, TX 77704
Represented By
Conn Appliances, Inc., a Texas corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Welch
Chapter 7 Trustee c/o The Johnson Law Firm, P.A. 100 North Laura Street, Ste. 701
Jacksonville, FL 32202
Represented By
Thomas A Lash
Lash Wilcox & Grace Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/05 4:28 PM
Adversary Case 8:23-ap-190 Closed. (Anel)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 29, 2024
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 09/30 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 09/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #20 )
Friday, September 27, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 09/27 8:41 AM
Notice and Order Conditionally Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Brenton) Modified on 9/27/2024 (Brenton)
Related: [-] 19 ,1
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
19 19 court Clerks Entry of Default Wed 05/08 11:03 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Conn Appliances, Inc., a Texas corporation Service Instructions: Clerks Office to Serve Related [+]. (Cathy P.)
Related: [-] 17 ,18
18 18 court Clerks Entry of Default Wed 05/08 10:58 AM
DOCUMENT NOT PROCESSED (Incomplete Pdf). Clerk's Entry of Default Against Conn Appliances, Inc., a Texas corporation Service Instructions: Clerks Office to Serve Related [+]. (Cathy P.) Modified on 05/08/2024 (Cathy P.)
Related: [-] 17
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
17 17 motion Motion for Entry of Default (AP) Tue 05/07 5:26 AM
Motion for Entry of Default against Conn Appliances, Inc. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, February 12, 2024
16 16 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 02/12 1:15 PM
Service Executed on Conn Appliances of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, February 09, 2024
15 15 misc Proof of Service (BK) Fri 02/09 7:09 AM
Proof of Service of Order Vacating Clerks Default. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 misc Proof of Service (BK) Fri 02/09 7:06 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Extend Time to Effect Service on Defendant. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, February 08, 2024
13 13 order Set Aside or Vacate Thu 02/08 4:00 PM
Order Granting Motion to Vacate Clerk's Default Related [+]. Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lidia)
Related: [-] 7
12 12 court Alias or Pluries Summons Issued Thu 02/08 12:55 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Conn Appliances, Inc., a Texas corporation. Answer Due 03/11/2024. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Request for Alias or Pluries Summons Thu 02/08 11:51 AM
Alias Summons Requested on Conn Appliances, Inc., a Texas corporation. Answer Due 03/11/2024. (Alias or Pluries Summons Pending.) Filed by Thomas A Lash. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Extend Time Thu 02/08 11:27 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Effect Service on Defendant Conn Appliances, Inc., for an additional 14 days from the entry date of this Order Related [+]. Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
9 9 motion Motion to Extend Time (AP) Wed 02/07 7:40 AM
Motion to Extend Time to Serve Complaint Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Pleadings Wed 02/07 7:39 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Summons Execution Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 3
7 7 motion Motion to Set Aside or Vacate (AP) Wed 02/07 7:35 AM
Motion to Vacate Clerk's Default Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 5
Saturday, December 23, 2023
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Sun 12/24 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 12/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
Thursday, December 21, 2023
5 5 court Clerks Entry of Default Thu 12/21 8:00 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Conn Appliances, Inc. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to Serve Related [+]. (Adrienne)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
4 4 motion Motion for Entry of Default (AP) Tue 12/19 4:26 AM
Motion for Entry of Default against Conn Appliances, Inc. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, October 30, 2023
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 10/30 3:15 PM
Service Executed on Conn Appliances of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, October 27, 2023
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Fri 10/27 1:56 PM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 11/27/2023. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Thu 10/26 9:40 AM
Complaint by Angela Welch against Conn Appliances, Inc., a Texas corporation. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [14 Related [+]]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet