Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:J Philip Calabrese
Case #: 1:23-cv-02105
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2023
Terminated:Aug 14, 2024
Case in other court:Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, CV23985744
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 4:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Exclusive Group Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Cullin A. O'Brien
contact info
Plaintiff
Mansour Gavin, LPA
Represented By
John W. Monroe
Mansour Gavin
contact info
Brendon P. Friesen
Mansour Gavin
contact info

GPO Apr 03 2024
o answer, move, or otherwise plead. (ECF No. 5.) Judge J. Philip Calabrese on April 3, 2024.(Y,A) Opinion and Order: The Court DENIES Defendant's motion to transfer, DENIES Defendant's motion to stay, and GRANTS Defendant's motion for an extension and sets April 21, 2024 as the deadline for Defendant t

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
24 24 minutes ~Util - Document Sealed - This Filing Judgment Wed 08/14 9:44 AM
Agreed Judgment Entry Dismissing Case. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on August 14, 2024. (Y,A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
23 23 oth_doc SEALED DOCUMENT Tue 08/13 4:15 PM
SEALED Document: Agreed Judgment Entry filed by Mansour Gavin, LPA. Related document(s)22 . (Friesen, Brendon)
Related: [-]
22 22 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment Based on ADR Settlement Tue 08/13 4:10 PM
Order : The Court GRANTS the parties' joint motion to file under seal and ORDERS them to file their agreed judgment entry and dismissal under seal pursuant to this Order. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on August 13, 2024.(Y,A)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Judgment Based on ADR Settlement Tue 08/13 3:05 PM
Joint Motion for judgment based on ADR settlement filed by Plaintiff Mansour Gavin, LPA. (Friesen, Brendon)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
minutes ~Util - Terminate Referral Minute Order _ Mediation Conference Wed 07/03 10:40 AM
Minutes of Proceedings and Order [non-document]: On July 1, 2024, the magistrate judge conducted a mediation. Plaintiff Mansour Gavin, LPA party representative Edward Patton attended and was represented by John Monroe; Defendant Exclusive Group Holdings, Inc. party representative Mary Mooney attended and was represented by Cullin O'Brien. The parties have advised the court that they have reached an agreement in principle and have settled all matters in dispute. Accordingly, the parties will finalize and execute a final settlement agreement on or before July 15, 2024, and submit a stipulated entry by which all claims will be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this entry. The Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement. It is so ordered. Mediation referral terminated. Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd on 7/1/2024. (Court Reporter: N/A. Time: 3.5 hours). (D,JJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference MJ Thu 06/27 4:12 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. Ex parte Telephone Conferences held on 6/27/2024. Attorneys John W. Monroe and Edward Patton participated on behalf of plaintiff; Attorney Cullin A. O'Brien participated with party representative Mary Mooney on behalf of defendant. The court and counsel separately discussed background information and issues in order to prepare for the upcoming Mediation Conference set for July 1, 2024 a 11:00 AM. (Court Reporter: N/A.) (D,JJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Wed 06/05 11:26 AM
IMPORTANT Notice [non-document]: Ex parte Telephone Conference with counsel for Plaintiff set for 6/27/2024 at 02:00 PM to be held before Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. Ex parte Telephone Conference with counsel for Defendant set for 6/27/2024 at 02:30 PM to be held before Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel separately. Related document(s)20 . (D,JJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
20 20 6 pgs order Order Thu 05/30 11:13 AM
Order Setting Mediation Conference : Mediation conference to be held on 7/1/2024 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 11B (Cleveland) before Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. Mediation statements are due on or before 6/24/2024. Upon receipt of this order, counsel shall contact the magistrate judge's courtroom deputy via email to schedule an ex-parte telephone conference. See Order for additional information and requirements. Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd on 5/30/2024. (D,JJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
19 19 order Protective Order Wed 05/29 2:21 PM
Protective Order . Judge J. Philip Calabrese on May 29, 2024.(Y,A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Certification
18 18 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/29 2:17 PM
Order : Within fourteen (14) days from May 28, 2024, the parties shall identify to each other, in writing, potential custodians for electronically stored information. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on May 29, 2024. (Y,A)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference Wed 05/29 2:06 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. The Court held an initial case management conference in chambers on May 28, 2024. Brendon P. Friesen appeared for Plaintiff. Cullin A O'Brien appeared for Defendant. Anthony Coyne, as a representative for Plaintiff, and Mary Mooney, as a representative for Defendant, were also present. The parties discussed the events leading to this case and their respective positions on the parties' claims and defenses. With the parties consent, the Court spoke with each party and their respective representatives ex parte about the suitability of this case for mediation. Based on these discussion, the Court finds that mediation is worth pursuing before the parties incur the costs of litigation. Accordingly, by separate order, the Court will refer the case to the Magistrate Judge for mediation in the next 30 days. Time: 1 hour 45 minutes. (Y,A)
Related: [-]
order Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Wed 05/29 2:21 PM
Order [non-document]: Based on discussions during the Court's initial case management conference, the Court REFERS this matter to Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Shepherd under N.D. Ohio Local Rule 16.4(e) for mediation in the next 30 days. On recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, the Court may extend this deadline to facilitate good-faith settlement discussions. If the parties are unable to reach a resolution, the Court directs the Magistrate Judge to recommend a case management schedule. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on May 29, 2024. (Y,A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (atty event) Tue 05/21 4:24 PM
Defendant's Notice of Filing Proposed ESI and Confidentiality Orders filed by Exclusive Group Holdings, Inc.. Related document(s)16 .(O'Brien, Cullin)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Tue 05/21 1:27 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Friesen, Brendon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
15 15 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Wed 04/24 10:18 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on May 28, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. in Chambers 16B before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on April 24, 2024.(Y,A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rule 26 Report of Parties
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Wed 04/24 10:13 AM
Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2024-05. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint in a Removal Case Fri 04/19 6:47 PM
Defendant's Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Demand for Jury Trial Related [+] filed by Exclusive Group Holdings, Inc.. (O'Brien, Cullin)
Related: [-] 1
13 13 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 04/19 6:43 PM
DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Exclusive Group Holdings, Inc.. Related document(s)12 .(O'Brien, Cullin)
Related: [-]
order Order Fri 04/19 11:08 AM
Order [non-document]: Under Section 3 of the Court's Civil Standing Order (available on the Court's website), the Court requires the filing of an answer with any Rule 12 motion. Defendant moves to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6). If Defendant wants the Court to consider the motion, the Court ORDERS Defendant to file an answer no later than April 22, 2024. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on April 19, 2024. (Y,A)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 14, 2024
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Sun 04/14 11:20 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Exclusive Group Holdings, Inc.. Related document(s)11 ,1 . (O'Brien, Cullin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
11 11 19 pgs order Order on Motion to change/transfer venue Order on Motion to stay Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Wed 04/03 10:57 AM
Opinion and Order : The Court DENIES Defendant's motion to transfer, DENIES Defendant's motion to stay, and GRANTS Defendant's motion for an extension and sets April 21, 2024 as the deadline for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise plead. (ECF No.5 .) Judge J. Philip Calabrese on April 3, 2024.(Y,A)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
10 10 resp Reply Mon 12/04 11:21 AM
Reply to response to5 Motion to transfer venue to the Middle District Court of Florida or, in the alternative, Motion to stay, or in the second alternative, Motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint filed by Exclusive Group Holdings, Inc..(O'Brien, Cullin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exclusive Group Holdings, Inc. v. NUFIC et al, 2:22-CV-474-JES-NPM, [Dkt. No. 5], (M.D. Fla.) (Aug. 10, 2022),
Att: 2 Exhibit Requests for Production in Pending Middle District of Florida Litigation,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exclusive Group Holdings, Inc. v. NUFIC et al, 2:22-CV-474-JES-NPM, [Dkt. No. 92-1], (M.D. Fla.) (Mar. 23, 2023),
Att: 4 Exhibit Letter to Plaintiff from Exclusive Group
Monday, November 27, 2023
9 9 resp Opposition Mon 11/27 4:24 PM
Opposition to5 Motion to transfer venue to the Middle District Court of Florida or, in the alternative, Motion to stay, or in the second alternative, Motion for extension of time to resond to the complaint filed by Mansour Gavin, LPA.(Friesen, Brendon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Edward O. Patton,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Anthony J. Coyne
8 8 motion Leave Mon 11/27 12:52 PM
Motion for leave to File Corrected Brief Instanter filed by Plaintiff Mansour Gavin, LPA. Related document(s)6 .(Friesen, Brendon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Edward O. Patton,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Anthony J. Coyne
order Order on Motion for leave Mon 11/27 4:03 PM
Order [non-document]: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to file instanter a corrected brief and supporting exhibits opposing Defendant's motion to transfer venue. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on November 27, 2023.(Y,A)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 24, 2023
7 7 resp Reply Fri 11/24 4:23 PM
Reply to response to5 Motion to transfer venue to the Middle District Court of Florida or, in the alternative, Motion to stay, or in the second alternative, Motion for extension of time to resond to the complaint filed by Exclusive Group Holdings, Inc.., #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Requests for Production in Pending Middle District of Florida Litigation)(O'Brien, Cullin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Exclusive Group Holdings, Inc. v. NUFIC et al, 2:22-CV-474-JES-NPM (M.D. Fla.) [Dkt. No. 5, at pg. 4, n. 3]
Friday, November 17, 2023
6 6 resp Opposition Fri 11/17 3:41 PM
Opposition to5 Motion to transfer venue to the Middle District Court of Florida or, in the alternative, Motion to stay, or in the second alternative, Motion for extension of time to resond to the complaint filed by Mansour Gavin, LPA.(Friesen, Brendon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Anthony J. Coyne,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Edward O. Patton
Friday, November 03, 2023
5 5 motion Change/Transfer venue Fri 11/03 11:31 PM
Motion to change/transfer venue Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Middle District Court of Florida or, in the Alternative, for a Stay, or in the Second Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Defendant Exclusive Group Holdings, Inc.. Related document(s)1 .(O'Brien, Cullin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mary Mooney
Thursday, October 26, 2023
4 4 oth_doc Supplement (atty event) Thu 10/26 1:01 PM
Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Exclusive Group Holdings, Inc.. Related document(s)1 . (O'Brien, Cullin)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Thu 10/26 12:51 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_doc Supplement (atty event) Thu 10/26 12:18 PM
Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Exclusive Group Holdings, Inc.. Related document(s)1 . (O'Brien, Cullin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 10/26 11:57 AM
Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV23985744. Filing fee paid $402.00, receipt number AOHNDC-12246807. Filed by Exclusive Group Holdings, Inc. (O'Brien, Cullin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Papers
utility Add and Terminate Judge Thu 10/26 12:49 PM
Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Thu 10/26 12:50 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Failure to File Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/26 12:53 PM
Notice by Clerk that Exclusive Group Holdings, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (F,AW)
Related: [-]