Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-20735

Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert D Berger
Case #: 2:23-ap-06030
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2023
Terminated:Mar 21, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC
2844 LIVERNOIS RD PO BOX 5802
TROY, MI 48099
Represented By
FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Darcy D. Williamson
1109 SW Westside Dr
Topeka, KS 66615
Represented By
J. Michael Morris
Klenda Austerman LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
34 34 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Tue 02/25 11:22 AM
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by J. Michael Morris on behalf of Darcy D. Williamson . (Morris, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
33 33 court Courtroom Minute Sheet Thu 02/20 4:26 PM
Courtroom Minute Sheet (RDB), Ruling: An order approving settlement was filed in the main case on 1/22/2025. Ms. Williamson has already been paid the settlement amount. The court just needs a final disposition on the adversary, a satisfaction of judgment. Related [+]. (kst)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Defendant FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC filed by Defendant FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC
Friday, January 03, 2025
32 32 motion Vacate Fri 01/03 4:19 PM
Motion to Vacate Related [+] Filed by Defendant FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC (Hall, John)
Related: [-] 13 Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Defendant Five Lakes Law Group, LLC (Related Doc 11 ) Signed on 2/26/2024. (kst)
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration
Friday, December 20, 2024
31 31 epo Continue Hearing Fri 12/20 3:18 PM
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING. Reason for continuance: tracking. So ORDERED by s/ Robert D. Berger . Related [+] Hearing to be held on 2/20/2025 at 10:30 AM Kansas City Courtroom 151 for18 and for21 and for17 and for20 , (kst) THE MOVING PARTY IS TO SERVE THIS ORDER ON PARTIES NOT RECEIVING ELECTRONIC NOTICE AND FILE A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT. (When filing a certificate of service for this order, relate it back to the epo category.)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Reopen Adversary, 18 Response, 20 Objection, 21 Notice of Hearing
Thursday, December 19, 2024
30 30 epo Continue Hearing Fri 12/20 11:53 AM
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING. Reason for continuance: for settlement. So ORDERED by s/ Robert D. Berger . Related [+] Hearing to be held on 2/20/2024 at 10:30 AM Kansas City Courtroom 151 for18 and for21 and for17 and for20 , (kst) THE MOVING PARTY IS TO SERVE THIS ORDER ON PARTIES NOT RECEIVING ELECTRONIC NOTICE AND FILE A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT. (When filing a certificate of service for this order, relate it back to the epo category.)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Reopen Adversary, 18 Response, 20 Objection, 21 Notice of Hearing
29 29 court Courtroom Minute Sheet Fri 12/20 11:46 AM
Courtroom Minute Sheet (RDB), Ruling: A settlement has been reached. Continued to 2/20/2024 for tracking. Counsel is ordered to file a Motion to Vacate in the Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (kst) Modified on 12/20/2024 (kst)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Defendant FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC filed by Defendant FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC, 18 Response to (related document(s): 17 Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding . filed by Defendant FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC) Filed by Plaintiff Darcy D. Williamson (Morris, J.) filed by Plaintiff Darcy D. Williamson, 20 Objection to (related document(s): 17 Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding . filed by Defendant FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC) Filed by Plaintiff Darcy D. Williamson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5) (Morris, J.) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2024 (kjd). filed by Plaintiff Darcy D. Williamson, 21 Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff Trustee's Objection to Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment [Doc 20] Filed by Plaintiff Darcy D. Williamson . Hearing to be held on 12/19/2024 at 10:30 AM Kansas City Courtroom 151 (Morris, J.) filed by Plaintiff Darcy D. Williamson
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 12/11 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order on Generic Motion
court Hearing Set (Motion) Wed 12/11 2:26 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Hearing to be held on 12/19/2024 at 10:30 AM Kansas City Courtroom 151 for18 and for20 , (kst)
Related: [-] 18 Response filed by Plaintiff Darcy D. Williamson,20 Objection filed by Plaintiff Darcy D. Williamson
Monday, December 09, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Mon 12/09 3:28 PM
Order Granting Motion for Timothy R. Herman, Esq. to appear pro hac vice Related [+] Signed on 12/9/2024. (kst)
Related: [-] 25
Friday, December 06, 2024
26 26 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 12/06 4:17 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice. Please take notice that Scott A Wissel on behalf of Defendant FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC hereby enters Appearance in the above captioned bankruptcy case pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9010(b) and requests Notice of all matters which may come before the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, 4001, and 9007. Filed by Scott A Wissel on behalf of FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC . (Wissel, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
25 25 motion Generic Motion Thu 12/05 4:08 PM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed on behalf of Defendant FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC, with Certificate of Service.(Hall, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form for Timothy R. Herman
Friday, November 08, 2024
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/08 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 11/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order on Motion to Redact
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
23 23 order Redact per LBR 9037.1 Single Case Wed 11/06 12:20 PM
Order Granting Motion to Redact Related [+] Signed on 11/6/2024. (kjd)
Related: [-] 22
22 22 motion Redact per LBR 9037.1 Single Case Wed 11/06 10:16 AM
Motion to Redact Fee Amount $28 Filed by Plaintiff Darcy D. Williamson (Morris, J.) Modified on 11/6/2024 (kjd)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Wed 11/06 10:17 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Sealed Motion([LINK 23-06030 ) [motion,msealedr] ( 28.00). Receipt number A19463716,amount $ 28.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
21 21 notice Hearing Tue 11/05 3:03 PM
Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff Trustee's Objection to Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment [Doc 20] Filed by Plaintiff Darcy D. Williamson . Hearing to be held on 12/19/2024 at 10:30 AM Kansas City Courtroom 151 (Morris, J.)
Related: [-]
20 20 answer Objection Tue 11/05 2:16 PM
Objection to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Darcy D. Williamson (Morris, J.) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2024 (kjd)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding . filed by Defendant FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5
19 19 notice Hearing Tue 11/05 1:46 PM
Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff Trustee's Response (Doc 18) to Defendant's Motion to Re-Open Adversary Bankruptcy Case Filed by Plaintiff Darcy D. Williamson Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 12/19/2024 at 10:30 AM Kansas City Courtroom 151 for17 , (Morris, J.)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Defendant FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC
Monday, October 28, 2024
18 18 answer Response Mon 10/28 1:50 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Darcy D. Williamson (Morris, J.)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding . filed by Defendant FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC
Friday, October 25, 2024
17 17 motion Reopen Adversary Fri 10/25 1:17 PM
Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Defendant FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC (Hall, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
16 16 court Document Tue 10/15 2:21 PM
Answer of Garnishee . (kcm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
15 15 court Returned Mail Tue 04/02 4:33 PM
Returned Mail for FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC Related [+]. (kjd)
Related: [-] 12 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s) 10 Clerk's Entry of Default) Notice Date 02/22/2024. (Admin.)
Thursday, March 21, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Thu 03/21 8:43 AM
Adversary Case 2:23-ap-6030 Closed . (kst)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 02/29 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Monday, February 26, 2024
13 13 order Default Judgment Tue 02/27 8:21 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Defendant Five Lakes Law Group, LLC Related [+] Signed on 2/26/2024. (kst)
Related: [-] 11
Thursday, February 22, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/22 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 02/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Clerk's Entry of Default
11 11 motion Default Judgment Thu 02/22 11:13 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Darcy D. Williamson (Morris, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
10 10 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 02/20 3:47 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC . Related [+]. (kjc2)
Related: [-] 8 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by J. Michael Morris on behalf of Darcy D. Williamson . (Morris, J.) filed by Plaintiff Darcy D. Williamson
Friday, February 16, 2024
9 9 misc Support Document Fri 02/16 12:25 PM
Document filed in support of : Request For Clerk's Entry of Default with Certificate of Service on. Filed by J. Michael Morris on behalf of Darcy D. Williamson Related [+] (Morris, J.)
Related: [-] 8 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by J. Michael Morris on behalf of Darcy D. Williamson . (Morris, J.)
8 8 misc Request For Clerk's Entry of Default Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7055(a) and FRCP 55(a) Fri 02/16 12:23 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by J. Michael Morris on behalf of Darcy D. Williamson . (Morris, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 01/17 9:14 AM
Summons Service Executed on FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC 1/16/2024 (Morris, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
6 6 court Alias Summons Issued Tue 01/16 9:30 AM
Alias Summons Issued on FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC Date Issued 1/16/2024, Answer Due 2/15/2024. (kst)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Request Mon 01/15 2:24 PM
Request for Alias of Summons(es) by J. Michael Morris on behalf of Darcy D. Williamson - summons(es) requested on FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC (Morris, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 10/27 1:19 PM
Summons Service Executed on FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC 10/27/2023 (Morris, J.)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 10/27 9:36 AM
Summons Issued on FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC Date Issued 10/27/2023, Answer Due 11/27/2023 (kst)
Related: [-]
court Fee Deferred Fri 10/27 9:29 AM
Fee Deferred Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-06030 Complaint by J. Michael Morris on behalf of Darcy D. Williamson against FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC. (kst)
Thursday, October 26, 2023
2 2 cmp Summons Request Thu 10/26 9:44 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by J. Michael Morris on behalf of Darcy D. Williamson - summons(es) requested on FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC (Morris, J.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/26 9:28 AM
Adversary case 23-06030 Complaint by J. Michael Morris on behalf of Darcy D. Williamson against FIVE LAKES LAW GROUP, LLC. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Morris, J.)
Related: [-]