California Central District Court
Judge:Christina A Snyder
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:23-cv-09055
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2023
Terminated:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 1:20 AM PDT
Defendant
Michael Heyward
Represented By
Maurice David Pessah
Pessah Law Group PC
contact info
Lilibet Behdadnia
Pessah Law Group PC
contact info
Defendant
Medialab AI, Inc.
Represented By
Maurice David Pessah
Pessah Law Group PC
contact info
Lilibet Behdadnia
Pessah Law Group PC
contact info
Defendant
Otin Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Maurice David Pessah
Pessah Law Group PC
contact info
Lilibet Behdadnia
Pessah Law Group PC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Tom Lehman
Represented By
Ethan Isaac Jacobs
Ethan Jacobs Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, December 09, 2024
71 71 judgmentCV Judgment Tue 12/10 11:35 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. NOW, THEREFORE, the Court shall enter JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $1,027,985.40 (the Judgment Amount) and against Defendants as set out in the Fed. R. Civ. P. 68 Offer, to be effective only upon the return of Plaintiffs 51,220 MediaLab.Ai, Inc. shares to MediaLab.Ai, Inc. or its designee. Related to:70 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (twdb) Modified on 12/10/2024 (twdb)
Related: [-]