Nebraska District Court
Judge:Robert F Rossiter, Jr
Referred: Susan M Bazis Magistrate Judge
Case #: 8:23-cv-00471
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2023
Terminated:Jan 12, 2024
Case in other court:District Court of Washington County, Nebraska, CI 23-00159
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 3:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Ghost Transportation, LLC
Defendant
Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd Co.
Represented By
Marc S. Blubaugh
Benesch, Friedlander Law Firm - Columbus
contact info
Natalie M. Cuadros
Benesch, Friedlander Law Firm - San Francisco
contact info
Craig A. Knickrehm
Walentine, O'Toole Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Jamie Jorgensen
Represented By
Mattea Fosbender
Kutak, Rock Law Firm - Omaha
contact info
Robert M. Slovek
Kutak, Rock Law Firm - Omaha
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Jorgensen
Represented By
Mattea Fosbender
Kutak, Rock Law Firm - Omaha
contact info
Robert M. Slovek
Kutak, Rock Law Firm - Omaha
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
21 21 order Strike Order Tue 01/16 9:14 AM
TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Scheduling Order20 is stricken for the following reason: as it was entered in error. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
20 20 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/16 8:22 AM
*STRICKEN* SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 2/16/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO) Modified on 1/16/2024 to strike per strike order 21 (LKO)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - Public Fri 01/12 10:25 AM
Remark - Public: This case has been dismissed pursuant to the filing of a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This case is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees, costs and expenses. (JSF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
19 19 motion Notice of Case Dismissal Thu 01/11 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Case Dismissal Voluntarily WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Attorney Mattea Fosbender on behalf of Plaintiffs Jamie Jorgensen, Jason Jorgensen (Fosbender, Mattea)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
18 18 order Order on Motion to Extend Fri 12/22 8:56 AM
TEXT ORDER granting17 Motion to Extend. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the Motion to Dismiss14 by January 12, 2024. Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd. shall file its reply brief by January 26, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
17 17 motion Extend Thu 12/21 5:08 PM
JOINT MOTION to Extend Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 14 by Attorney Natalie M. Cuadros on behalf of Defendant Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd Co..(Cuadros, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
16 16 order Reassignment Order Tue 12/05 10:52 AM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER This case is reassigned to Chief District Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. for disposition and is assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (LRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
15 15 oth_doc Brief Mon 12/04 3:33 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 14 by Attorney Craig A. Knickrehm on behalf of Defendant Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd Co..(Knickrehm, Craig)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 12/04 3:31 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Craig A. Knickrehm on behalf of Defendant Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd Co..(Knickrehm, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
13 13 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/13 10:00 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice11 for attorney Natalie M. Cuadros. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/13 9:59 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice10 for attorney Marc S. Blubaugh. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
11 11 oth_doc Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/10 4:29 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4974172 by Attorney Natalie M. Cuadros on behalf of Defendant Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd Co..(Cuadros, Natalie)
Related: [-]
10 10 oth_doc Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/10 3:53 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4974166 by Attorney Marc S. Blubaugh on behalf of Defendant Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd Co..(Blubaugh, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Fri 11/03 2:43 PM
TEXT ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by December 4, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Thu 11/02 1:21 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Craig A. Knickrehm on behalf of Defendant Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd Co..(Knickrehm, Craig)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 11/02 8:19 AM
Summons Issued as to defendant Ghost Transportation, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
6 6 service Summons Requested Wed 11/01 5:46 PM
Summons Requested as to Ghost Transportation c/o Vivian Cordova, Registered Agent regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement,,2 , Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint,1 , Assignment of Judges, 3 . (Fosbender, Mattea)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
5 5 oth_evt Attorney Letter Fri 10/27 8:42 AM
ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Natalie M. Cuadros has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_evt Attorney Letter Fri 10/27 8:41 AM
ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Marc S. Blubaugh has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Assignment of Judges Fri 10/27 8:34 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
2 2 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Thu 10/26 4:14 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Other Affiliate Transport SNL, GP, LLC, Other Affiliate Transport SNL, GP, LLC, Other Affiliate Bridgeway Logistics Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Bridgeway Logistics Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Bridgeway Connects, Inc. for Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd.. by Attorney Craig A. Knickrehm on behalf of Defendants Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd., Transport SNL, GP, LLC, Transport SNL, GP, LLC, Bridgeway Logistics Group, LLC, Bridgeway Logistics Group, LLC, Bridgeway Connects, Inc..(Knickrehm, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 10/26 3:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd. from Washington District Court, Case number Case No. CI 23-159 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4964622) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Craig A. Knickrehm on behalf of Superior Nationwide Logistics, Ltd.(Knickrehm, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet