Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Timothy C Batten, Sr
Case #: 1:23-cv-04911
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2023
Terminated:Apr 01, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Joseph Bowden
Represented By
Edwin Francis McPherson
Mcpherson LLP
contact info
Pierre Bayard Pine
Mcpherson LLP
contact info
Ryan Lance Isenberg
Isenberg & Hewitt, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Machine Entertainment Group LLC
Represented By
Edwin Francis McPherson
Mcpherson LLP
contact info
Pierre Bayard Pine
Mcpherson LLP
contact info
Ryan Lance Isenberg
Isenberg & Hewitt, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Herbert Randall Wright, III
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Movit
Chaudhrylaw PLLC
contact info
Marguerite E. Patrick
Marguerite Patrick, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 01, 2024
38 38 1 pgs misc A.O. Form 121 Copyright Mon 04/01 10:38 AM
AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (dmb)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Mon 04/01 10:33 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING37 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (dmb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 04/01 10:36 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
37 37 1 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/29 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Herbert Randall Wright, III (Movit, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
36 36 misc Status Report Mon 03/25 10:04 PM
STATUS REPORT in Response to Defendants' filing this evening (ECF No. 35) by Herbert Randall Wright, III.(Movit, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (emails between counsel for the parties)
35 35 misc Status Report Mon 03/25 6:50 PM
STATUS REPORT OF DEFENDANTS RE SETTLEMENT AND LACK OF ANY FURTHER NEED FOR A JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY PERIOD by Joseph Bowden, Machine Entertainment Group LLC.(McPherson, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Pierre B. Pine In Support of Status Report of Defendants
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
34 34 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Stay Tue 03/12 12:38 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice33 MOTION to Strike,26 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, and15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue . The Court will allow the parties to submit a proposed scheduling order consistent with this Order within 14 days that allows for a period of jurisdictional discovery. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 3/12/2024. (dmb)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 03/12 11:53 AM
Submission of20 MOTION to Stay Case and Discovery Deadlines ,15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue , to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 03/06 2:52 PM
Submission of15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
33 33 4 pgs motion Strike Tue 03/05 3:26 PM
MOTION to Strike26 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion by Joseph Bowden, Machine Entertainment Group LLC. (McPherson, Edwin)
Related: [-]
32 32 19 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/05 3:16 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue filed by Joseph Bowden, Machine Entertainment Group LLC.(McPherson, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 53 pgs Affidavit SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JOSEPH BOWDEN,
Att: 2 6 pgs Affidavit DECLARATION OF JOSEPH BOWDEN IV
Monday, March 04, 2024
31 31 4 pgs respm Reply Brief Mon 03/04 3:44 PM
REPLY BRIEF re20 MOTION to Stay Case and Discovery Deadlines filed by Joseph Bowden, Machine Entertainment Group LLC. (Isenberg, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 02/23 1:04 PM
ORDER granting29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Reply Brief re:15 MOTION to Dismiss. The reply brief is due 3/5/2024. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 2/23/2024. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
29 29 motion Extension of Time Thu 02/22 4:42 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Reply Brief re:15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue ,21 Response in Opposition to Motion by Joseph Bowden, Machine Entertainment Group LLC.(Isenberg, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
28 28 10 pgs respm Response to Motion Tue 02/20 1:25 PM
RESPONSE re20 MOTION to Stay Case and Discovery Deadlines filed by Herbert Randall Wright, III.(Movit, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A (email between counsel)
Monday, February 12, 2024
27 27 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/12 7:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue filed by Herbert Randall Wright, III.(Movit, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Biography of James Lawson
26 26 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/12 7:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue filed by Herbert Randall Wright, III. (Movit, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/12 7:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue filed by Herbert Randall Wright, III.(Movit, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Release and Confidential Settlement Agreement dated August 25, 2023
24 24 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/12 7:07 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue filed by Herbert Randall Wright, III.(Movit, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A - Release and Confidential Settlement Agreement dated August 25, 2023
23 23 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/12 7:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue filed by Herbert Randall Wright, III.(Movit, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A - Release and Confidential Settlement Agreement dated August 25, 2023
22 22 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/12 7:05 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue filed by Herbert Randall Wright, III.(Movit, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - NPR Article Regarding Atlanta Music Scene,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - G Herbo Says Atlanta is the Mecca of Successful Hip-Hop,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Concert Archives for G Herbo,
Att: 4 6 pgs Exhibit Exhibit D - Email Thread with Opposing Counsel
21 21 34 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/12 6:59 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue filed by Herbert Randall Wright, III. (Movit, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
20 20 4 pgs motion Stay Tue 02/06 5:35 PM
MOTION to Stay Case and Discovery Deadlines by Joseph Bowden, Machine Entertainment Group LLC. (Isenberg, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 01/31 9:58 AM
ORDER granting17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff will have until 2/12/2024, to respond to Defendants' outstanding motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 1/30/2024. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
18 18 1 pgs respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 01/26 3:39 PM
RESPONSE in Support re17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Motion to Dismiss (Email from Defendants' Counsel Stating Their Consent to this Motion) filed by Herbert Randall Wright, III. (Movit, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
17 17 3 pgs motion Extension of Time Wed 01/24 5:36 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Motion to Dismiss by Herbert Randall Wright, III. (Movit, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Tue 01/16 8:14 AM
Clerk's Notation re16 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Chief U.S. District Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
16 16 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/15 11:27 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joseph Bowden, Machine Entertainment Group LLC. (Isenberg, Ryan)
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs motion Dismiss Mon 01/15 11:26 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue with Brief In Support by Joseph Bowden, Machine Entertainment Group LLC.(Isenberg, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 31 pgs Brief,
Att: 2 73 pgs Declaration of Joseph Bowden
Thursday, December 07, 2023
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/07 3:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting13 and14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by CRD at the direction of Chief U.S. District Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(usw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Thu 11/30 12:00 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:13 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward F. McPherson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13058244). Attorney Edwin Francis McPherson added appearing on behalf of Joseph Bowden, Machine Entertainment Group LLC. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Thu 11/30 1:01 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:14 APPLICATION for Admission of Pierre B. Pine Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13058257). Attorney Pierre Bayard Pine added appearing on behalf of Joseph Bowden, Machine Entertainment Group LLC. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
14 14 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/29 10:37 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Pierre B. Pine Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13058257).by Joseph Bowden, Machine Entertainment Group LLC.(Isenberg, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
13 13 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/29 10:35 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Edward F. McPherson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13058244).by Joseph Bowden, Machine Entertainment Group LLC.(Isenberg, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 11/28 2:45 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Joseph Bowden and Machine Entertainment Group LLC Answer due 1/17/2024. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/28/2023. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 24, 2023
11 11 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/24 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Lance Isenberg on behalf of Joseph Bowden, Machine Entertainment Group LLC (Isenberg, Ryan)
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs misc Stipulation Fri 11/24 2:03 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, Extending Time to File Response through January 17, 2024 by Joseph Bowden, Machine Entertainment Group LLC. (Isenberg, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
9 9 service Return of Service Executed Fri 11/03 3:57 PM
Return of Service Executed by Herbert Randall Wright, III. Machine Entertainment Group LLC served on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. (Movit, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/30 11:53 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by CRD at the direction of Chief U.S. District Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(usw)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
8 8 2 pgs service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 10/27 2:56 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Joseph Bowden. (jkb)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 10/27 2:49 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Machine Entertainment Group LLC. (jkb)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Filing Fri 10/27 11:12 AM
NOTICE Of Filing by Herbert Randall Wright, III re1 Complaint, Ex. 1 (Patrick, Marguerite)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Fri 10/27 12:56 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:5 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey Movit Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12990745). Attorney Jeffrey M. Movit added appearing on behalf of Herbert Randall Wright, III. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
5 5 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/26 3:53 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey Movit Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-12990745).by Herbert Randall Wright, III. (Patrick, Marguerite) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
Related: [-]
4 4 service Proposed Summons Thu 10/26 3:35 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Herbert Randall Wright, III Bowden (Patrick, Marguerite)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed Summons Thu 10/26 3:23 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Herbert Randall Wright, III Machine (Patrick, Marguerite)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc A.O. Form 121 Copyright Thu 10/26 2:45 PM
AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/26 2:40 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Herbert Randall Wright, III. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12988350)(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit Copyright Registration Information,
Att: 2 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet