Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Christopher A Boyko
Case #: 1:22-cv-00349
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2022
Terminated:Mar 13, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 27, 2023 11:11 PM EDT
Defendant
Alex J. Bilek
Plaintiff
Transparent Cargo LLC
Represented By
Warner Mendenhall
Law Offices Of Warner Mendenhall
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Attorney General of the United States U.S. Dpartment of Justice 950 Pennyslvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530
Represented By
Joseph J. Froliklong
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info
Brendan F. Barker
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion to dismiss Wed 03/12 9:38 AM
Marginal Entry Order granting Government's Motion to dismiss the garnishment proceeding filed against Alex Bilek as to Interstate Towing, without prejudice. Related [+]. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/12/2025.(L,Ja)
Related: [-] 29
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
29 29 motion Dismiss Tue 03/11 3:41 PM
Motion to dismiss Garnishment Proceedings as to Interstate Towing filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Related document(s)28 ,27 ,25 . (Czerwien, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
28 28 oth_evt Writ Issued Tue 03/04 2:50 PM
Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued against the property of Alex Bilek. A judgment in the amount of $224,239.65 plusinterest at the rate of 4.94% has been entered. (L,Ja)
Related: [-]
27 27 oth_evt Notice of Garnishment Tue 03/04 2:47 PM
Notice of Garnishment by Clerk against the property of Alex Bilek. (L,Ja)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Claim for Exemption Form
25 25 notice Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment Tue 03/04 2:23 PM
Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment filed by United States of America. (Czerwien, Joseph)
Related: [-]
24 24 oth_doc Reference List/Redaction Index - Sealed Tue 03/04 2:22 PM
Privacy Act Reference Index by United States of America filed by United States of America. (Czerwien, Joseph)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Tue 03/04 2:19 PM
Attorney Appearance by Joseph Z. Czerwien filed by on behalf of United States of America. (Czerwien, Joseph)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Tue 03/04 2:50 PM
Copy of28 Writ,27 Notice of Garnishment mailed to Interstate Towing at 1655 Highland Rd. Twinsburg, OH 44087 on 3/4/2025. Related document(s)28 ,27 . (L,Ja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
22 22 oth_evt Abstract of Judgment Wed 02/19 2:54 PM
Abstract of Judgment issued on 2/19/2025 for judgment against Alex J. Bilek, Bilek Trucking in the amount of $197,221.65 in damages plus a $27,018 penalty, for a total of $224,239.65; plus the statutory post-judgment interest rate on the total amount. Related document(s)21 . (M,CE)
Related: [-]
21 21 oth_doc Praecipe Wed 02/19 12:10 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Abstract of Judgment filed by United States of America.(Froliklong, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Abstract of Judgment
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
order Order on Motion for attorney fees Wed 05/22 9:31 AM
Order [non-document] Relators Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (#20 ) is denied at this time for failure to show prevailing rates for attorneys in the community. Relator may re-file with supporting affidavits of attorneys or experts and/or references to studies of reasonable fee rates charged by similarly experienced counsel in the relevant community of the Northern District of Ohio in the area of the law encompassing False Claims Act actions. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/22/2024.(L,Ja)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
20 20 motion Attorney Fees Fri 04/12 5:51 PM
Motion for attorney fees by Warner Mendenhall filed by Plaintiff Transparent Cargo LLC.(Mendenhall, Warner)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Aff't for fees
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
19 19 order Judgment Wed 03/13 11:41 AM
Default Judgment Entry in favor of Plaintiff United States of America and against Defendants Alex J. Bilek and Bilek Trucking jointly and severally as follows: On Count One: $197,221.65 in damages plus a $27,018 penalty, for a total of $224,239.65; in addition, interest on that total amount at the statutory post-judgment rate from the date the Court enters judgment until the debt is repaid in full. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/13/2024. (L,Ja)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
18 18 motion Default Judgment (Motion for) Mon 02/12 11:53 AM
Motion for default judgment on Count one of the Complaint filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Related document(s)17 .(Froliklong, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-Certificate of debt from SBA,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, January 26, 2024
17 17 oth_evt Default Entered Fri 01/26 10:47 AM
Default Entered on 1/26/2024 against Alex J. Bilek and Bilek Trucking. Sandy Opacich, Clerk by Jason M. Lowbridge, Deputy Clerk. Related document(s)16 . (L,Ja)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Application to Enter Default Fri 01/26 10:32 AM
Application to Clerk for entry of default against Alex J. Bilek and Bilek Trucking filed by United States of America. (Froliklong, Joseph)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Fri 01/26 10:48 AM
Copy of17 Default Entered mailed to Alex J. Bilek and Bilek Trucking at 4824 US Route 322, Williamsfield, Ohio 44093 on 1/26/2024. Related document(s)17 . (L,Ja)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
15 15 service Return of Service Executed Thu 12/14 12:40 PM
Return of Service by personal service executed upon All Defendants, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s)13 .(Froliklong, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
14 14 oth_evt Summons Issued Tue 11/07 10:28 AM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Alex J. Bilek, Bilek Trucking. (H,SP)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
13 13 cmp Intervenors Complaint Mon 11/06 3:58 PM
Intervenor's complaint . Filed by United States of America. Related document:12 . (Froliklong, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons -Alex J. Bilek,
Att: 2 Summons -Bilek Trucking
Thursday, October 26, 2023
12 12 minutes ~Util - Case Unsealed ~Util - Document Unsealed Order Thu 10/26 10:25 AM
Order to unseal. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/26/2023. (L,Ja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
11 11 Notice of Election to Intervene, filed by United States of America.. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 03, 2022
2 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL)
Related: [-]
1 1 Complaint with jury demand against Alex J. Bilek. Filing fee paid. $402, receipt # 54660008443, filed by Transparent Cargo LLC. (M,TL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Disaster Business Loan Application,
Att: 3 Bank Statements
Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (M,TL)
Related: [-]
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (M,TL)
Related: [-]