Colorado District Court
Judge:Philip A Brimmer
Case #: 1:23-cv-02826
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2023
Terminated:Aug 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 2:21 AM MDT
Defendant
Lead Company, Inc., The
Represented By
Brian Ignatius Hays
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Defendant
Solidquote LLC
Represented By
Kyle Russell Hosmer
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Paul A. Rosenthal
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Barbara Durant
Represented By
Ryan Lee McBride
Kazerouni Law Group Apc
contact info
Jacob U. Ginsburg
Kimmel & Silverman P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, August 22, 2024
46 46 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Mon 08/26 12:09 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to45 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed in this case on 8/222/2024. Text Only Entry (angar, )
Related: [-]
45 45 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Case Thu 08/22 5:10 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Barbara Durant.(McBride, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Monday, August 05, 2024
44 44 order Minute Order Mon 08/05 9:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Status Conference set for August 26, 2024, is reset to September 12, 2024 , at 1:00PM in Courtroom A 501 before Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/05/2024. Text Only Entry (mehlc7)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
43 43 order Minute Order Wed 07/24 3:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the Parties' Joint Status Report and Request For Extension of the Deadline to File Dismissal Papers. ECF 42. Based on the Parties' representation that they have finalized a settlement agreement which requires the settlement be fully consummated in the coming weeks, the Court grants their request for an extension of time to file dismissal papers. The Parties shall file dismissal papers on or before August 23, 2024 . If no dismissal papers are filed, the Parties shall be prepared to discuss the status of the settlement at the Status Conference currently set in this case for August 26, 2024. See ECF 35. Entered by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/24/2024. Text Only Entry (mehlc7)
Related: [-]
42 42 misc Status Report Wed 07/24 3:07 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT regarding settlement process and dismissal papers and Rule 6(b) request for extension of time to file stipulation of dismissal by Plaintiff Barbara Durant. (Ginsburg, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
41 41 order Minute Order Mon 07/22 3:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER: At ECF 40, the Court ordered the Parties to file dismissal papers on or before July 19, 2024. That deadline has passed. On or before July 24, 2024 , the Parties shall file either appropriate dismissal papers or a Status Report explaining why dismissal papers have not been filed. Entered by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/22/2024. Text Only Entry (mehlc7)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
40 40 order Minute Order Wed 06/19 10:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the notice of settlement jointly emailed to the Court by the Parties today, June 19, 2024, the Settlement Conference set for tomorrow, June 20, 2024, is vacated . The Parties shall file dismissal papers on or before July 19, 2024. Entered by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/19/2024. Text Only Entry (mehlc7)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
39 39 order Minute Order Tue 06/18 11:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER: As discussed with the Parties at the conclusion of the June 6, 2024 Settlement Conference, the Court will continue the remote Settlement Conference on June 20, 2024 at 10:45 a.m. using the videoconference information provided to Chambers by email. Entered by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/18/2024. Text Only Entry (mehlc7)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
38 38 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 06/07 2:30 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Settlement Conference held on 6/7/2024. (cthom, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
37 37 order Minute Order Fri 05/24 9:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 6/6/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/24/2024. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
36 36 order Minute Order Tue 05/14 4:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER: At the May 6, 2024 Status Conference, the Court stayed discovery and set a May 24, 2024 deadline for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. ECF34 . The Court hereby stays the latter pending a Settlement Conference which the Court is in the process of scheduling with the Parties. Entered by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/14/24. Text Only Entry (mehlc5)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
35 35 order Minute Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 05/07 9:01 AM
MINUTE ORDER re:34 Status Conference. A Status Conference is set for 8/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. ORDERED by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/6/2024. Text Only Entry. (cthom, )
Related: [-]
34 34 minutes Status Conference Tue 05/07 8:52 AM
COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 5/6/2024. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
33 33 misc Statement Fri 05/03 12:23 PM
JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING INITIAL PHASE OF DISCOVERY AND CASE POSTURE AHEAD OF MAY 6, 2024 CONFERENCE by Plaintiff Barbara Durant, Defendants Lead Company, Inc., The, Solidquote LLC. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
32 32 order Minute Order Thu 05/02 12:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/2/2024. The Stipulation to Dismiss Count II and to Stike Do-Not-Call Class Allegations [Docket No.31 ] is deemed ineffective as a means of dismissing claim two against defendants SolidQuote LLC and The Lead Company, Inc. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Stipulation Thu 05/02 7:20 AM
STIPULATION to dismiss Count II of Complaint and to strike the Do-Not-Call class allegations without prejudice (Count I and the pre-recorded voice classes remain pending) by Plaintiff Barbara Durant. (Ginsburg, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
30 30 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/07 2:50 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Lead Company, Inc., The.(Hays, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
29 29 order Protective Order Tue 02/06 11:03 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/5/2024. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
28 28 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 01/29 12:00 PM
ORDER granting26 the parties' Joint Motion for Protective Order for good cause shown and as modified herein. The parties shall replace the second to last sentence of Paragraph 9 with the following: "The designating party bears the burden of proving the necessity of a confidentiality designation." For issuance of the proposed protective order, the parties shall submit an updated, clean copy ( i.e. , no track changes) in an editable format ( i.e. , Word) to hegarty_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov on or before February 1, 2024 . Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/29/24. Text Only Entry (mehlc5)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Memorandum Mon 01/29 10:13 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding26 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Solidquote LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/29/2024. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Protective Order Mon 01/29 8:22 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Solidquote LLC.(Rosenthal, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
25 25 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/10 2:13 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/9/2024. (cthom, )
Related: [-]
24 24 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 01/10 2:11 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 1/9/2024. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information Tue 01/09 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Ryan Lee McBride (McBride, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
22 22 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 01/08 2:26 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/08/2024. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
21 21 misc Letter Reassigning Case Mon 01/08 8:43 AM
CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 20 Minute Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-02826-PAB . (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
20 20 order Minute Order Fri 01/05 5:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the consent form filed at ECF16 declining consent under D.C.Colo.LCivR 40.1(c), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.Colo.LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C.Colo.LCivR 72.1(c). Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/5/24. Text Only Entry (mehlc5)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2 Fri 01/05 9:46 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: attorney Ryan Lee McBride , re18 Proposed Scheduling Order. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
18 18 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 01/04 6:26 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order (jointly submitted) by Plaintiff Barbara Durant. (Ginsburg, Jacob)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 01/04 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Ignatius Hays on behalf of Lead Company, Inc., TheAttorney Brian Ignatius Hays added to party Lead Company, Inc., The(pty:dft) (Hays, Brian)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/04 12:16 PM
NOTICE re3 Magistrate Judge Declination of Consent by Plaintiff Barbara Durant (Ginsburg, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 01/02 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul A. Rosenthal on behalf of Solidquote LLC (Rosenthal, Paul)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2 Tue 01/02 9:25 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re:13 Answer to Complaint filed by attorneys Kyle Russell Hosmer and Paul A. Rosenthal . The s/signature did not match the filer's name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/29 11:38 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, --Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses to Complaint-- by Solidquote LLC.(Hosmer, Kyle)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/29 11:36 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Datalot Inc., Corporate Parent Centerfield Media Parent, Inc. for Solidquote LLC. (Hosmer, Kyle)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 12/29 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle Russell Hosmer on behalf of Solidquote LLCAttorney Kyle Russell Hosmer added to party Solidquote LLC(pty:dft) (Hosmer, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
10 10 misc Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2 Wed 12/20 10:03 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re:9 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Ryan Lee McBride. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 12/19 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan Lee McBride on behalf of Barbara DurantAttorney Ryan Lee McBride added to party Barbara Durant(pty:pla) (McBride, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
8 8 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Mon 12/11 12:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Barbara Durant. Lead Company, Inc., The waiver sent on 12/11/2023, answer due 2/9/2024. (Ginsburg, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
7 7 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 10/31 7:24 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Barbara Durant. Solidquote LLC waiver sent on 10/30/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (Ginsburg, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
6 6 misc Summons Issued Mon 10/30 2:48 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
5 5 order Minute Order Mon 10/30 2:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/30/2023. Magistrate Judge Consent Form due 12/27/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/2/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2024 at 11:15 a.m. in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Request Mon 10/30 1:23 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to The Lead Company Inc by Plaintiff Barbara Durant. (Ginsburg, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
3 3 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Fri 10/27 11:44 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 10/27 11:41 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/26 7:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Solidquote LLC, The Lead Company, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9364924)Attorney Jacob U. Ginsburg added to party Barbara Durant(pty:pla), filed by Barbara Durant.(Ginsburg, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet