Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-02126
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2023
Terminated:Jun 27, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 27, 2023 2:39 AM CDT
Defendant
Brian Troy Nunez (1)
Represented By
Erik Anthony Hanshew
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sarah Valenzuela
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/01/2024 1:59 AM CDT
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
Arrest of Brian Troy Nunez (mg2) [3:23-mj-03157-LS]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Brian Troy Nunez by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mv) [3:23-mj-03157-LS]
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower as to Brian Troy Nunez. (mg2) [3:23-mj-03157-LS]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Brian Troy Nunez. (mg2) [3:23-mj-03157-LS]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Brian Troy Nunez. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (epda) [3:23-mj-03157-LS]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Brian Troy Nunez. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (epda) [3:23-mj-03157-LS]
Related: [-]
5 5 Proceedings held before Judge Leon Schydlower:Initial Appearance as to Brian Troy Nunez held on 9/29/2023 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 10/3/2023 10:00AM before Judge Leon Schydlower, Interpreter NOT (L. Quevedo) required as to Brian Troy Nunez (Court Reporter ERO.) (epda) [3:23-mj-03157-LS]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Sarah Valenzuela appearing for USA. . Attorney Sarah Valenzuela added to party USA(pty:pla) (Valenzuela, Sarah) [3:23-mj-03157-LS]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Erik Anthony Hanshew appearing for Brian Troy Nunez . Attorney Erik Anthony Hanshew added to party Brian Troy Nunez(pty:dft) (Hanshew, Erik) [3:23-mj-03157-LS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leon Schydlower: Preliminary Hearing as to Brian Troy Nunez held on 10/3/2023 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Detention Hearing as to Brian Troy Nunez held on 10/3/2023 COURT GRANTS GOVERNMENT MOTION TO DETAIN. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) Due Process Protection Act Warning given in Open Court as to Brian Troy Nunez, Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Brian Troy Nunez (Court Reporter ERO.) (cs) [3:23-mj-03157-LS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
8 8 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Brian Troy Nunez for proceedings held on 10/03/0223 before Judge Leon Schydlower. Proceedings Transcribed: PL/DH. Court Reporter: ERO. (Hanshew, Erik) ** SENT TO DIPTI PATEL ON 10/05/2023 ** Modified on 10/5/2023 (bg2). [3:23-mj-03157-LS]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER GRANTING2 Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. Detained without Bond as to Brian Troy Nunez (1). Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (cs) [3:23-mj-03157-LS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (bot1)
Related: [-]
11 11 INDICTMENT Related [+] with Notice of Forfeiture included as to Brian Troy Nunez. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Brian Troy Nunez (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
13 13 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Brian Troy Nunez (bot2)
Related: [-]