Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-usc-40605
Typeunited states civil / united states
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2023
Terminated:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Oct 31, 2024 4:06 AM CDT
Amicus Curiae
Emergency Department Practice Management Association
Represented By
Jack R. Bierig
ArentFox Schiff, L.L.P.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
America's Health Insurance Plans
Represented By
Hyland Hunt
Deutsch Hunt , P.L.L.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Blue Cross Blue Shield Association
Represented By
Andrew Robert Hellman
O'Melveny & Myers, L.L.P.
contact info
K. Lee Blalack II
O'Melveny & Myers, L.L.P.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
The Leukemia and Lymphoma Society
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
The ALS Association
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CancerCare
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Epilepsy Foundation
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Families USA Action
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Hemophilia Federation of America
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
The Mended Hearts, Incorporated
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
National Multiple Sclerosis Society
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
National Patient Advocate Foundation
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
U.S. PIRG
Represented By
Joseph J. Wardenski
Wardenski, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
American Medical Association
Represented By
James Edward Tysse
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, L.L.P.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
American Society of Anesthesiologists
Represented By
Aaron D. Lindstrom
Barnes & Thornburg, L.L.P.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
American College of Emergency Physicians
Represented By
Aaron D. Lindstrom
Barnes & Thornburg, L.L.P.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
American College of Radiology
Represented By
Aaron D. Lindstrom
Barnes & Thornburg, L.L.P.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Physicians Advocacy Institute
Represented By
Long Xuan Do
Athene Law, L.L.P.
contact info
Eric D. Chan
Athene Law, L.L.P.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Fifteen State Medical Associations
Represented By
Long Xuan Do
Athene Law, L.L.P.
contact info
Eric D. Chan
Athene Law, L.L.P.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Six Specialty Medical Societies
Represented By
Long Xuan Do
Athene Law, L.L.P.
contact info
Eric D. Chan
Athene Law, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Martin Walsh, Secretary, U.S. Department of Labor, in his official capacity
Represented By
Anna L. Deffebach
U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Janet Yellen, Secretary, U.S. Department of Treasury, in her official capacity
Represented By
Anna L. Deffebach
U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Kiran Ahuja, in her official capacity as the Director of the Office of Personnel Management
Represented By
Anna L. Deffebach
U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Xavier Becerra, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, in his official capacity
Represented By
Anna L. Deffebach
U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
United States Department of Treasury
Represented By
Anna L. Deffebach
U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
United States Department of Labor
Represented By
Anna L. Deffebach
U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Office of Personnel Management
Represented By
Anna L. Deffebach
U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By
Anna L. Deffebach
U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Defendant - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
United States Department of Treasury
Represented By
Kevin Benjamin Soter
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Joshua Marc Salzman
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Anna L. Deffebach
U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Leif Eric Overvold
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Janet Yellen, Secretary, U.S. Department of Treasury, in her official capacity
Represented By
Kevin Benjamin Soter
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Joshua Marc Salzman
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Anna L. Deffebach
U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Leif Eric Overvold
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Kiran Ahuja, in her official capacity as the Director of the Office of Personnel Management
Represented By
Kevin Benjamin Soter
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Joshua Marc Salzman
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Anna L. Deffebach
U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Leif Eric Overvold
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Xavier Becerra, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, in his official capacity
Represented By
Kevin Benjamin Soter
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Joshua Marc Salzman
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Anna L. Deffebach
U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Leif Eric Overvold
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Julie A. Su, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Labor, in his official capacity
Represented By
Kevin Benjamin Soter
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Joshua Marc Salzman
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Anna L. Deffebach
U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Leif Eric Overvold
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
United States Department of Labor
Represented By
Kevin Benjamin Soter
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Joshua Marc Salzman
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Anna L. Deffebach
U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Leif Eric Overvold
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Office of Personnel Management
Represented By
Kevin Benjamin Soter
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Joshua Marc Salzman
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Anna L. Deffebach
U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Leif Eric Overvold
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By
Kevin Benjamin Soter
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Joshua Marc Salzman
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Anna L. Deffebach
U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Leif Eric Overvold
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Tyler Regional Hospital, L.L.C.
Represented By
Penny Packard Reid
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Jaime L.M. Jones
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Eric Dean McArthur
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Dr. Adam Corley
Represented By
Penny Packard Reid
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Jaime L.M. Jones
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Eric Dean McArthur
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LifeNet, Incorporated
Represented By
James Craig Smyser
Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Air Methods Corporation
Represented By
David Alan King
Polsinelli, P.C.
contact info
Joshua Arters
Polsinelli, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Rocky Mountain Holdings, L.L.C.
Represented By
David Alan King
Polsinelli, P.C.
contact info
Joshua Arters
Polsinelli, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
East Texas Air One, L.L.C.
Represented By
James Craig Smyser
Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Texas Medical Association
Represented By
Penny Packard Reid
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Jaime L.M. Jones
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Eric Dean McArthur
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Tyler Regional Hospital, L.L.C.
Represented By
Brenna Jenny
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Cody Matthew Akins
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Penny Packard Reid
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Jaime L.M. Jones
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Jillian Stonecipher
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Eric Dean McArthur
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Texas Medical Association
Represented By
Brenna Jenny
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Cody Matthew Akins
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Penny Packard Reid
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Jaime L.M. Jones
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Jillian Stonecipher
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Eric Dean McArthur
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Dr. Adam Corley
Represented By
Brenna Jenny
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Cody Matthew Akins
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Penny Packard Reid
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Jaime L.M. Jones
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Jillian Stonecipher
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Eric Dean McArthur
Sidley Austin, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
LifeNet, Incorporated
Represented By
Steven Shepard
Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.
contact info
Stephen Lee Shackelford Jr.
Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.
contact info
James Craig Smyser
Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Air Methods Corporation
Represented By
David Alan King
Polsinelli, P.C.
contact info
Joshua Arters
Polsinelli, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Rocky Mountain Holdings, L.L.C.
Represented By
David Alan King
Polsinelli, P.C.
contact info
Joshua Arters
Polsinelli, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
East Texas Air One, L.L.C.
Represented By
Steven Shepard
Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.
contact info
James Craig Smyser
Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.
contact info

GPO Oct 30 2024
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-40605 Affirmed in Part] Judge: LHS, Judge: CH, Judge: DMD. Mandate issue date is 12/23/2024. (This opinion includes URL material that is archived by the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals Library, and made available at http://www.lb5.uscourts.gov/ArchivedURLS/.) [23-40605]

Docket last updated: 10/31/2024 4:06 AM CDT
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
3 pgs US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Kiran Ahuja, Mr. Xavier Becerra, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, OPM, HHS, LABR, TREA, Mr. Martin Walsh, Secretary, U.S. Department of Labor and Ms. Janet Yellen, Secretary, U.S. Department of Treasury. 23-40605 (RLL)
Related: [-]