Original Case: 2:20-cv-07438

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cvpri-01084
Typecivil private
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 27, 2023 10:49 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
AEROVIRONMENT, INC.
Represented By
Christina N. Goodrich
K&L Gates LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
PAUL E. ARLTON
Represented By
Deborah Pollack-Milgate
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID J. ARLTON
Represented By
Deborah Pollack-Milgate
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/27/2023 10:44 AM EDT
Thursday, October 26, 2023
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 10/12/2023. [959207] Entry of Appearance due 11/09/2023. Certificate of Interest is due on 11/09/2023. Docketing Statement due 11/09/2023. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 12/26/2023. [KMH] [Entered: 10/26/2023 11:25 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 53 pgs Civil Case Docketed
2 2 1 pgs Entry of Appearance for Deborah Pollack-Milgate; Heather B. Repicky as counsel for Appellants David J. Arlton and Paul E. Arlton. Service: 10/26/2023 by email. [959369] 24-1084 [Deborah Pollack-Milgate] [Entered: 10/26/2023 02:59 PM]
Related: [-]