Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Laurie J Michelson
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:23-cv-12737
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause05:704 Labor Litigation
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 6:56 AM EDT
Defendant
Great Expressions Dental Centers, P.C.
Represented By
Saniya Khare
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Neil B. Pioch
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
ADG, LLC
Plaintiff
Najeana Singleton
Represented By
Jeffrey G. Schultz
Harvey Kruse, PC
contact info
Jason R. Mathers
Harvey Kruse (troy)
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
28 28 notice Notice - Other Thu 04/10 9:21 AM
NOTICE by Najeana Singleton of Settlement (Mathers, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
27 27 7 pgs order Order Thu 04/03 4:56 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (TDam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Wed 04/02 9:13 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 4/17/2025 is Cancelled. (EVra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
order Text-Only Reassignment Tue 03/25 11:44 AM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Sean F. Cox to District Judge Laurie J. Michelson pursuant to Administrative Order 25-AO-005. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/14 3:22 PM
REPLY to Response re23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Great Expressions Dental Centers, P.C.. (Tice, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
25 25 notice Hearing on Motion* Mon 03/03 12:06 PM
NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on23 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2025 03:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (EVra)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
24 24 respm Response to Motion Fri 02/28 4:17 PM
RESPONSE to23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Najeana Singleton. (Mathers, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit GE-ADG Production,
Att: 3 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Plaintiff Najeana Singleton (excerpts),
Att: 4 Exhibit Photographs,
Att: 5 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Brande Simmons (excerpts),
Att: 6 Exhibit Text Messages,
Att: 7 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Kasey Cartrette (excerpts),
Att: 8 Exhibit 4.17.23 Write-Up,
Att: 9 Exhibit Insurance E-Mail,
Att: 10 Exhibit Moorer v. Baptist Memorial Health Care System, 398 F.3d 469, 490 (6th Cir. 2005),
Att: 11 Exhibit Chester v Quadco Rehabilitation Ctr., 484 F.Supp.2d 735 (N.D. Ohio, 2007),
Att: 12 Exhibit Garlitz v Alpena Regional Med. Ctr., 834 F.Supp.2d 668 (E.D. Mich, 2011)
Friday, February 07, 2025
23 23 motion Summary Judgment Fri 02/07 8:04 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (Pioch, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - FMLA Leave Approval,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Final Written Warning,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Termination Form,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Kasey Cartette Deposition Transcript,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Brande Simmons Deposition Transcript,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff Deposition Transcript,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - FMLA Leave Request Paperwork,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - May 17, 2023 Email re Plaintiffs Absenteeism,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - February 3, 2023 Email re: Plaintiffs Request for a Raise,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - September 6, 2023 Email re Plaintiffs Performance Issues,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 - Text Message exchange Between Plaintiff and Supervisor,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 - May 19, 2023 Email re Plaintiff Terminating Insurance,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 - Plaintiffs Paystub Showing Employer as ADG, LLC,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14 - FMLA Leave Request Paperwork,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15 - FMLA Leave Request Paperwork,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16 - Hicks v. Leroy's Jewelers, Inc., Docket No. 98-6596 2000 WL 1033029 (6th Cir. 2000),
Att: 18 Exhibit 17 - Crowfoot v. MidMichigan Med. Ctr-Midland, Docket No. 05-10032 2007 WL 1017336 (ED Mich. March 30, 2007),
Att: 19 Exhibit 18 - Town v. Michigan Bell Telephone Co., 455 Mich. 688, 695; 568 N.W.2d 64 (1997)
Monday, January 06, 2025
22 22 notice Appearance Mon 01/06 9:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A. Kardasz on behalf of Najeana Singleton. (Kardasz, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
21 21 notice Appearance Mon 12/30 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Tice on behalf of All Defendants. (Tice, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Fri 12/20 10:39 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Status Conference re Facilitation on 1/7/2025 is Cancelled (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
20 20 trial Witness List Mon 12/02 10:00 PM
WITNESS LIST by All Defendants (Pioch, Neil)
Related: [-]
19 19 trial Witness List Mon 12/02 1:13 PM
WITNESS LIST by Najeana Singleton (Mathers, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
18 18 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Thu 05/09 5:52 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by ADG, LLC (Pioch, Neil)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 05/09 5:06 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Pioch, Neil)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Appearance Thu 05/09 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Neil B. Pioch on behalf of ADG, LLC. (Pioch, Neil)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Thu 05/09 9:28 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. ADG, LLC waiver sent on 5/1/2024, answer due 7/1/2024. (Mathers, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
14 14 service Summons Issued* Thu 04/25 2:28 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *ADG, LLC* (JHea)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Thu 04/25 2:15 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Najeana Singleton against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Mathers, Jason)
Related: [-]
service Request for Additional Summons Thu 04/25 2:16 PM
REQUEST for SUMMONS for ADG, LLC. (Mathers, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/03 2:17 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/3/2025, Status Conference re Facilitation set for 1/7/2025 03:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/7/2025, Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2025 09:30 AM before District Judge Sean F. Cox, Trailing Trial Docket set for July/August 2025 Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. Related [+] (JMcC)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 04/02 2:46 PM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Scheduling Conference held on 4/2/2024 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/18 3:47 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 4/2/2024 02:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
11 11 notice Appear* Thu 01/11 11:32 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2024 at 03:30PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (Zaidel, B)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
10 10 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Fri 12/29 2:28 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Great Expressions Dental Centers, P.C. (Pioch, Neil)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 12/29 2:27 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Great Expressions Dental Centers, P.C.. (Pioch, Neil)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
8 8 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Fri 12/15 11:44 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Najeana Singleton against Great Expressions Dental Centers, P.C.. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Mathers, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
7 7 order Stipulation and Order Wed 12/13 8:45 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
6 6 notice Appearance Tue 12/12 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Saniya Khare on behalf of Great Expressions Dental Centers, P.C.. (Khare, Saniya)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Tue 12/12 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Neil B. Pioch on behalf of Great Expressions Dental Centers, P.C.. (Pioch, Neil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
4 4 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/21 1:43 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Great Expressions Dental Centers, P.C. served on 11/21/2023, answer due 12/12/2023. (Mathers, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
3 3 notice Appearance Mon 10/30 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey G. Schultz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Schultz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued* Fri 10/27 2:17 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Great Expressions Dental Centers, P.C.* (MCho)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 10/27 11:46 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Najeana Singleton against Great Expressions Dental Centers, P.C. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9542343 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Mathers, Jason)
Related: [-]